Plaintiff v. Defendant
Plaintiff: Plaintiff
Defendant: Defendant
Case Number: 2:2024cv11111
Filed: January 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 77 U.S.C. ยง 7777 Civil Shell Case Opening
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2024 Filing 66 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Downey v. Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 IFP)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:24-cv-00098 (klc).
February 29, 2024 Filing 65 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Richard Jay Wriston, on Behalf of the Estate of Richard Jason Wriston v. West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation, et al Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8602818. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Proposed Summons, #14 Proposed Summons, #15 Proposed Summons, #16 Proposed Summons, #17 Proposed Summons, #18 Proposed Summons, #19 Proposed Summons, #20 Proposed Summons)(New, Stephen) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:24-cv-00097 (klc).
February 28, 2024 Filing 64 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Shannon Brewster, et al. v. Larry E. Strickland Trucking,LLC, et al. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8602101. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Carter, D.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00096 (klc).
February 28, 2024 Filing 63 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Employer-Teamsters Local Nos. 175/505 Health & Welfare Trust Fund v. Precision Pipeline, LLC Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8602014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Del Giudice, Michael) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00095 (klc).
February 27, 2024 Filing 62 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Browning v. O'Malley (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 IFP motion)(Gillikin, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00094 (ts).
February 27, 2024 Filing 61 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Clark v. O'Malley. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8601562. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillikin, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00093 (ts).
February 23, 2024 Filing 60 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Kidd v. Wexford Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8599611. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stroebel, Paul) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00090 (klc).
February 23, 2024 Filing 59 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. SCRITCHFIELD V. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 IFP)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:24-cv-00088 (klc).
February 22, 2024 Filing 58 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Kiera Cooper, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Quantez Burks v. State of West Virginia Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt #2002211. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(New, Stephen) (Main Document 58 replaced on 2/22/2024; Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2024: #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Receipt #2002211) (klc). CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:24-cv-00087 (klc). (Modified on 02/23/2024 to add documents and edit docket text) (klc).
February 22, 2024 Filing 57 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Payne v. McGuire Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8598729. (Bryan, John) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:24-cv-00086 (klc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2024: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (klc).
February 22, 2024 Filing 56 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. DiCocco v. Allstate Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8598289. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Harvey, Ronda) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00085 (klc).
February 21, 2024 Filing 55 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Kiera Cooper, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Quantez Burks v. PrimeCare Medical, Inc. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8597784. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(New, Stephen) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:24-cv-00083 (klc).
February 21, 2024 Filing 54 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Sill v. Appalachian Healthcare, Inc. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8597598. (Curry, Arden) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:24-cv-00082 (klc).
February 21, 2024 Filing 53 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. James Sneed and Jennifer Sneed v. Autozone Parts, Inc., a Tennessee Corporation Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8597438. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Stewart, J.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:24-cv-00081 (klc).
February 20, 2024 Filing 52 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Debra Smith v. River Valley Child Development Services, Inc. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8596570. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (December 5, 2023 Letter), #2 Exhibit B (December 7, 2023 Letter), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Glazer, Hoyt) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:24-cv-00080 (klc).
February 15, 2024 Filing 51 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Simmons v. Village of Barboursville Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8594209. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Del Giudice, Michael) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:24-cv-00078 (klc).
February 15, 2024 Filing 50 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Perrone v. Smith, et al. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8593959. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Salango, C.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00076 (klc).
February 14, 2024 Filing 49 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. CKJS INVESTMENTS TRUST LLC v. Turley Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8593814. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract of Sale, #2 Exhibit Closing Instructions, #3 Exhibit Email Chain Closing)(O'Boyle, Jonathan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:24-cv-00075 (klc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2024: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (klc).
February 14, 2024 Filing 48 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Frontier v. Conex Express, LLC Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8593705. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Fenwick, John) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00074 (klc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2024: #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B) (klc).
February 14, 2024 Filing 47 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Barlar v. Heniff TTL, LLC, et al. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8593653. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Jones, Jeffrey) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:24-cv-00073 (klc).
February 14, 2024 Filing 46 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. de Back v. Greenbrier Outfitters, Inc. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8593549. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Salango, C.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:24-cv-00072 (klc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2024: #2 Waiver) (klc).
February 14, 2024 Filing 45 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Bell v. Bryant, et al. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8593282. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Salango, C.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00071 (klc).
February 12, 2024 Filing 44 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. O.W. v. Cabell County Board of Education Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8591562. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Reynolds, Kayla) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:24-cv-00070 (klc).
February 9, 2024 Filing 43 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Martin v. Shelby Transport, Inc., et al Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8590640. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for James Roy Frantz, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Shelby Transport, Inc.)(Norman, Taylor) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:24-cv-00067 (klc).
February 9, 2024 Filing 42 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Short v. Commissioner of Social Security Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8590471. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00066 (klc).
February 9, 2024 Filing 41 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Walker v. American Strategic Insurance Corp Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8590254. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Werner, Anthony) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:24-cv-00063 (klc).
February 6, 2024 Filing 40 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Gardner v. Edwin Boso, M.D. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8587494. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Berthold, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00059 (klc).
February 5, 2024 Filing 39 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. R.C. v. Cabell County Board of Education Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8587106. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Cabell County Board of Education, #3 Proposed Summons Pamela Bailey, #4 Proposed Summons Janessa Freeman, #5 Proposed Summons Cynthia Neal)(Shah, Raj) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:24-cv-00057 (klc).
February 2, 2024 Filing 38 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Lester v. Sizemore Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8586191. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stroebel, Paul) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:24-cv-00054 (klc).
February 2, 2024 Filing 37 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. AIX Specialty v. Gunther-McNeely Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # CWVSDC-8585833. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Gunther-McNeely, #2 Proposed Summons S.B., #3 Exhibit A - Complaint in Underlying Action, #4 Exhibit B - Policy, #5 Exhibit C- ROR Letter, #6 Exhibit D - Supplemental ROR Letter)(Hettrich, Jordan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00053 (klc).
February 2, 2024 Filing 36 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Elkins v. Navient Solutions, LLC et al. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8585768. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons Navient, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons Weltman)(Sheridan, Benjamin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:24-cv-00052 (klc).
January 31, 2024 Filing 35 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Scott v. O'Malley Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8583629. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillikin, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00050 (klc).
January 31, 2024 Filing 34 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Poling v. O'Malley Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # 2002128. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillikin, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2024: #2 Receipt) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00049 (klc).
January 30, 2024 Filing 33 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Farmer v. Berry, et al. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # BWVSDC-8583287. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Berry, #3 Proposed Summons USPS, #4 Proposed Summons US Dept of Justice, #5 Proposed Summons US Attorney for the SDWV, #6 Proposed Summons UIM - State Farm)(Chapman, Mary) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:24-cv-00048 (klc).
January 26, 2024 Filing 32 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Zurich v. Glow Worm Coal Company and Cline Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8581093. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Cline, #4 Summons Glow Worm)(Horne, Jerad) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:24-cv-00045 (klc).
January 25, 2024 Filing 31 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Anderson v. T-Mobile USA, Inc. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8580000. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Atkinson, John-Mark) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00041 (klc).
January 23, 2024 Filing 30 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Nitinthorn v. O'Malley Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8578073. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillikin, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00039 (klc).
January 22, 2024 Filing 29 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Amanda Metzger v. Bloomin' Brands, Inc. d/b/a Outback Steakhouse of West Virginia, Inc. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8577095. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Glazer, Hoyt) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00037 (klc).
January 19, 2024 Filing 28 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Joe Hand v El Ranchito Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8576709. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eddy, Zachary) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:24-cv-00036 (klc).
January 17, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Powell v. Appalachian Regional Healthcare, Inc. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8575006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet D, #6 Supplement Corporate Disclosure)(Richards-Minigh, Stacey) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:24-cv-00034 (klc).
January 16, 2024 Filing 26 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Cox v. ConsumerInfo.com, Inc. d/b/a/ Experian Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8574549. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cicil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons)(Sheridan, Benjamin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:24-cv-00033 (klc).
January 16, 2024 Filing 25 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Sullivan v. U.S. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8574545. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Geiger, Andrea) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00032 (klc).
January 11, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Johnson v. Transunion et al. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8572501. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint & Docket, #2 Exhibit Transunion Consent, #3 Exhibit Equifax Consent, #4 Exhibit Truist Consent)(Odell, Ashley) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:24-cv-00028 (klc).
January 10, 2024 Filing 23 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Rutter v. Tibbs Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8571289. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stroebel, Paul) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00026 (ts).
January 10, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Comer v. Diversified Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8571152. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Casto, Matthew) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00025 (ts).
January 10, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Comer v. Diversified Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8571140. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Casto, Matthew) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00024 (ts).
January 9, 2024 Filing 20 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Hall v. First Savings Bank, N.A. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8570846. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Sheridan, Benjamin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00023 (ts). (Modified on 1/10/2024 to replace with corrected images) (ts).
January 9, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Robert Billups v. Penumbra, Inc. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8570808. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Bird, Melissa) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00022 (klc).
January 9, 2024 Filing 18 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. O'Brien v. American Express National Bank Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8570815. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Sheridan, Benjamin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00021 (klc).
January 9, 2024 Filing 17 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Lafferty v. Lendmark Financial Services of West Virginia, Inc Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8570809. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Sheridan, Benjamin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:24-cv-00020 (klc).
January 9, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Vance v. American Income Life Insurance Company Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8570724. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Sheet and Court File)(Nortz, Anthony) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00019 (klc).
January 9, 2024 Filing 15 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Bryant v. Truist Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8570681. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Sheridan, Benjamin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:24-cv-00018 (klc).
January 9, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Weaver v. Federal Express Corporation Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8570599. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Taylor, Justin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:24-cv-00017 (klc).
January 8, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Defendant re: #11 Notice of Removal, (Parsons, Colton)
January 8, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER TO Complaint by Defendant.(Parsons, Colton)
January 8, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Prunesti v. Lowe's Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8569719. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Service of Process, #4 Exhibit SOS Data, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Parsons, Colton) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:24-cv-00016 (klc).
January 8, 2024 Filing 10 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Saxton v. Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 IFP)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00013 (klc).
January 5, 2024 Filing 9 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Mackey v. Lt. Tibbs Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8568695. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stroebel, Paul) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00012 (klc).
January 4, 2024 Filing 8 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Miller v. O'Malley Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8567462. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillikin, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:24-cv-00009 (klc).
January 4, 2024 Filing 7 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Morgan v. O'Malley Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8567460. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillikin, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:24-cv-00008 (klc).
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Ratliff v. O'Malley Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8567008. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillikin, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00007 (klc).
January 4, 2024 Filing 5 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Webb v. O'Malley (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 IFP motion)(Gillikin, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00006 (klc).
January 2, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Long v. Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Pauper's Affidavit, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons)(Lefler, Derrick) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:24-cv-00005 (klc).
January 2, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Shrewsbury v. Commissioner of Social Security Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8565615. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:24-cv-00004 (klc).
January 2, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Washington v. E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, et al. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8565402. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Fitzsimmons, Clayton) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00003 (klc).
January 2, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Anderson v. Dolgencorp, LLC Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8565100. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - CSC Service of Process Email, #5 Exhibit Notice of Removal to All Parties and Court)(Ruggier, Duane) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:24-cv-00001 (klc).
January 1, 2024 2024 Civil Shell Case Opening (IVC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plaintiff v. Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?