Lester et al v. American Home Products Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Polly Lester and Jimmy Lester
Defendant: Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, Barr Laboratories, Inc., Designwrite, LLC, Wyeth, Inc., Wyeth-Ayerst Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Saatchi & Saatchi Healthcare Communications, Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company, Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Wyeth Laboratories, Inc., Dannemiller Memorial Educational Foundation, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ketchum, Inc., American Home Products Corporation, Designwrite, Inc., Wyeth-Ayerst International, Inc., ESI Lederle Inc., Rite Aid of WV, Inc., Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Solvay America, Inc., Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Greenstone LLC, National Committee for Quality Assurance, American College of Physicians and Klemptner Advertising, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00576
Filed: May 27, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Mason
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2008 Filing 28 CONFIRMATION from Eastern District of Arkansas that the case has been opened in that district as 4:08-03879, filed 10/24/2008. (gan)
October 16, 2008 Transmitted case to Eastern District of Arkansas via extract civil case feature of CM/ECF (jkk)
October 15, 2008 Filing 27 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation entered 10/09/08: Pursuant to 28 USC 1407, this action is transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas and is assigned to the Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr., for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings occurring in MDL No. 1507, In Re: Prempro Products Liability Litigation. CASE CLOSED. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jkk)
June 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MANAGEMENT ORDER upon hearing held 06/16/08; the first filed case, Doerfler v. American Home Products, 3:08-0346, is designated as the lead case for the hormone replacement cases, Civil Action No. 3:08-0346 through 3:08-0787 inclusive; the remainder of the cases are stayed; the Court will allow a party to apply to the Court to lift the stay on an individual case if that party demonstrates some particularized reason why the stay should be lifted; each visiting attorney associated with a defendant shall file a Statement of Visiting Attorney in the lead case and shall pay a fee of $50 for case numbers 3:08-0346; 3:08-0434, 3:08-0522 and 3:08-0610 for a total of $250; pursuant to LR 83.6(e), the Court waives the visiting attorney fees for the remainder of the individual actions; any Defendant who has not filed its disclosures pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure shall file its disclosures only in the lead case; Plaintiffs to file their motion to remand, with supporting memorandum, in the lead case only on or before June 26, 2008; Defendants to file their response on or before July 14, 2008; Plaintiffs to file their reply on or before July 27, 2008. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/17/2008. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (cdb)
June 16, 2008 Filing 25 INITIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers with counsel on 6/16/2008. No court reporter present. Proceeding not recorded. (cdb)
June 12, 2008 Filing 24 COPY OF LETTER on behalf of Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn LLC and Greenstone Ltd. (the Upjohn Defendants) to Jeffrey Luthi, Clerk of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, notifying the Clerk of the Panel of potential tag-along actions and requesting that tag-along procedures be utilized in transferring these actions to MDL No. 1507, pending in the USDC for the Eastern District of Arkansas. (cdb)
May 29, 2008 Filing 23 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Wyeth, Inc., Wyeth-Ayerst International, Inc., Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (skh)
May 29, 2008 Filing 22 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Klemptner Advertising, Inc., Saatchi & Saatchi Healthcare Communications, Inc. (skh)
May 29, 2008 Filing 21 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Ketchum, Inc. (skh)
May 29, 2008 Filing 20 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Designwrite, Inc., Designwrite, LLC. (skh)
May 29, 2008 Filing 19 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Rite Aid of WV, Inc. (skh)
May 28, 2008 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Warner Chilcott (US), LLC. (skh)
May 28, 2008 Filing 17 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Warner Chilcott (US), LLC. (skh)
May 27, 2008 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants Wyeth, Inc., Wyeth-Ayerst International, Inc., Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (skh)
May 27, 2008 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Barr Laboratories, Inc. (skh)
May 27, 2008 Filing 14 ANSWER TO #5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Solvay America, Inc. (skh)
May 27, 2008 Filing 13 ANSWER TO #5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Wyeth (incorrectly sued as Wyeth, Inc.), Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Wyeth-Ayerst International, Inc. (incorrectly sued as Wyeth Ayerst International Inc.) (skh)
May 27, 2008 Filing 12 ANSWER TO #5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Klemptner Advertising, Inc., Saatchi & Saatchi Healthcare Communications, Inc. (skh)
May 27, 2008 Filing 11 ANSWER TO #5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ketchum, Inc. (skh)
May 27, 2008 Filing 10 ANSWER TO #5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Designwrite, Inc., Designwrite, LLC. (skh)
May 27, 2008 Filing 9 ANSWER TO #5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Rite Aid of WV, Inc. (skh)
May 27, 2008 Filing 8 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Barr Laboratories, Inc. (skh)
May 27, 2008 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (skh)
May 27, 2008 Filing 6 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (skh)
May 27, 2008 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiffs amending the complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal against all defendants. (skh)
May 27, 2008 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants Greenstone LLC, Pharmacia & Upjohn Company, Inc., Pfizer Inc. (skh)
May 27, 2008 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Greenstone LLC, Pharmacia & Upjohn Company, Inc., Pfizer Inc. (skh)
May 27, 2008 Filing 2 PROOF OF NOTICE by Greenstone LLC, Pharmacia & Upjohn Company, Inc., Pfizer Inc., with Notice to State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal attached as Exhibit 1. (skh)
May 27, 2008 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC (incorrectly sued as Pharmacia & Upjohn Company, Inc., d/b/a Pharmacia & Upjohn, Inc.) and Greenstone Ltd. (incorrectly sued as Greenstone LLC d/b/a Greenstone Ltd.) with complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Mason County and other miscellaneous documents. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt #22250. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (Judge Chambers order in 5:05-0094), #3 Exhibit 3 (Board of Pharmacy letter of 8/23/2000), #4 Exhibit (4) (Judge Faber order in 1:01-0553), #5 Exhibit 5 (State Court docket sheet), #6 Exhibit 6 (Consents to Removal), #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (skh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lester et al v. American Home Products Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott (US), LLC
Represented By: David K. Hendrickson
Represented By: Jeffry H. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Debra C. Price
Represented By: William Scott Wickline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Designwrite, LLC
Represented By: Lynn Oliver Frye
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Represented By: Erin R. Stankewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Oliver Frye
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Represented By: Erin R. Stankewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth-Ayerst Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Oliver Frye
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Represented By: Erin R. Stankewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saatchi & Saatchi Healthcare Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Oliver Frye
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Represented By: Erin R. Stankewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia & Upjohn Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Farrell
Represented By: Tamela J. White
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Lisa J. Bray
Represented By: Neva G. Lusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Oliver Frye
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Represented By: Erin R. Stankewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dannemiller Memorial Educational Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: William D. Wilmoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Farrell
Represented By: Tamela J. White
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Oliver Frye
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Represented By: Erin R. Stankewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ketchum, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Oliver Frye
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Represented By: Erin R. Stankewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Products Corporation
Represented By: Lynn Oliver Frye
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Represented By: Erin R. Stankewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Designwrite, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Oliver Frye
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Represented By: Erin R. Stankewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth-Ayerst International, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Oliver Frye
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Represented By: Erin R. Stankewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Lederle Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Oliver Frye
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Represented By: Erin R. Stankewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of WV, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Oliver Frye
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Represented By: Erin R. Stankewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: Patricia Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solvay America, Inc.
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: Patricia Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals
Represented By: Lynn Oliver Frye
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Represented By: Erin R. Stankewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenstone LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Farrell
Represented By: Tamela J. White
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Committee for Quality Assurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American College of Physicians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klemptner Advertising, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Oliver Frye
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Represented By: Erin R. Stankewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polly Lester
Represented By: Thomas G. Wilson
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Lester
Represented By: Thomas G. Wilson
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?