December 24, 2013 |
Filing
248
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 219 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply, however, Plaintiff's request in her Surreply to "conform the pleadings to the evidence" is Denied; 204 MOTION for Summary Judgment is Granted in Part and Denied in Part; denying 202 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; Plaintiff's fraud claim that, during loan-origination process, an agent of Quicken Loans misrepresented that the loan's interest rate would not rise and the Plaintiff relied upon that claim to her detriment is Dismissed as time-barred. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/23/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
|
August 29, 2013 |
Filing
201
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 185 MOTION and 186 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/29/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party, Ms. Duncan and Ms. Jefferson) (skm)
|
August 22, 2013 |
Filing
199
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER For the reasons that follow, the Court Grants Ms. Bishop's 164 motion to quash the subpoena, but Denies her request for a protective order limiting any future deposition to one taken by means of written questions; instead, the Court Grants Quicken leave to take the deposition of Ms. Bishop by oral examination, upon amended subpoena and subject to the limitations set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/22/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
|
May 10, 2013 |
Filing
156
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 133 MOTION to Compel Production of Settlement Agreement and Related Documents Regarding the 2008 Litigation Between Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/10/2013. (cc: attys) (mkw)
|
April 25, 2013 |
Filing
152
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: Plaintiff's 134 SUBMISSION OF EXPENSES FOR REIMBURSEMENT; granting Plaintiff's request for reimbursement and directing defendant Quicken Loans, Inc., or its counsel, to reimburse Plaintiff the sum of $1037.96 within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/25/2013. (cc: attys) (mkw)
|
April 19, 2013 |
Filing
147
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER For the reasons outlined within this Order, the Court Grants in Part and Denies in Part Quicken's 117 objections to the magistrate judge's 02/11/2013 Order. The Court Grants Quicken's first objections; Denies Quicken's second and third objection. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/18/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
|
February 11, 2013 |
Filing
106
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendant's 102 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc. to Produce Complete Responses to Plaintiff's Combined Discovery Requests; granting Plaintiff's 84 MOTION to Compel Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc. to Produce Complete Responses to Plaintiff's Combined Discovery Requests and 87 MOTION to Compel Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc. to Produce a Witness for Deposition on Loan Transfer & Ownership and directing as more fully set forth herein; directing Defendant to identify, by 2/22/2013, a corporate representative who can appear for deposition and testify regarding the ownership and transfer of Plaintiff's loan; also, by 2/22/2013, Defendant shall supply Plaintiff with two or three alternative dates and times on which the deposition may take place; the deposition shall be completed as promptly as possible prior to 3/16/2013; Plaint iff also requests an extension of deadlines in the Scheduling Order; given that the District Court has just entered an Order extending the deadlines, the undersigned is hesitant to recommend additional extensions at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 2/11/2013. (cc: attys) (mkw)
|
December 5, 2012 |
Filing
73
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 62 MOTION to Convert Portions of Motion to Quash Subpoenas to a Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 46 MOTION to Quash or for Protective Order; denying Plaintiff's 46 MOTION to quash the subpoena in its entirety but directing the Defendant to modify its subpoena to Plaintiff's former employer, Highmark West Virginia Inc., as more fully set forth herein; granting Plaintiff's motion for a protective order, in part, and directing the Defendant to reissue subpoenas duces tecum to the financial institutions, which incorporate the following limitations, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/5/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
|
August 24, 2012 |
Filing
36
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 11 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/24/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (dcm)
|