Burd et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Thomas Porter, Andrea Martin, Jolene Harris, Charles T. Burd, Robert Brandon, Shane Mayfield, William S. Troutman and Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc.
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv20976
Filed: July 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Huntington Office
County: Cabell
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER granting Defendant's #494 MOTION to Allow for the Withdrawal of counsel J. Tracy Walker IV for Defendant. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 494 MOTION by J. Tracy Walker, IV to Allow for the Withdrawal of Counsel on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Bonasso, Michael)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia (WVSD) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, June 11, 2018. The WVSD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00pm (noon) on Friday, June 8, 2018 until 6:00am on Monday, June 11, 2018. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your WVSD e-filing account in the new NextGen CM/ECF system on or after June 11, 2018. Instructions for linking your account can be found at #http://www.wvsd. uscourts.gov/pdfs/NextGen/WVSD_Link_PACER_to_CM-ECF.pdf. If you have any additional questions please call the WVSD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304)-347-3111. (mwk) (ADI)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 493 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Stephanie Poli requesting removal from the Court's service list on behalf of Plaintiffs. (skh)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 492 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by John H. Gomez requesting removal from the Court's service list on behalf of Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman. (skh)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 491 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER the Court GRANTS, IN PART, DENIES, IN PART, and HOLD IN ABEYANCE, IN PART #267 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Leave to File First Amended Master Consolidated Class Action Complaint. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to consolidate Civil Actions 3:13-6529, 3:13-14207, and 3:13-20976 into a single action and to file a Consolidated Complaint, and GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to include in the Consolidated Complaint additional facts, revived claims, or new claims for any existing Plaintiffs. The Court DENIES the addition of new Plaintiffs and any claims or facts related solely to those proposed Plaintiffs. The Court further DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the removal of any existing Plaintiffs at this time. If after consideration of this Memorandum Opinion and Order, any existing Plaintiff wants to be dismissed from this action, then that Plaintiff must file a motion pursuant to Rule 41 on or before 9/23/2015. Ford must file any objection on or before 9/28. A reply shall be due on or before 9/30/2015. After the Court issues a Memorandum Opinion and Order on the remaining individual claims and any Orders of dismissal under Rule 41, the Court will direct Plaintiffs to file a revised Consolidated Complaint consistent with the Court's decisions. Plaintiffs need not revise the proposed Consolidated Complaint until further notice by the Court. However, the parties shall proceed under the proposed Consolidated Complaint to the extent it is consistent with this Opinion. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of this Court to consolidate these three actions, and the Court DESIGNATES Civil Action No. 3:13-6529 as the lead case. No new Plaintiffs should be added to the Style or docket of the Court and all existing Plaintiffs should be included or added to the lead case. The Court DIRECTS that the Consolidated for Discovery Only flag be removed and all existing Plaintiffs in Civil Action Nos. 3:13-14207 and 3:13-20976 be designated as a Consolidated Plaintiff. Hereafter, all filings shall be made only in Civil Action No. 3:13-6529, including any motions pursuant to Rule 41 that Plaintiffs may file. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/15/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skh)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order MEMBER CASE: THIS CASE HAS BEEN CONSOLIDATED WITH 3:13-cv-06529 PURSUANT TO THE #491 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ENTERED 09/15/2015. ALL FURTHER ENTRIES SHALL BE DOCKETED THEREIN. (skh)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 490 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Supplemental Responses to Nos. 1-4, 6-7 and 39-46 of Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Request for Production of Documents(Schmalzer, Bradley)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 489 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #411 MOTION to Sanction Ford Motor Company Regarding Engle Documents as more fully set forth herein; directing Defendant to supply the privilege log within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order; directing that Plaintiffs shall have through and including 9/25/2015 in which to file an affidavit of reasonable fees and costs incurred in making and arguing their motion; Defendant shall file a response within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/11/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER denying Defendant's #449 MOTION for Reconsideration of July 8, 2015 Memorandum Opinion and Order Requiring Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. Within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, Ford Motor Company shall provide Plaintiffs with convenient dates for the taking of a 30(b)(6) deposition as set forth in the 7/8/2015 Order; completion of the deposition to occur no later than 10/14/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/11/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 487 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) Corporate Representative Deposition of Defendant Ford Motor Company of Topic 78 on September 16, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Atkinson, Nathan)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 486 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Raymond Nevi on September 17, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 485 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) Corporate Representative Deposition of Defendant Ford Motor Company of Topics 15 and 27 on September 18, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Atkinson, Nathan)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 484 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Defendant Ford Motor Company's Amended Response to Request No. 30 of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Admission (Schmalzer, Bradley)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 483 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Amended Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admissions (Schmalzer, Bradley)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 482 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) Corporate Representative Deposition of Defendant Ford Motor Company of Topic 15 on September 18, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Atkinson, Nathan)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 481 EXHIBIT C by Ford Motor Company in support of #425 Response In Opposition. (Schmalzer, Bradley)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 480 EXHIBIT A by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Ford's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel. (mkw)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 479 EXHIBIT B by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of #264 SECOND MOTION to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel. (mkw)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 478 SEALED EXHIBIT A filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman pursuant to Court Order. Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel. (mkw)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 477 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #476 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on September 2, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. (klc)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 476 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on September 2, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 9/14/2015. Redaction Request due 9/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2015. (lac)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 475 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #262 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel and denying Plaintiffs' #360 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Reply to Ford's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel; directing the Clerk to seal ECF No. 262-1 (Exhibit A) and to unseal ECF Nos. 262 (Motion) and 262-2 (Exhibit B), unseal ECF Nos. 360 (Motion) and 360-1 (Exhibit A) as neither qualifies as confidential or privileged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/3/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 474 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #264 Second MOTION to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel; directing that the pages more fully set forth herein shall be de-designated as privileged; and the pages more fully set forth herein shall be designated as privileged and may be clawed back by Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/3/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 473 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/2/2015. (mkw)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 472 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Kim Palczynski on September 3, 2015 at immediately following the deposition of Advantage Technical Resourcing, Inc. (Atkinson, Nathan)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 471 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) Corporate Representative Deposition of Advantage Technical Resourcing, Inc. on September 3, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 470 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Supplemental Responses to Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Schmalzer, Bradley)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 469 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #410 MOTION to Compel, to the extent that it requests the Court to order Ford to provide a more detailed ASO privilege log; directing Ford to revise and supplement its privilege log in accordance with this opinion and Rule 26(b)(5)(A); denying Plaintiffs' request for Sanctions under Rule 37(b)(2); denying the request to find a waiver of the privilege by Ford and to compel production of the withheld documents; granting an award of reasonable expenses incurred in bringing the instant Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/28/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER directing that the Case Management Conference currently scheduled for 9/10/2015 will now be held on 9/25/2015 at 10:00 a.m.; the parties will discuss amongst themselves what issues they believe need to be addressed at the Case Management Conference; Plaintiffs counsel will submit a joint letter to the Court outlining the issues seven days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/28/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 467 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #459 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Bonasso, Michael)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 466 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Eric Luehrsen on September 2, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 465 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Thomas Dressing on September 1, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 464 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #462 TRANSCRIPT of motion hearing held on August 18, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. (klc)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 463 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Aaron Schweizerhof by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 462 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of motion hearing held on August 18, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 9/4/2015. Redaction Request due 9/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2015. (mas)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 461 MOTION HEARING held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/18/2015; Court Reporter: Mary Schweinhagen. (mkw)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 460 AFFIDAVIT of James Engle, dated 8/13/2015, filed on behalf of Ford Motor Company re: #411 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Sanction Ford Motor Company Regarding Engle Documents (Schmalzer, Bradley)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 459 RESPONSE by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in opposition to #449 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Reconsideration of July 8, 2015 #436 Memorandum Opinion and Order Requiring Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Atkinson, Nathan)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 458 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #457 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on August 5, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. (klc)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 457 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on August 5, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 8/17/2015. Redaction Request due 8/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2015. (lac)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 456 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/5/2015. (mkw)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 455 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #454 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on July 22, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. (klc)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 454 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on July 22, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 8/10/2015. Redaction Request due 8/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2015. (lac)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 453 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 452 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 451 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #447 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of telephonic status conference held on July 8, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. (klc)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2015 at 09:00 AM in Huntington before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert re: Plaintiffs' #360 MOTION to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel, #410 MOTION to Compel Defendant Ford Motor Company to Produce Documents Listed in its Supplemental ASO Privilege Log and for Sanctions and #411 Motion to Sanction Ford Motor Company Regarding Engle Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/23/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #449 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Reconsideration of July 8, 2015 #436 Memorandum Opinion and Order Requiring Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition (skh)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 449 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Reconsideration of July 8, 2015 #436 Memorandum Opinion and Order Requiring Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 448 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/22/2015. (mkw)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 447 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of telephonic status conference held on July 8, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/31/2015. Redaction Request due 8/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2015. (mas)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 446 NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBIT 3 to #411 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Sanction Ford Motor Company Regarding Engle Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Atkinson, Nathan)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 445 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #443 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of telephone discovery conference held on June 24, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. (klc)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 444 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Martin Davenport by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 443 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of telephone discovery conference held on June 24, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/27/2015. Redaction Request due 8/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2015. (mas)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 442 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS of the law firm of McGuire Woods LLP, counsel for Defendant Ford Motor Company (Schmalzer, Bradley)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 441 REPLY by Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to #425 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Deposition Testimony, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition Testimony)(Paul, Niall)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 440 REPLY by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to #429 Response In Opposition. (Paul, Niall)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER: Scheduling telephone conferences as follows: 7/22/2015 at 03:00 PM, 8/5/2015 at 03:00 PM, 8/19/2015 at 03:00 PM, 9/2/2015 at 03:00 PM, 9/16/2015 at 03:00 PM, 9/30/2015 at 03:00 PM, 10/14/2015 at 03:00 PM, and 10/28/2015 at 03:00 PM. Parties are directed to exchange agenda items by noon on the Monday preceding each conference as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/9/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (cbo)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 439 SEALED EXHIBITS filed by Plaintiffs pursuant to Court Order. EXHIBITS in support of #354 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Reconsideration of the Court's 2/10/2015 Decision on the Record Permitting Defendant's Self-Selected Searches for Responsive Documents. (Attachments: Main Document: Exhibit 10, #1 Exhibit 11, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13) (mkw)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 437 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/8/2015; Court Reporter: Mary Schweinhagen.. (skm)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 436 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Ford Motor Company's #318 MOTION to Quash; granting in part and denying in part Ford Motor Company's #318 MOTION for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #354 MOTION for Reconsideration, as more fully set forth herein; granting Plaintiffs' #363 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 10, a portion of Exhibit 11, Exhibit 12, and Exhibit 13 to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/8/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm) (Modified on 7/9/2015 to add ruling on the #363 motion in text) (mkw).
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 435 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #434 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Case Management Conference held on June 29, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. (klc)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 434 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Case Management Conference held on June 29, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/13/2015. Redaction Request due 7/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2015. (tmr)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #431 MOTION to Withdraw Appearance of Maja Lukic as one of the Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 7/1/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (skm)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 432 SCIENCE DAY held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/30/2015; Court Reporter: not reported. (trj)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 431 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Withdraw Appearance of Maja Lukic as one of the Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs (Paul, Niall)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 430 NOTICE TO TAKE CONTINUED DEPOSITIONS UNDER F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Mark Tuneff and James Engle on July 7, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. and 1:45 p.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 429 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #411 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Sanction Ford Motor Company Regarding Engle Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER rescheduling the September Case Management Conference until 9/10/2015 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/29/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 427 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/29/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER SUSPENDING the Expert Witness deadline set forth in paragraph 3 of the #153 Amended Scheduling Order and the Mediation deadline set forth in paragraph 7; the Court will reset these deadlines at a later time. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/29/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 425 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #410 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Compel Defendant Ford Motor Company to Produce Documents Listed in its Supplemental ASO Privilege Log and for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bonasso, Michael)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 424 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Responses to Plaintiffs' Fifth Request for Production of Documents (Bonasso, Michael)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 423 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/24/2015. (mkw)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 422 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #406 Reply to Response. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 421 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) Corporate Representative Deposition of Defendant Ford Motor Company on June 25, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan) (Modified on 6/23/2015 to add "second")(taq).
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 420 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #419 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on June 10, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. (klc)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 419 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on June 10, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/25/2015. Redaction Request due 7/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2015. (lac)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 418 REPLY by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to #403 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 417 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER The Court Orders that Ford must provide the ETC source code in read-only format and need not provide Plaintiffs with write access to the ETC source code; parties are Ordered to meet and confer regarding the remaining terms of the special protective order and shall tender an Agreed Order Governing Disclosure of Ford's Source Code to the undersigned no later than 06/22/2015 as outlined within this Order. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' #407 Motion for Leave to Reply and will consider plaintiffs' reply brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/12/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm) (Main Document replaced on 6/12/2015 with corrected image) (cbo). Modified text on 6/12/2015 to reflect that #407 Motion was granted (cbo).
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #417 Memorandum Opinion and Order. ERROR: Document contained error on page 2. CORRECTION: Incorrect image removed and replaced with corrected image. (cbo)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #327 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Opinion and Order Issued on 4/14/2015. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/11/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 415 AMENDED NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Advantage Technical Resourcing, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 414 NOTICE of Subpoena for Deposition of Kim Palczynski by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 413 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/10/2015. (mkw)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 412 MEMORANDUM by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of #411 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Sanction Ford Motor Company Regarding Engle Documents (Atkinson, Nathan)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Sanction Ford Motor Company Regarding Engle Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #411 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Sanction Ford Motor Company Regarding Engle Documents (skh)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 410 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Compel Defendant Ford Motor Company to Produce Documents Listed in its Supplemental ASO Privilege Log and for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Paul, Niall).
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 409 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition Duces Tecum of Advantage Technical Resourcing, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and 30(b)(6) by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 408 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #405 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Hearing re: protective order held on May 28, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. (klc)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #410 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Compel Defendant Ford Motor Company to Produce Documents Listed in its Supplemental ASO Privilege Log and for Sanctions (skh)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #407 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Leave to Reply to Ford Motor Company's June 3, 2015 Source Code Letter. (mkw)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Leave to Reply to Ford Motor Company's June 3, 2015 Source Code Letter (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Niall)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 406 REPLY by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to #328 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Allegations)(Paul, Niall)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 405 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Hearing re. protective order held on May 28, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Mary Schweinhagen, Telephone number 304-347-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/15/2015. Redaction Request due 6/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2015. (mas)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #317 MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/4/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 403 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #354 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Reconsideration of the Court's 2/10/2015 Decision on the Record Permitting Defendant's Self-Selected Searches for Responsive Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 402 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 401 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Defendant Ford Motor Company's Responses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Request for Production of Documents (Schmalzer, Bradley)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 400 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Defendant Ford Motor Company's Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Admission (Schmalzer, Bradley)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 399 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 398 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 397 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 396 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 395 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for FORD Ford Motor Company's Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories (Schmalzer, Bradley)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 394 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 393 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 392 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 391 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 390 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 389 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 388 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 387 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 386 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 385 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 384 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 383 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 382 EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST FROM PROTECTIVE ORDER HEARING by Charles T. Burd, Ford Motor Company, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman. Defendant's Exhibit Numbers: 1-3. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Exhibit #1, #2 Defendant's Exhibit #2, #3 Defendant's Exhibit #3) (cbo)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 381 HEARING re: Protective Order held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/28/2015; Court Reporter: Mary Schweinhagen. (mkw)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 380 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiffs' Fifth Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Ford Motor Company (Atkinson, Nathan)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 379 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION FOR USE OF COURTROOM TECHNOLOGY at 9:30 a.m., May 28, 2015, Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert, Huntington (Paul, Niall)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 378 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF REASONABLE PRODUCTION OF RELEVANT SOURCE CODE by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Paul, Niall)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 377 NOTICE OF INTENT TO CROSS EXAMINE PLAINTIFFS' DEMONSTRATOR WITNESS NIGEL JONES by Ford Motor Company (Schmalzer, Bradley)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 376 MEMORANDUM REGARDING SOURCE CODE PROTECTIVE ORDER by Ford Motor Company re: #206 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Protective Order Preventing the Production of Ford's Highly Confidential and Proprietary Source Code (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 375 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #353 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER rescheduling the Case Management Conference for 6/29/2015 at 1:30 p.m. and Science Day shall be held on 6/30/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/20/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 373 NOTICE of Intent to Present Technical Demonstration by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Niall)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 372 REPLY by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to #349 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Niall)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 371 SEALED RESPONSE filed by Ford Motor Company pursuant to Court Order. Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge's Opinion and Order Issued on 4/14/2015. (mkw)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER granting Ford Motor Company's #365 MOTION to Seal Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge's Opinion and Order Issued on 4/14/2015. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/18/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 369 AMENDED NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Niall)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER rescheduling the Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2015 to be held in conjunction with Science Day set for 6/11/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/18/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 367 NOTICE of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Ace Motor Sales, Inc. by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Niall)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #365 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Seal Ford Motor Company's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judges Opinion and Order Issued on April 14, 2015. (skh)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTION INCORRECTLY AND NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #365 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Seal Ford Motor Company's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge's Opinion and Order Issued on April 14, 2015 (skh)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ford Motor Company in support of #365 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Seal Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge's Opinion and Order Issued on April 14, 2015. (Schmalzer, Bradley)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 365 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Seal Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge's Opinion and Order Issued on April 14, 2015. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of #363 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal Exhibit 10, a portion of Exhibit 11, Exhibit 12, and Exhibit 13 to Plaintiffs' #354 Motion for Reconsideration (Atkinson, Nathan)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Seal Exhibit 10, a portion of Exhibit 11, Exhibit 12, and Exhibit 13 to Plaintiffs' #354 Motion for Reconsideration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit 13)(Atkinson, Nathan) (Modified on 5/14/2015 to add link to #354 motion) (skh).
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #363 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal Exhibit 10, a portion of Exhibit 11, Exhibit 12, and Exhibit 13 to Plaintiffs' #354 Motion for Reconsideration (skh)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 362 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/13/2015; Court Reporter: Cathy Schutte-Stant. (skm) (Modified on 5/14/2015 to correct the filed date and to change the court reporter from Courtflow to Cathy Schutte-Stant) (mkw).
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #360 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Reply to Ford's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel (skh)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of #360 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Reply to Ford's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel (Atkinson, Nathan)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 360 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Seal Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Reply to Ford's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Atkinson, Nathan)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 359 NOTICE of Filing of Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' #315 Reply to Ford's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Nathan)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 358 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of #354 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Reconsideration of the Court's 2/10/2015 Decision on the Record Permitting Defendant's Self-Selected Searches for Responsive Documents (Atkinson, Nathan)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 357 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Stephanie Janczak on May 21, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 356 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of David Ott on May 20, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. (Atkinson, Nathan)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MEMORANDUM by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of #354 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Reconsideration (Atkinson, Nathan)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Reconsideration of the Court's 2/10/2015 Decision on the Record Permitting Defendant's Self-Selected Searches for Responsive Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Atkinson, Nathan)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 353 RESPONSE by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in Opposition to #318 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Quash Notice of Deposition and for Protective Order Regarding Topic Nos. 15, 18, 78 and 79. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Paul, Niall)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #354 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Reconsideration of the Court's 2/10/2015 Decision on the Record Permitting Defendant's Self-Selected Searches for Responsive Documents. (skh)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 352 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 351 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 350 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 349 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #317 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 348 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Ford Motor Company (Atkinson, Nathan)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 347 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Ford Motor Company (Atkinson, Nathan)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 346 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Ford Motor Company (Atkinson, Nathan)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 345 RESPONSE by Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in opposition to #312 Objection to Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court Dated April 3, 2015 by Ford Motor Company re: #305 Memorandum Opinion and Order (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 338 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 337 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 336 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 335 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 331 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 329 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #267 MOTION by Robert Agris, Tony Burnett, John E. Grimaldi, Samuel Hairston, Rhoda Jeffers, Timothy Matthews, Mary Phippen, Jonathan Poma, Shelley Riley, George Shaffer for Leave to File First Amended Master Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hanna, William)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 327 SEALED OBJECTIONS filed by plaintiffs pursuant to Court Order. Objections to Magistate Judge's Opinion and Order Issued on April 14, 2015. (mkw)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 326 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/29/2015; Court Reporter: Cathy Schutte-Stant. (skm) (Modified on 4/30/2015 to correct the court reporter's name in text) (mkw).
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting #323 MOTION to Seal Objections of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/29/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of #323 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Seal Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge's Opinion and Order Issued on April 14, 2015 (Paul, Niall)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 323 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Seal Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge's Opinion and Order Issued on April 14, 2015. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 322 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Supplemental Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 1, 4-5, 8-9, 12, and 14, and Amended Supplemental Answer to Interrogatory No. 14 of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories(Schmalzer, Bradley)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 321 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Second Supplemental Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 4, 7 and 8, and Amended Supplemental Answer to Interrogatory NO. 4 of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories (Schmalzer, Bradley)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 320 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Second Supplemental Responses to Request Nos. 1, 5, 6, 10, 18-20, 31-32, 34, 38-41, 48, 50, 54, 56-59, 64-71, 73, 75-76 and 81-85, and Amended Supplemental Response to Request No. 1 of Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents (Schmalzer, Bradley)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Supplemental Responses to Request Nos. 1-4, 7-12, 14-24, 26-29, 33-39, 43-46, 51, 53 and 57, Amended Response to Request No. 17, and Amended Supplemental Response to Request Nos. 1, 33, and 43-45 of Plaintiff's First Set of Request for Production of Documents (Schmalzer, Bradley)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Quash Notice of Deposition and for Protective Order Regarding Topic Nos. 15, 18, 78 and 79 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 317 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Protective Order (Atkinson, Nathan)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #317 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Protective Order and #318 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Quash Notice of Deposition and for Protective Order Regarding Topic Nos. 15, 18, 78 and 79. (skh)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford's Second Supplemental Responses to Request Nos. 1, 2, 7 and 8 and First Supplemental Responses to Request No. 9 of Plaintiffs Third Set of Request for Production of Documents. (Schmalzer, Bradley)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 315 REPLY by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to #306 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Placeholder)(Atkinson, Nathan)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER The Court Schedules a Science Day for Thursday 06/11/2015, at 9:00am; the Court Directs the parties to meet and confer to develop a joint plan of what subject areas will be presented, identify what experts will be explaining each topic area, and submit the joint plan to the Court on or before 06/01/2015; the parties may select a neutral expert to discuss a particular topic or the parties may bring their own experts; the Court cautions that the presentations must be from the experts, not the lawyers; in addition, as Science Day is designed to be an informal educational proceeding, nothing may be used for any litigation purpose. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/17/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER The Court Orders the following with respect to Defendant's forthcoming motion to dismiss with respect to Plaintiffs' First Amended Master Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Defendant is granted leave to file a memorandum of law up to 75 pages in length in support of its forthcoming motion; Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a memorandum of law of up to 75 pages in length in response to Defendant's motion; Defendant is granted leave to file a memorandum of law of up to 25 pages in length in reply to Plaintiff's response; Defendant shall have until 05/01/2015, to file its motions to dismiss; Plaintiffs shall have until 06/05/2015, to file their response; Defendant shall have until 06/19/2015, to file any reply. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/17/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 312 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION TO DISTRICT COURT DATED APRIL 3, 2015 by Ford Motor Company re: #305 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (Bonasso, Michael) (Modified on 4/17/2015 to add link to #305 order) (skh).
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER It is hereby Ordered that the effect of the #307 Memorandum Opinion and Order is Stayed pending resolution of the objections by the presiding District Judge; the parties shall be bound by the mandates of the Clawback Order and Fed. R. Civ.P. 26(b)(5)(B) until the matter is resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/16/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 310 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/15/2015. (mkw)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 309 EXHIBIT B filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman pursuant to Court Order. Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' #242 MOTION to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel. (mkw)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #240 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel; directing that the document be sealed and remain sealed until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/15/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #242 MOTION to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel and Ford is entitled to clawback the Logel document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/14/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 306 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #264 SECOND MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Schmalzer, Bradley)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #206 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Protective Order Preventing the Production of Ford's Highly Confidential and Proprietary Source Code; granting to the extent that it requests a protective order, separate from the universal protective order already entered in this case; directing the parties to meet and confer regarding the terms of the special protective order and shall tender an Agreed Order Governing Disclosure of Ford's Source Code to the undersigned by 4/13/2015; if the parties cannot agree on the terms, they shall submit their respective versions to the undersigned by electronic mail no later than 12:00 noon on 4/13/2015, and the disputed issues shall be addressed at the regularly scheduled telephone conference on 4/15/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/3/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 304 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #303 TRANSCRIPT of Case Management Conference held on April 1, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. (klc)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 303 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Case Management Conference held on April 1, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 4/13/2015. Redaction Request due 4/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2015. (tmr)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 302 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 301 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 300 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 298 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 296 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 295 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 292 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 291 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 289 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 287 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 286 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Schedule A)(Paul, Niall)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/1/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MOTION HEARING held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/1/2015; Court Reporter: Lisa Cook. (skm) Modified on 4/2/2015 to correct name of court reporter. (knb)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 281 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 280 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 279 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 275 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 274 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 273 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 272 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTICE of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting #261 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Leave to Withdraw Appearance of Caitlin Duffy as One of the Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/30/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MEMORANDUM by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of #267 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Leave to File First Amended Master Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Paul, Niall)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Leave to File First Amended Master Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Paul, Niall)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 REPLY by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to #259 Response In Opposition. (Atkinson, Nathan)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MEMORANDUM by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of #264 SECOND MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel (Paul, Niall)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 SECOND MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Paul, Niall).
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of #262 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Seal Exhibits A and B to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel (Paul, Niall)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Seal Exhibits A and B to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Paul, Niall)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Leave to Withdraw Appearance of Caitlin Duffy as One of the Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs (Paul, Niall)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Stephen J. Fearon on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-3780216. (Paul, Niall)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #262 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal Exhibits A and B to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Comel and #264 SECOND MOTION by Plaintiffs to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel (skh)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #242 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bonasso, Michael)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., for Plaintiff Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc.'s Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Request for Production of Documents (Paul, Niall) (Modified on 3/24/2015 to remove additional filers) (taq).
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd for Plaintiff Charles Burd's Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Paul, Niall) (Modified on 3/24/2015 to remove additional filers) (taq).
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/18/2015; Court reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (mkw)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Jill Crawley Griset on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Local counsel: Bradley J. Schmalzer. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-3773854. (Schmalzer, Bradley)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Admissions (Schmalzer, Bradley) (Modified on 3/17/2015 to remove duplicate text) (taq).
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE MASTER COMPLAINT granting Plaintiffs' #252 MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Master Complaint; Plaintiffs may have until 3/27/2015 to file their Master Complaint, the accompanying documents, and the Rule 15 Motion. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/12/2015. (cc: attys) (skm)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Extension of Time to File the Master Complaint to March 27, 2015 (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Niall)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #169 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents to the extent set forth herein; directing Defendant to supplement its response to Request for Production of Documents No. 9 in accordance with the ruling of the Court made during the 3/4/2015 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/10/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER directing that Defendant shall file its response to the #242 MOTION to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel by 3/20/2015; Plaintiffs shall have through and including 3/27/2015 in which to file a reply memorandum; Oral argument re: Plaintiffs' #242 MOTION to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel shall take place on 4/1/2015 at 02:00 PM in Huntington before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/10/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Defendant Ford Motor Company on March 23, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit(s) Schedule A)(Atkinson, Nathan) (Modified on 3/10/2015 to add deponent, date and time and to convert event to "amended deposition")(taq).
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admissions (Schmalzer, Bradley)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 247 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/4/2015; Court Reporter: Courtflow.. (skm)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HARD COPY DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY-STORED INFORMATION The Court Orders that the parties shall produce hard copy documents and electronic files in this case as outlined within this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/4/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Corporate Representative of Defendant Ford Motor Company on March 10, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Schedule A)(Atkinson, Nathan) (Modified on 3/5/2015 to add deponent, date and time and to convert event to "amended deposition") (taq).
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Corporate Representative of Defendant Ford Motor Company on March 11, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Schedule A)(Atkinson, Nathan) (Modified on 3/5/2015 to add deponent, date and time and to convert event to "amended deposition") (taq).
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #240 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Seal Exhibit B to and #242 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel (skh)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MEMORANDUM by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of #242 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel (Paul, Niall)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Paul, Niall).
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of #240 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Seal Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel. (Paul, Niall)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Seal Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' Motion to Challenge Confidential Designation and to Compel. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit B)(Paul, Niall)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Thomas C. Jones on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-3720830. (Paul, Niall)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Timothy C. Gaarder on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-3720817. (Paul, Niall)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Charles T. Burd (Schmalzer, Bradley)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., and/or David Hasenzahl (Schmalzer, Bradley)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Robert Harris on March 9, 2015 at 1:00 p.m. ET (Schmalzer, Bradley)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #218 Response In Opposition. (Schmalzer, Bradley)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Corporate Representative of Defendant Ford Motor Company on March 5, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Schedule A)(Atkinson, Nathan) (Modified on 2/20/2015 to add deponent, date and time; and to convert event to "amended") (taq).
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 2/18/2015; Court Reporter: Terry Ruffner. (skm) (Modified on 3/2/2015 to correct court reporter information.) (klc).
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Said Deep on March 6, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. EST(Paul, Niall)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Corporate Representative of Defendant Ford Motor Company on February 25, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Schedule A)(Atkinson, Nathan) (Modified on 2/20/2015 to add deponent, date and time; and convert event to "amended") (taq).
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Corporate Representative of Defendant Ford Motor Company on February 26, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Schedule A)(Atkinson, Nathan) (Modified on 2/20/2015 to add deponent, date and time; and to convert event to "amended) (taq).
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #227 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/04/2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Carol Farrell, Telephone number 304-347-3188. (klc)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/04/2015, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Carol Farrell, Telephone number 304-347-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 3/2/2015. Redaction Request due 3/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2015. (caf)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS to #225 Amended Notice F.R.C.P 30(b)(6) Corporate Representative Deposition of Defendant Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company (Bonasso, Michael)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Corporate Representative of Defendant Ford Motor Company on February 17, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Schedule A)(Atkinson, Nathan) (Modified on 2/20/2015 to add deponent, date and time) (taq).
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Greg Oswalt on February 19, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. (Paul, Niall)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Philip Moore on February 18, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. (Paul, Niall)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Ford Motor Company (Paul, Niall)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER pursuant to the Case Management Conference held on 1/22/2015, directing the parties to proceed as follows: Plaintiffs to file a motion to file a Master Complaint by 3/13/2015, and as set forth more fully herein; Ford shall have 21 days after Plaintiffs file their motion to file a single brief identifying any objection it has to the motion, together with any alternative arguments Ford has under Rule 12; Plaintiffs shall have 14 days to file a single brief with a reply to any objections, together with a response to any arguments Ford has made pursuant to Rule 12; and Ford shall have 7 days to file a reply to any Rule 12 response made by Plaintiffs; the ordinary page limitations on briefing to apply unless an extension is requested by a party and granted by the Court. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/11/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #161 and #162 MOTIONS to Compel; Defendant is Ordered to supplement its responses to discovery requests in accordance with the rulings of the Court made during the hearings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 2/11/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 DISCOVERY HEARING held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 2/10/2015; Court Reporter: Terry Ruffner. (skm) Modified on 3/1/2015 to correct date of hearing held. (knb)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 218 RESPONSE by Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in opposition to #206 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Protective Order Preventing the Production of Ford's Highly Confidential and Proprietary Source Code (Paul, Niall)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 2/4/2015; Court Reporter: Carol Farrell. (skm) (Modified on 2/18/2015 to correct date of hearing and court reporter information.) (klc)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Ford Motor Company (Paul, Niall)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 POSITION STATEMENT ON AVOIDING DUPLICATIVE BRIEFING by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in Response to the Court's #208 Order. (Attachment: #1 Transcript)(Paul, Niall)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 214 Partial Filing Fee Received. Error: Document filed incorrectly in this case. Correction: Removed image and filed in 3:14-cv-25533. (mkw)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (skm) (Modified on 1/30/2015 to remove image, document filed incorrectly in this case; transferred to 3:14-cv-25533) (mkw).
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER At the Management Conference held on 01/22/2015, the Court discussed with the parties the possibility of immediately consolidating the above-styled cases for all pretrial purposes under one style designated as In re Ford; after discussions with the Clerk of this Court, it was learned that the clerical act of consolidating all three cases will require moving all the parties from the cases to be consolidated into one civil action designated as the lead case; therefore, until the issue of whether a Master Complaint will be granted and the matter of party alignment is resolved, the Court will not consolidate these cases under one style; in addition, when Plaintiffs file their proposed Master Complaint, they should include all parties from the cases being consolidated in the style of the Master Complaint; therefore, if the Court grants the filing of the Master Complaint; the Court will realign the parties and redesignate the short style as In re Ford. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/29/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION PROTOCOL directing that the deposition protocol be followed in depositions as outlined within this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/29/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF PRIVILEGED OR CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS. The Court Orders that the following procedures shall govern the production of privileged or confidential documents as outlined within this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/29/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 POSITION STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S ORAL MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Ford Motor Company in Response to the Court's #208 Order (Hanna, William)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #207 TRANSCRIPT of Case Management Conference held on January 22, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. (klc)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER directing Ford to file a one-page statement by 1/28/2015 stating whether or not it will oppose a motion to amend; Plaintiffs shall file their response by 1/30/2015; further reminding counsel that the next Case Management Conference is set for 4/2/2015 at 1:30 p.m. and directing that any materials that either party intends to present at the conference be disclosed to opposing counsel seven days in advance of the hearing. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/26/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
January 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Case Management Conference held on January 22, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/5/2015. Redaction Request due 2/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2015. (tmr)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Protective Order Preventing the Production of Ford's Highly Confidential and Proprietary Source Code (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bonasso, Michael)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on October 30, 2014, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/2/2015. Redaction Request due 2/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2015. (lac)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #206 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Protective Order Preventing the Production of Ford's Highly Confidential and Proprietary Source Code (skh)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for FORD MOTOR COMPANYS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (Bonasso, Michael)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for FORD MOTOR COMPANYS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (Bonasso, Michael)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for FORD MOTOR COMPANYS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (Bonasso, Michael)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for FORD MOTOR COMPANYS SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES (Bonasso, Michael)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 200 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for FORD MOTOR COMPANYS SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (Bonasso, Michael)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/22/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 DISCOVERY STATUS TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/21/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (skm) (Modified on 1/22/2015 to correct the name of the court reporter) (mkw).
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 REPLY by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to #190 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Niall)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 REPLY by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to #189 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Niall)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting #194 MOTION to Excuse Sponsoring Attorney from in Person Attendance at Depositions; the Sponsoring Attorney or such Sponsoring Attorney's Legal Designee may participate in depositions by telephone. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/15/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Excuse Sponsoring Attorney from In Person Attendance at Depositions (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Rule 8)(Atkinson, Nathan)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Jolene Harris on January 14, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. CST (Schmalzer, Bradley)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #117 and #118 MOTIONS to Compel; Defendant is Ordered to supplement its responses to discovery requests in accordance with the rulings of the Court made during the 12/17/2014 and 1/7/2015 hearings; Defendant is Ordered to file a motion for protective order on the issue of the production of its source code by 1/23/2015; the parties are further Ordered to meet and confer so the following items will be ready to submit by 01/22/2015: a proposed agreed ESI protocol; a proposed clawback agreement and a proposed agreed deposition protocol; next discovery conference scheduled on 01/21/2015 currently scheduled to begin at 3:00PM, shall instead begin at 2:00PM; that conference shall be by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/9/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/7/2015; Court Reporter: Terry Ruffner. (skm)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #169 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Hanna, William)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #162 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Hanna, William)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting Defendant Ford Motor Company's #187 MOTION to Excuse Sponsoring Attorney from in Person Attendance at Depositions; the Sponsoring Attorney may participate in depositions by telephone. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/5/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Excuse Sponsoring Attorney from in Person Attendance at Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hanna, William)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Jolene Harris on January 14, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. CST (Bonasso, Michael)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of William Troutman on January 9, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. CST (Bonasso, Michael)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Thomas Porter's Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Request for Production (Paul, Niall)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Thomas Porter's Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories (Paul, Niall)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Hasen Design Building & Development, Inc. and/or David Hasenzahl's Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Request for Production (Paul, Niall)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Hasen Design Building & Development, Inc. and/or David Hasenzahl's Responses to DEfendant Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories (Paul, Niall)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff William S. Troutman's Objections and Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Request for Production (Paul, Niall)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff William S. Troutman's Answers and Objections to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories (Paul, Niall)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Jolene Harris' Objections and Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Request for Production (Paul, Niall)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Jolene Harris' Answers and Objections to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories (Paul, Niall)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Malcolm T. Brown on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-3589191. (Paul, Niall)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER directing that bi-weekly discovery conferences would be beneficial in this litigation as outlined within this Order; the first conference will be conducted with counsel attending in person on 01/07/2015 at 10:00AM in Huntington; Counsel should be prepared to spend several hours at this initial conference with a goal toward resolving all outstanding discovery issues; the remainder of the conferences will be conducted telephonically and are scheduled as follows: 01/21/2015, 02/04/2015, 02/18/2015 at 3:00PM, 03/04/2015 at 3:00PM, 03/18/2015 at 3:00PM, 04/01/2015 at 3:00PM, 04/15/2015 at 3:00PM, 04/29/2015 at 3:00PM, 05/13/2015 at 3:00PM, 05/27/2015 at 3:00PM, 06/10/2015 at 3:00PM and 06/24/2015 at 3:00PM; the telephonic conferences will each last approximately one hour; at the end of June, the Court and Counsel will assess the need for continued conferences. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/18/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Andrea Martin's Amended Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Request for Production (Paul, Niall)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Andrea Martin's Amended Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories (Paul, Niall)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 DISCOVERY HEARING held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/17/2014; Court Reporter: Courtflow. (skm)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Bradley D. Honnold on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-3577087. (Paul, Niall)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Anne M. Tarvin on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-3577085. (Paul, Niall)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Paul, Niall)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Pete Misangyi on December 17, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. (Paul, Niall)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #169 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents (skh)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)(Atkinson, Nathan)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Pete Misangyi on December 17, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. (Paul, Niall)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Kelly Arbanas on December 16, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. (Paul, Niall)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman of Glenn Humphries on December 15, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. (Paul, Niall)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 OBJECTION by Ford Motor Company to Plaintiffs' Request for Informal Conference to Seek Unspecified Guidance from the Magistrate Judge (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonasso, Michael) (Modified on 12/4/2014 to convert event to objection) (skh).
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #161 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel Answers to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories and #162 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents (skh)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Paul, Niall)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MOTION by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Compel Answers to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Paul, Niall)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Defendant Ford Motor Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Request for Production of Documents (Bonasso, Michael)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company.(Bonasso, Michael) (Modified on 11/29/2014 to add jury demand) (skh).
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Shane Mayfield's Supplemental Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Request for Production (Paul, Niall)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Charles Burd's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Request for Production (Paul, Niall)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Shane Mayfield's Supplemental Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories (Paul, Niall)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Charles Burd's Supplemental Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories (Paul, Niall)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of David Hasenzahl on December 3, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. ET (Hanna, William)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Scheduling Case Management Conferences for the following dates, as more fully set forth herein; all Case Management Conferences shall be in person unless the parties and the Court agree otherwise; directing that Plaintiffs' counsel submit a joint letter to the Court outlining the issues; the letter should be submitted to the Court seven days prior to the Case Management Conference; Discovery requests to be completed by 9/15/2015, and all depositions by 11/2/2015. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 7/31/2015, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 8/21/2015, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 9/14/2015. Class Certification Motions due by Plaintiffs by 12/1/2015; Defendant's Response shall be due by 1/13/2016; Plaintiffs' Reply due by 2/25/2016. Daubert Motions due by 4/25/2016; Responses due by 5/9/2016; Replies due by 5/16/2016. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 7/1/2016, any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Mediation to be concluded by 8/5/2015. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 9/2/2016. Plaintiffs' portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendant due by 9/6/2016, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2016 at 01:30 PM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charge due by 10/17/2016. Final Settlement Conference at 10:00 AM on 10/31/2016 in Huntington. Trial set for 11/1/2016 at 08:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; further canceling the Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2014. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/25/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/24/2014. (lca)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Shane Mayfield on November 25, 2014 at 10:00 am CT (Hanna, William)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Interrogatories to Thomas Porter (Hanna, William)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Request for Production of Documents to Thomas Porter (Hanna, William)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Interrogatories to William S. Troutman (Hanna, William)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Request for Production of Documents to William S. Troutman (Hanna, William)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Interrogatories to Hasen Design Building & Development, Inc. and/or David Hasenzahl (Hanna, William)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Request for Production of Documents to Hasen Design Building & Development, Inc. and/or David Hasenzahl (Hanna, William)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Interrogatories to Jolene Harris (Hanna, William)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Request for Production of Documents to Jolene Harris (Hanna, William)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #106 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Compel Written Discovery Responses from Plaintiffs Shane Mayfield and Charles Burd as set forth herein; the plaintiffs shall serve their supplemental response on Ford within 7 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/18/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #113 MOTION for Leave to Submit Additional Supplemental Authority Regarding the Disputed Claims. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/18/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER the following counts are dismissed in this complaint, as more fully set forth herein; directing plaintiff Robert Brandon terminated by the Clerk of this Court; as the lead plaintiffs have been dismissed in each of the three cases, the next named remaining plaintiffs in the three cases shall be designated as the lead plaintiff in the style of each case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/14/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 REPLY by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to #128 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Paul, Niall)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 REPLY by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to #127 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Paul, Niall)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Shane Mayfield on 11/25/14 at 10:00 CT (Hanna, William)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Thomas Porter on 11/24/14 at 11:15 ET (Hanna, William)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Andrea Martin on 12/9/14 at 9:00 am (Hanna, William)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Shane Mayfield on 11/25/14 at 9:00 am CT (Hanna, William)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for FORD MOTOR COMPANYS SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER TO INTERROGATORY NO. 6 OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (Bonasso, Michael)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Stacey Kelly Breen on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-3513280. (Paul, Niall)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Maja Lukic on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-3513266. (Paul, Niall)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for FORD MOTOR COMPANYS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (Bonasso, Michael)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for FORD MOTOR COMPANYS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES (Bonasso, Michael)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #118 MOTION by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Compel Responses to Requests for Production (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5, #2 Exhibits 6-10, #3 Exhibit 11)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #117 MOTION by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Compel Answers to Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5, #2 Exhibits 6-10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Subpoena)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR VEHICLE INSPECTIONS The Court Grants the #84 Motion to compel vehicle inspections; Plaintiffs' counsel shall notify Defendant's counsel no later than Tuesday, 11/04/2014 of any specific objections Plaintiffs have to Ford's inspection protocol based on the potential for alteration, damage, or destruction; the parties shall have through Thursday, 11/06/2014 to resolve any objections; unresolved objections shall be presented to the undersigned by telephone conference Friday, 11/07/2014 before 2:00 PM; directing each Plaintiff in this litigation to preserve intact and substantially unchanged the vehicle that forms the basis of the Plaintiff's claims, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/3/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER rescheduling the telephone conference to 11/24/2014 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/30/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION HEARING held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 10/30/2014, re: #84 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Compel Vehicle Inspections. Court Reporter: Lisa Cook. (mkw)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #120 Response In Opposition. (Bonasso, Michael)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Ford Motor Company (Atkinson, Nathan)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RESPONSE by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in opposition to #106 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Compel Written Discovery Responses from Plaintiffs Shane Mayfield and Charles Burd (Atkinson, Nathan)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER re: #84 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Compel Vehicle Inspections; Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2014 at 02:00 PM in Huntington before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 10/20/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #117 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, #118 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Compel Responses to Requests for Production. (skh)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Compel Responses to Requests for Production (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Atkinson, Nathan)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Compel Answers to Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Atkinson, Nathan)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Motion Hearing held on October 9, 2014, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/27/2014. Redaction Request due 11/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2015. (tmr)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Request for Production of Documents to Andrea Martin (Hanna, William)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories to Plaintiff Andrea Martin (Hanna, William)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Leave to Submit Additional Supplemental Authority Regarding the Disputed Claims (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Order Denying Ford's Motion to Dismiss)(Paul, Niall)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 PROTECTIVE ORDER Setting forth the terms for the handling on confidential documents. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/15/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 PROPOSED ORDER Agreed Protective Order by Ford Motor Company, All Plaintiffs (Bonasso, Michael) (Modified on 10/15/2014 to add all plaintiffs as filers) (skh).
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying #85 MOTION to Modify Scheduling and Grants Plaintiffs' oral motion to set a telephone conference; accordingly, the Court Schedules a telephone conference with lead counsel for the parties on Monday, 11/03/2014 at 10:00AM; the Court Orders Plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the call with defense counsel and the Court; as the Court is permitting the parties to appear by telephone, the Court Directs that only lead counsel for each party participate in the call; the Court further Orders the parties discuss amongst themselves what issues they believe need addressed at the telephone conference and for Plaintiffs' counsel to submit a joint letter to the Court outlining those issues upon which they agree and any issues they disagree, with an outline of each parties' position; the letter should be submitted to the Court on or before 10/29/2014, but it should not be filed. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/10/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION HEARING held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/10/2014; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 PLAINTIFFS' LIMITED RESPONSIVE BRIEF ON ONE DISPUTED CLAIM by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to the Court's #57 Order. (skm)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #87 MOTION for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority Regarding the Disputed Claims and #94 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Limited Responsive Brief on one Disputed Claim. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/8/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (skm)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Compel Written Discovery Responses from Plaintiffs Shane Mayfield and Charles Burd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bonasso, Michael)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #106 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Compel Written Discovery Responses from Plaintiffs Shane Mayfield and Charles Burd (skh)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 REPLY by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to #98 Response In Opposition. (Paul, Niall)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Charles Burd's Supplemental Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Requests for Production (Paul, Niall)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Defendant Ford Motor Company's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Request for Production of Documents (Bonasso, Michael)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Defendant Ford Motor Company's Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Bonasso, Michael)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Charles Burd's Amended Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories (Paul, Niall)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Ford Motor Company (Atkinson, Nathan)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Ford Motor Company (Atkinson, Nathan)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #94 MOTION by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Limited Responsive Brief on One Disputed Claim (Bonasso, Michael)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #96 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hanna, William)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 RESPONSE by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in opposition to #84 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Compel Vehicle Inspections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Paul, Niall)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Charles T. Burd on October 14, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. EDT (Bonasso, Michael)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Limited Responsive Brief on One Disputed Claim, with proposed document attached (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Niall)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #90 Response In Opposition. (Bonasso, Michael)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Perry Watson Miles IV on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Local counsel: Michael Bonasso. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-3452494. (Bonasso, Michael)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER rescheduling the hearing currently set for 9/25/2014 to 10/09/2014 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/19/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 RESPONSE by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in opposition to #85 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Modify #69 Scheduling Order (Paul, Niall)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting the #86 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw Appearance of Aleksandra M.S. Vold as one of the Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/17/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBIT A by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of #87 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority Regarding the Disputed Claims. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Niall)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority Regarding the Disputed Claims (Paul, Niall)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION by Siprut PC for Leave to Withdraw Appearance of Aleksandra M.S. Vold as one of the Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Siprut, Joseph)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Modify #69 Scheduling Order (Bonasso, Michael)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Compel Vehicle Inspections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Bonasso, Michael)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #84 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Compel Vehicle Inspections (skh)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Shane Mayfield's Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Request for Production (Paul, Niall)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Charles Burd's Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Request for Production (Paul, Niall)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Shane Mayfield's Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories (Paul, Niall)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiff Charles Burd's Responses to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories (Paul, Niall)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPLY BRIEF ON DISPUTED CLAIMS by Ford Motor Company to #78 Responsive Brief on Disputed Claims. (Bonasso, Michael)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESPONSIVE BRIEF ON DISPUTED CLAIMS by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman re: #66 Opening Brief on Disputed Claims. (Paul, Niall) (Modified on 8/8/2014 to correct link to #66 brief) (skh).
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiffs' First Set of Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Ford Motor Company (Paul, Niall)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Ford Motor Company (Paul, Niall)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Paul, Niall)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Bonasso, Michael)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Interrogatories to Burd (Hanna, William)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Request for Production of Documents to Mayfield (Hanna, William)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Request for Production of Documents to Burd (Hanna, William)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Interrogatories to Mayfield (Hanna, William)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SCHEDULING ORDER Joinder and Amendments finding that future motions to join and amend must satisfy the requirements of both Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) and 15(a). Class Certification Motions due by 1/30/2015. Discovery requests to be completed by 6/2/2015, and all depositions by 7/17/2015. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 5/18/2015, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 6/17/2015, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 7/2/2015. Mediation to be concluded by 9/1/2015. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 7/30/2015, any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Daubert Motions due by 8/25/2015. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 10/9/2015. Plaintiffs' portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 10/19/2015, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 10/26/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2015 at 09:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charge due by 11/5/2015. Final Settlement Conference at 09:30 AM on 11/16/2015 in Huntington. Trial set for 11/17/2015 at 08:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; designating this action as a complex case and scheduling a case-management conference to be held on 12/8/2014 at 1:30 p.m. in Huntington; directing the parties to meet and confer by 8/15/2014 to discuss electronically stored information. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 7/25/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (skm)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER For reasons appearing before the Court, the Court Cancels the Scheduling Conference currently set for 07/28/2014 at 9:30AM; the Court further Schedules a hearing on 09/25/2014 at 1:00PM; at the hearing, the Court will consider arguments on the supplemental briefing submitted by the parties on what Plaintiffs and/or claims remain in light of the Memorandum Opinion and Order entered on 03/31/2014. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 7/18/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (skm)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman, Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Paul, Niall) (Modified on 7/15/2014 to add party filer) (skh).
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 OPENING BRIEF ON DISPUTED CLAIMS by Ford Motor Company in Response to the Court's #63 Order and Notice. (Bonasso, Michael)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting the parties' #64 JOINT MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations for Supplemental Briefs on Disputed Claims; directing that Defendant may file a single 25-page supplemental omnibus brief on all disputed claims identified in the Joint Reports filed by the parties in this matter, and that Plaintiffs may file a single, 25-page omnibus response to Ford's brief. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 7/2/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 JOINT MOTION by Ford Motor Company, All Plaintiffs for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations for Supplemental Briefs on Disputed Claims (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Bonasso, Michael) (Modified on 7/1/2014 to add party filers) (skh).
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/7/2014. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/14/2014. Scheduling/status Conference at 09:30 AM on 7/28/2014 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 8/7/2014. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 8/11/2014; directing Defendant to file a supplemental brief on or before 07/07/2014, on all claims identified in the "Causes of Action in Dispute" column; Plaintiffs' response brief shall be due on or before 08/07/2014; Defendant's reply brief shall be due on or before 08/21/2014. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (skm)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 JOINT REPORT by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman, Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Joint Report)(Paul, Niall) (Modified on 4/25/2014 to add party filer) (skh).
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER directing the parties to confer by 4/22/2014 to discuss which Plaintiffs and what claims remain and to file a joint report with the Court by 4/25/2014 identifying those Plaintiffs who experienced sudden unintended accelerations and what claims the parties agree survive; to the extent the parties disagree on whether a particular Plaintiff and/or particular claim survives, directing the parties to identify those Plaintiffs and claims as being in dispute; once the Court reviews those claims, it will set a briefing schedule to resolve the matter. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/1/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying Ford Motor Company's #52 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority and Information Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/31/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying Ford Motor Company's #15 MOTION to Strike Objectionable Paragraphs in Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/31/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' #4 MOTION Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23(g) to Appoint Plaintiff's Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Steering Committee and #43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/31/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Ford Motor Company's #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; the Court will enter an Order with respect to further scheduling of the remaining matters in this case in the near future. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/31/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for pro se and non-electronic filers re #55 Transcript of Proceedings of Argument on Motion to Dismiss held on February 6, 2014. (klc)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Argument on Motion to Dismiss held on February 6, 2014, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 3/7/2014. Redaction Request due 3/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2014. (tmr)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in opposition to #52 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Strike #51 Notice of Supplemental Authority and Information Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Paul, Niall)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Caitlin Duffy on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-3031447. (Paul, Niall)
February 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Strike #51 Notice of Supplemental Authority and Information Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Bonasso, Michael)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority and Information Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Paul, Niall)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION HEARING held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/6/2014; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 MOTION to Continue Hearing on #13 Motion to Dismiss; Motion hearing reset for 02/06/2014 at 10:00AM. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/10/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)(Bonasso, Michael)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2014 at 01:00 PM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers, re: #13 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Dismiss #1 Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/6/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (skm)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to #45 Memorandum In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Paul, Niall)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #43 MOTION by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Preliminary Injunction (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Feb 2011 NHTSA ETC Report)(Bonasso, Michael)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of #43 MOTION by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Preliminary Injunction (Paul, Niall)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Oct. 6, 2011 US DOT Review of the Office of Defects Investigation, #2 Exhibit B - Jan. 3, 2002 US DOT Review of the Office of Defects Investigation, #3 Exhibit C - Apr. 26, 2010 Unintended Acceleration in Passenger Vehicles, #4 Exhibit D - Jones v. Ford Motor Co., #5 Exhibit E - Ford Service Investigation Reports, #6 Exhibit F - Oct. 21, 1986 Ford EED Presentation to Technical Affairs Committee Meeting, #7 Exhibit G - Jenk v. Ford Motor Co. - Ford's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Admissions, #8 Exhibit H - Apr. 13, 2012 Federal Regulators Want Brake-Override Systems in All Cars, #9 Exhibit I - May 13, 2010 EMI Management Report, #10 Exhibit J - 2012 Ford Focus Owner's Manual, #11 Exhibit K - 2011 Toyota 4Runner Owner's Manual, #12 Exhibit L - Apr. 18, 2005 Letter from Jim Engle, #13 Exhibit M - Master Owner Relations Systems Concern Report, #14 Exhibit N - Mar. 2, 2005 CQIS Report, #15 Exhibit O - May 11, 2005 CQIS Report, #16 Exhibit P - Apr. 4, 2005 CQIS Report, #17 Exhibit Q - Instructions: How to Stop Your Car if it Unexpectedly Speeds Up, #18 Exhibit R - Unreported Cases)(Paul, Niall)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #38 Response In Opposition. (Bonasso, Michael)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #37 Response In Opposition. (Bonasso, Michael)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Jeff A. Almeida on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2676527. (Paul, Niall)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Kyle J. McGee on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2676522. (Paul, Niall)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in opposition to #13 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Dismiss #1 Class Action Complaint (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Niall)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in opposition to #15 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Strike Objectionable Paragraphs in #1 Class Action Complaint (Paul, Niall)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Clell C. Warriner, III on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2657205. (Paul, Niall)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from John Scarola on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2657191. (Paul, Niall)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Robert F. DiCello on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2657181. (Paul, Niall)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Mark A. DiCello on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2657166. (Paul, Niall)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ford Motor Company (Bonasso, Michael)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Tennille J. Checkovich on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Local counsel: Michael Bonasso. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2652537. (Bonasso, Michael)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Peter J. Fazio on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Local counsel: Michael Bonasso. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2652523. (Bonasso, Michael)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from S. Virginia Bondurant on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Local counsel: Michael Bonasso. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2652504. (Bonasso, Michael)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from J. Tracy Walker IV on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Local counsel: Michael Bonasso. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2652489. (Bonasso, Michael)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Mark H. Troutman on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2639004. (Paul, Niall)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Gregory M. Travalio on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2639000. (Paul, Niall)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from E. Powell Miller on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2638997. (Paul, Niall)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Joseph J. Siprut on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2635475. (Paul, Niall)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from John T. Murray on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2634267. (Paul, Niall)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from James L. Murray on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2634259. (Paul, Niall)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Stephen M. Gorny on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2634251. (Paul, Niall)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from James R. Bartimus on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2634244. (Paul, Niall)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from John E. Tangren on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2628826. (Paul, Niall)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Adam J. Levitt on behalf of Charles T. Burd, Thomas Porter, Jolene Harris, Shane Mayfield, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Robert Brandon, Andrea Martin, William S. Troutman. Local counsel: Niall A. Paul. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-2628816. (Paul, Niall) (Modified on 8/27/2013 to add name of visiting attorney) (skh).
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S MOTION TO STRIKE granting the parties' #12 JOINT MOTION to Establish Briefing Schedule re: #15 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Strike #1 Complaint; Plaintiffs' Responses due by 9/20/2013; Defendant's Reply due by 10/28/2013. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/26/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in support of #15 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Strike Objectionable Paragraphs in #1 Class Action Complaint (Bonasso, Michael)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Strike Objectionable Paragraphs in #1 Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stimpson Opinion, #2 Exhibit 2 - Thomas Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - McMath Denial)(Bonasso, Michael)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in support of #13 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Dismiss #1 Class Action Complaint (Bonasso, Michael)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Dismiss #1 Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 77 Fed Reg 22638, #2 Exhibit 2 - 1989 Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - McMath Denial)(Bonasso, Michael)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JOINT MOTION by Ford Motor Company, Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Establish Briefing Schedule on Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Strike (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Bonasso, Michael) (Modified on 8/22/2013 to add party filers) (skh).
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Ford Motor Company's #10 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations for memorandum of law in support of forthcoming motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint and the parties' #10 MOTION to Establish Briefing Schedule; directing that Defendant may file a brief of up to 30 pages in support of its forthcoming motion to dismiss and that Plaintiffs may file a memorandum of up to 30 pages in length in response to Defendant's forthcoming motion to dismiss; further directing that Plaintiffs shall have until 9/20/2013 to file a response to Defendant's forthcoming motion to dismiss and that Defendant shall have until and including 10/28/2013 to file its reply, if necessary. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/19/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations for memorandum of law in support of forthcoming motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint and JOINT MOTION by Ford Motor Company, Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to Establish Briefing Schedule (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Holmstrand, Jeffrey) (Modified on 8/17/2013 to add party filers) (skh).
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO PLAINTIFFS' #1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT to August 26, 2013 by Ford Motor Company, Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman (Holmstrand, Jeffrey) (Modified on 8/16/2013 to add party filers) (skh).
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order THIS CIVIL ACTION HAS BEEN CONSOLIDATED FOR DISCOVERY PURPOSES WITH CIVIL ACTION 3:13-6529, BELVILLE ET AL V. FORD MOTOR COMPANY. CIVIL ACTION 3:13-6529, BELVILLE V. FORD MOTOR COMPANY, IS DESIGNATED AS THE LEAD CASE. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE LEAD CASE. IF THERE IS A PARTICULAR FILING WHICH ONLY PERTAINS TO THE BRANDON V. FORD MOTOR COMPANY CASE, THEN THAT DOCUMENT MAY BE FILED DIRECTLY IN THE BRANDON CASE. (skh)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #6 MOTION to Consolidate Civil Action No. 3:13-6529 with Civil Action No. 3:13-20976 for pretrial purposes, pursuant to Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; designating Belville v. Ford Motor Co., 3:13-6529, as the lead case; directing that all filings be made in the lead case and all consolidated matters shall proceed under the style of Belville v. Ford Motor Co.; as these cases are not consolidated for trial at this time, if there is a particular filing which only pertains to the action in Brandon v. Ford Motor Co., then a party may file that document directly in the Brandon case under the style of Brandon v. Ford Motor Co. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/13/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of #6 MOTION by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to consolidate cases 3:13-cv-20976 and 3:13-cv-06529 (Paul, Niall)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman to consolidate cases 3:13-cv-20976 and 3:13-cv-06529 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Paul, Niall)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman in support of #4 MOTION by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23(g) to Appoint Plaintiff's Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Steering Committee (Paul, Niall)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION by Robert Brandon, Charles T. Burd, Jolene Harris, Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc., Andrea Martin, Shane Mayfield, Thomas Porter, William S. Troutman Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23(g) to Appoint Plaintiff's Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(Paul, Niall)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ford Motor Company, re: #1 Class Action Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mkw)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED APRIL 8, 2013. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (ras)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2576027. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mkw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burd et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Porter
Represented By: Aleksandra M. S. Vold
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Maja Lukic
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Alison K. Hurley
Represented By: Anne M. Tarvin
Represented By: Benjamin L. Price
Represented By: Bradley D. Honnold
Represented By: C. Calvin Warriner, III
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: John T. Murray
Represented By: Keith G. Bremer
Represented By: L. Lee Javins, II
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Stephen J. Fearon, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy C. Gaarder
Represented By: Anne Marie Marchael
Represented By: Edgar F. Heiskell, III
Represented By: Grant Lavalle Davis
Represented By: Gregory M. Travalio
Represented By: Guy R. Bucci
Represented By: James Bartimus
Represented By: James L. Murray
Represented By: Jeff A. Almeida
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: Joseph J. Siprut
Represented By: Kyle J. McGee
Represented By: Malcolm T. Brown
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark H. Troutman
Represented By: Nathan B. Atkinson
Represented By: Niall A. Paul
Represented By: Richard L. Merpi, II
Represented By: Stacey Kelly Breen
Represented By: Stephen M. Gorny
Represented By: Thomas C. Jones
Represented By: Timothy C. Bailey
Represented By: V. Paul Bucci, II
Represented By: Stephanie Poli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Martin
Represented By: Aleksandra M. S. Vold
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Maja Lukic
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Alison K. Hurley
Represented By: Anne M. Tarvin
Represented By: Benjamin L. Price
Represented By: Bradley D. Honnold
Represented By: C. Calvin Warriner, III
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Edgar F. Heiskell, III
Represented By: Grant Lavalle Davis
Represented By: Gregory M. Travalio
Represented By: Guy R. Bucci
Represented By: James Bartimus
Represented By: James L. Murray
Represented By: Jeff A. Almeida
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Represented By: John T. Murray
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: Joseph J. Siprut
Represented By: Keith G. Bremer
Represented By: Kyle J. McGee
Represented By: L. Lee Javins, II
Represented By: Malcolm T. Brown
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark H. Troutman
Represented By: Nathan B. Atkinson
Represented By: Niall A. Paul
Represented By: Richard L. Merpi, II
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Stacey Kelly Breen
Represented By: Stephen J. Fearon, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen M. Gorny
Represented By: Thomas C. Jones
Represented By: Timothy C. Bailey
Represented By: Timothy C. Gaarder
Represented By: Stephanie Poli
Represented By: Anne Marie Marchael
Represented By: V. Paul Bucci, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolene Harris
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Aleksandra M. S. Vold
Represented By: Alison K. Hurley
Represented By: Anne M. Tarvin
Represented By: Benjamin L. Price
Represented By: Bradley D. Honnold
Represented By: C. Calvin Warriner, III
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Edgar F. Heiskell, III
Represented By: Grant Lavalle Davis
Represented By: Gregory M. Travalio
Represented By: Guy R. Bucci
Represented By: James Bartimus
Represented By: James L. Murray
Represented By: Jeff A. Almeida
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Represented By: John T. Murray
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: Joseph J. Siprut
Represented By: Keith G. Bremer
Represented By: Kyle J. McGee
Represented By: L. Lee Javins, II
Represented By: Maja Lukic
Represented By: Malcolm T. Brown
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark H. Troutman
Represented By: Nathan B. Atkinson
Represented By: Niall A. Paul
Represented By: Richard L. Merpi, II
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Stacey Kelly Breen
Represented By: Stephen J. Fearon, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen M. Gorny
Represented By: Thomas C. Jones
Represented By: Timothy C. Bailey
Represented By: Timothy C. Gaarder
Represented By: V. Paul Bucci, II
Represented By: Stephanie Poli
Represented By: Anne Marie Marchael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles T. Burd
Represented By: Aleksandra M. S. Vold
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Maja Lukic
Represented By: Anne M. Tarvin
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Alison K. Hurley
Represented By: Anne Marie Marchael
Represented By: Benjamin L. Price
Represented By: Bradley D. Honnold
Represented By: C. Calvin Warriner, III
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Edgar F. Heiskell, III
Represented By: Grant Lavalle Davis
Represented By: Gregory M. Travalio
Represented By: Guy R. Bucci
Represented By: James Bartimus
Represented By: James L. Murray
Represented By: Jeff A. Almeida
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Represented By: John T. Murray
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: Joseph J. Siprut
Represented By: Keith G. Bremer
Represented By: Kyle J. McGee
Represented By: L. Lee Javins, II
Represented By: Malcolm T. Brown
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark H. Troutman
Represented By: Nathan B. Atkinson
Represented By: Niall A. Paul
Represented By: Richard L. Merpi, II
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Stacey Kelly Breen
Represented By: Stephen J. Fearon, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen M. Gorny
Represented By: Thomas C. Jones
Represented By: Timothy C. Bailey
Represented By: Timothy C. Gaarder
Represented By: V. Paul Bucci, II
Represented By: Stephanie Poli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Brandon
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Aleksandra M. S. Vold
Represented By: Alison K. Hurley
Represented By: Benjamin L. Price
Represented By: C. Calvin Warriner, III
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Edgar F. Heiskell, III
Represented By: Grant Lavalle Davis
Represented By: Gregory M. Travalio
Represented By: Guy R. Bucci
Represented By: James Bartimus
Represented By: James L. Murray
Represented By: Jeff A. Almeida
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Represented By: John T. Murray
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: Joseph J. Siprut
Represented By: Keith G. Bremer
Represented By: Kyle J. McGee
Represented By: L. Lee Javins, II
Represented By: Maja Lukic
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark H. Troutman
Represented By: Nathan B. Atkinson
Represented By: Niall A. Paul
Represented By: Richard L. Merpi, II
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Stacey Kelly Breen
Represented By: Stephen M. Gorny
Represented By: Timothy C. Bailey
Represented By: Timothy C. Gaarder
Represented By: V. Paul Bucci, II
Represented By: Stephanie Poli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Mayfield
Represented By: Aleksandra M. S. Vold
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Maja Lukic
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Alison K. Hurley
Represented By: Anne M. Tarvin
Represented By: Benjamin L. Price
Represented By: Bradley D. Honnold
Represented By: C. Calvin Warriner, III
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Edgar F. Heiskell, III
Represented By: Grant Lavalle Davis
Represented By: Gregory M. Travalio
Represented By: Anne Marie Marchael
Represented By: James Bartimus
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Represented By: L. Lee Javins, II
Represented By: Malcolm T. Brown
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark H. Troutman
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Stephen M. Gorny
Represented By: Thomas C. Jones
Represented By: Timothy C. Bailey
Represented By: Timothy C. Gaarder
Represented By: V. Paul Bucci, II
Represented By: Guy R. Bucci
Represented By: Jeff A. Almeida
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: Joseph J. Siprut
Represented By: Keith G. Bremer
Represented By: Kyle J. McGee
Represented By: Stephen J. Fearon, Jr.
Represented By: James L. Murray
Represented By: John T. Murray
Represented By: Nathan B. Atkinson
Represented By: Niall A. Paul
Represented By: Richard L. Merpi, II
Represented By: Stacey Kelly Breen
Represented By: Stephanie Poli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William S. Troutman
Represented By: Aleksandra M. S. Vold
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Maja Lukic
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Alison K. Hurley
Represented By: Anne M. Tarvin
Represented By: Anne Marie Marchael
Represented By: Benjamin L. Price
Represented By: Bradley D. Honnold
Represented By: C. Calvin Warriner, III
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Edgar F. Heiskell, III
Represented By: Grant Lavalle Davis
Represented By: Gregory M. Travalio
Represented By: Guy R. Bucci
Represented By: James Bartimus
Represented By: James L. Murray
Represented By: Jeff A. Almeida
Represented By: John T. Murray
Represented By: Kyle J. McGee
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: Mark H. Troutman
Represented By: Nathan B. Atkinson
Represented By: Stephen J. Fearon, Jr.
Represented By: V. Paul Bucci, II
Represented By: Keith G. Bremer
Represented By: Stephen M. Gorny
Represented By: Thomas C. Jones
Represented By: Timothy C. Bailey
Represented By: Stephanie Poli
Represented By: L. Lee Javins, II
Represented By: Joseph J. Siprut
Represented By: Malcolm T. Brown
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Timothy C. Gaarder
Represented By: Niall A. Paul
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Stacey Kelly Breen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hasen Design Build & Development, Inc.
Represented By: Aleksandra M. S. Vold
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Maja Lukic
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Alison K. Hurley
Represented By: Anne M. Tarvin
Represented By: Benjamin L. Price
Represented By: Bradley D. Honnold
Represented By: C. Calvin Warriner, III
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Edgar F. Heiskell, III
Represented By: Grant Lavalle Davis
Represented By: Gregory M. Travalio
Represented By: Guy R. Bucci
Represented By: James Bartimus
Represented By: James L. Murray
Represented By: Jeff A. Almeida
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Represented By: John T. Murray
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: Joseph J. Siprut
Represented By: Keith G. Bremer
Represented By: Kyle J. McGee
Represented By: L. Lee Javins, II
Represented By: Malcolm T. Brown
Represented By: Mark A. DiCello
Represented By: Mark H. Troutman
Represented By: Nathan B. Atkinson
Represented By: Niall A. Paul
Represented By: Anne Marie Marchael
Represented By: Richard L. Merpi, II
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Represented By: Stacey Kelly Breen
Represented By: Stephen J. Fearon, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen M. Gorny
Represented By: Thomas C. Jones
Represented By: Timothy C. Bailey
Represented By: Timothy C. Gaarder
Represented By: V. Paul Bucci, II
Represented By: Stephanie Poli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Andrew J. Trask
Represented By: Bradley J. Schmalzer
Represented By: Jill Crawley Griset
Represented By: John Tracy Walker, IV
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Perry Watson Miles, IV
Represented By: Peter J. Fazio
Represented By: Sarah Virginia Bondurant
Represented By: Susan W. Romaine
Represented By: Tennille Jo Checkovich
Represented By: William J. Hanna
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Holmstrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?