Nease et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Howard E. Nease and Nancy Nease
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Not Classified By Court: Donald B. O'Dell
Case Number: 3:2013cv29840
Filed: November 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Huntington Office
County: Putnam
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 277 LETTER from 4CCA, dated 6/12/2017, that the Supreme Court has entered an Order denying the Writ of Certiorari in 4CCA Case Number 15-1950, with the copy of the Supreme Court notification attached. (mkw)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 276 LETTER from 4CCA, dated 5/5/2017, notifying that the 4CCA has received notice from the Supreme Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari has been filed. (mkw)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 275 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #274 Judgment Order to counsel of record and any unrepresented parties. (jsa)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 JUDGMENT ORDER lifting the stay and entering judgment in favor of Defendant Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/17/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER FOR RELEASE OF BOND OBLIGATION re: #271 MOTION for Release of Bond Obligation; directing that Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland is fully and unconditionally discharged and released from any and all past, present, and future liability with respect to Supersedeas Bond Number 09176456 dated 4/9/2015, in the amount of $3,154.646. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/23/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Entry of Order for Release of Bond Obligation (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Cooke, Andrew)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MANDATE re: #262 Notice of Appeal to the 4CCA, in 4CCA Case No. 15-1950. The judgment of this Court, entered 2/1/2017, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (mkw)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE OF JUDGMENT as to #262 Notice of Appeal to the 4CCA, filed by Ford Motor Company in 4CCA Case Number 15-1950. (mkw)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 4CCA JUDGMENT re: #262 Notice of Appeal to the 4CCA, in accordance with the decision of this court, the judgment of the district court is reversed. This case is remanded to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the court's decision. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41 in 4CCA Case No. 15-1950. (mkw)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 4CCA OPINION re: #262 Notice of Appeal to the 4CCA, reversing the judgment of the district court and remanding to the district court in 4CCA Case No. 15-1950. (mkw)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 272 SUPERSEDEAS BOND in the amount of $3,154,646 posted by Ford Motor Company. (mkw)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting Defendant's #263 MOTION to Extend Stay of Judgment Pending Appeal; directing the stay of execution of judgment be extended pending appeal; approving the Supersedeas Bond already in place as adequate security for the judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/31/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE OF APPELLATE CASE OPENING BY 4CCA re: #262 Notice of Appeal to the 4CCA, in 4CCA Case No. 15-1950. Case Manager: T. Fischer. (mkw)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 TRANSMITTAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 4CCA via NOTICE OF APPELLATE ACTION re: #262 Notice of Appeal to the 4CCA. (jsa)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Extend Stay of Judgment Pending Appeal (Cooke, Andrew)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 NOTICE OF APPEAL WITH FEE PAID by Ford Motor Company re: #256 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #258 Second Amended Judgment Order, #260 Memorandum Opinion and Order, and #261 Costs Taxed by the Clerk of Court. Filing Fee $505. Receipt # 0425-4082180. (Cooke, Andrew) (Modified on 8/20/2015 to add links to #256, #258, #260 and #261 documents) (mkw).
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 COSTS TAXED BY THE CLERK OF COURT in the sum of $25,426.34 in favor of Howard E. Nease and Nancy Nease and against Ford Motor Company. (skh)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Ford's objections and directing the Clerk of this Court to enter the Bill of Costs in favor of Plaintiffs in the amount of $25,426.34. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/5/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #258 Second Amended Judgment Order to attorneys. (mkw)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT ORDER amending the Amended Judgment Order to reflect an award of $239,741 in future medical care and expenses; the remainder of the Amended Judgment Order shall remain the same. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/5/2015. (cc: attys) (mkw)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 RESPONSE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to the Court's #256 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (Javins, L.)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #238 RENEWED MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting in part and denying in part #240 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for a New Trial; directing Plaintiff to notify the Court within 7 days of entry of this Memorandum Opinion and Order whether it accepts the remittitur or wants the Court to set a new trial; granting #250 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease for Leave to Submit a Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 7/24/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Pretrial Conference held on March 16, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/6/2015. Redaction Request due 7/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2015. (tmr)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Jury Trial - Day 1 held on March 24, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/29/2015. Redaction Request due 7/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2015. (tmr)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 TRANSCRIPT OF VOIR DIRE PROCEEDING held on March 24, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner. (tmr) (Modified docket text on 6/22/2015) (klc).
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Final Settlement Conference held on March 23, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/15/2015. Redaction Request due 6/25/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2015. (tmr)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #250 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease for Leave to Submit a Sur-Reply (Cooke, Andrew)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease for Leave to Submit a Sur-Reply, with proposed document attached (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(O'Dell, Tony) (Modified on 5/27/2015 to add party filer) (skh).
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Jury Trial - Day 2 held on March 25, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/5/2015. Redaction Request due 6/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2015. (tmr)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #245 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Cooke, Andrew)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 247 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #244 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Cooke, Andrew)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Jury Trial - Day 3 held on March 26, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/26/2015. Redaction Request due 6/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2015. (tmr)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 RESPONSE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in opposition to #240 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for a New Trial (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - Erie File, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Disclosure)(Javins, L.)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 RESPONSE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in opposition to #238 RENEWED MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Engle Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Sero Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - Sero Report, #4 Exhibit D - Sero CV)(Javins, L.)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 243 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #237 Proposed Bill of Costs (Cooke, Andrew)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 242 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Jury Trial - Day 4 held on March 27, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/15/2015. Redaction Request due 5/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2015. (tmr)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in support of #240 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for a New Trial (Cooke, Andrew)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for a New Trial (Cooke, Andrew)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in support of #238 RENEWED MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Cooke, Andrew)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 RENEWED MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Cooke, Andrew)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting #233 MOTION to Stay execution of the judgment pending resolution of Ford's forthcoming post-trial motions. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/29/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Jury Trial - Day 7 held on April 1, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/7/2015. Redaction Request due 5/18/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2015. (tmr)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Jury Trial - Day 5 held on March 30, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/7/2015. Redaction Request due 5/18/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2015. (tmr)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Stay Judgment (Attachment: #1 Supersedeas Bond)(Cooke, Andrew)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Jury Trial - Day 6 held on March 31, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 4/24/2015. Redaction Request due 5/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2015. (tmr)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Excerpt of Jury Trial - Day 4 (Rule 50 motion) held on March 27, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 4/20/2015. Redaction Request due 5/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2015. (tmr)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Trial Testimomy of Witness Samuel Sero held on March 26, 2015, before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Court Reporter Terry Ruffner, Telephone number 304-528-7583. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 4/20/2015. Redaction Request due 5/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2015. (tmr)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #219 Amended Judgment Order to attorneys. (mkw)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 AMENDED JUDGMENT ORDER in favor of Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease against Ford Motor Company; directing that the verdict form be filed and that judgment be entered in accordance with the verdict form. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/3/2015. (cc: attys) (mkw)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 218 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #215 Judgment Order to attorneys. (mkw)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 JURY VERDICT - UNREDACTED for Courts Users Only. (mkw)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 JURY VERDICT. (mkw)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 JUDGMENT ORDER in favor of Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease against Ford Motor Company; directing that the verdict form be filed and that judgment be entered in favor in accordance with the verdict form. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/3/2015. (cc: attys) (mkw)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 CUSTODY ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS by Andrew B. Cooke for Defendant's Exhibit # 188A. (cbo)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 CUSTODY ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS by Tony O'Dell for Plaintiffs' Exhibit 100. (cbo)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS FROM JURY TRIAL by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 34, part 1, #2 Exhibit 34, part 2, #3 Exhibit 34, part 3, #4 Exhibit 34, part 4, #5 Exhibit 44.1, #6 Exhibit 44.2, #7 Exhibit 52, #8 Exhibit 97.25, part 1, #9 Exhibit 97.25, part 2, #10 Exhibit 100, #11 Exhibit 103.1, #12 Exhibit 104.1, #13 Exhibit 104.2, #14 Exhibit 108.1, #15 Exhibit 108.2, #16 Exhibit 108.3, #17 Exhibit 112, #18 Exhibit 126, #19 Exhibit 164, #20 Exhibit 166, #21 Exhibit 166.1, #22 Exhibit 167, #23 Exhibit 167.1, #24 Exhibit 168, #25 Exhibit 168.1, #26 Exhibit 208.1, #27 Exhibit 235.4, #28 Exhibit 286, #29 Exhibit 287, #30 Exhibit 289, #31 Exhibit 290, #32 Exhibit 292, #33 Exhibit 293, #34 Exhibit 294, #35 Exhibit 295, #36 Exhibit 296, #37 Exhibit 297) (cbo)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 EXHIBITS FROM JURY TRIAL by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, part 1, #2 Exhibit 5, part 2, #3 Exhibit 5, part 3, #4 Exhibit 5, part 4, #5 Exhibit 5, part 5, #6 Exhibit 5, part 6, #7 Exhibit 5, part 7, #8 Exhibit 5, part 8, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, part 1, #11 Exhibit 8, part 2, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 18A, part 1, #14 Exhibit 18A, part 2, #15 Exhibit 18A, part 3, #16 Exhibit 18A, part 4, #17 Exhibit 18A, part 5, #18 Exhibit 18A, part 6, #19 Exhibit 18A, part 7, #20 Exhibit 18A, part 8, #21 Exhibit 18A, part 9, #22 Exhibit 18A, part 10, #23 Exhibit 18A, part 11, #24 Exhibit 18A, part 12, #25 Exhibit 18A, part 13, #26 Exhibit 18A, part 14, #27 Exhibit 18A, part 15, #28 Exhibit 18A, part 16, #29 Exhibit 18A, part 17, #30 Exhibit 18A, part 18, #31 Exhibit 18A, part 19, #32 Exhibit 18A, part 20, #33 Exhibit 19A, part 1, #34 Exhibit 19A, part 2, #35 Exhibit 19A, part 3, #36 Exhibit 18B, #37 Exhibit 20, #38 Exhibit 29, #39 Exhibit 31, #40 Exhibit 32) (cbo)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 EXHIBITS FROM JURY TRIAL by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2A, part 1, #2 Exhibit 2A, part 2, #3 Exhibit 2A, part 3, #4 Exhibit 2B, #5 Exhibit 6, part 1, #6 Exhibit 6, part 2, #7 Exhibit 6, part 3, #8 Exhibit 6, part 4, #9 Exhibit 6, part 5, #10 Exhibit 6, part 6, #11 Exhibit 6, part 7, #12 Exhibit 6, part 8, #13 Exhibit 7-E, #14 Exhibit 8B, #15 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit 8A, #17 Exhibit 9B, #18 Exhibit 9C, #19 Exhibit 11, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15, part 1, #22 Exhibit 15, part 2, #23 Exhibit 15, part 3, #24 Exhibit 15, part 4, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 46, #28 Exhibit 47, #29 Exhibit 84, #30 Exhibit 86, part 1, #31 Exhibit 86, part 2, #32 Exhibit 86, part 3, #33 Exhibit 86, part 4, #34 Exhibit 86, part 5, #35 Exhibit 86, part 6, #36 Exhibit 86, part 7, #37 Exhibit 86, part 8, #38 Exhibit 86, part 9, #39 Exhibit 87-14, #40 Exhibit 87-16, #41 Exhibit 99, #42 Exhibit 101, #43 Exhibit 102, #44 Exhibit 103, #45 Exhibit 106, #46 Exhibit 107, #47 Exhibit 153, part 1, #48 Exhibit 153, part 2, #49 Exhibit 153, part 3, #50 Exhibit 153, part 4, #51 Exhibit 153, part 5, #52 Exhibit 153, part 6, #53 Exhibit 153, part 7, #54 Exhibit 153, part 8, #55 Exhibit 153, part 9, #56 Exhibit 153, part 10, #57 Exhibit 153, part 11, #58 Exhibit 153, part 12, #59 Exhibit 153, part 13, #60 Exhibit 153, part 14, #61 Exhibit 153, part 15, #62 Exhibit 153, part 16, #63 Exhibit 153, part 17, #64 Exhibit 153, part 18, #65 Exhibit 153, part 19, #66 Exhibit 2A-3, #67 Exhibit 6-3, #68 Exhibit 6-4, #69 Exhibit 108, #70 Exhibit 109, #71 Exhibit 110, #72 Exhibit 111, #73 Exhibit 111A, #74 Exhibit 112, #75 Exhibit 113, #76 Exhibit 114) (cbo)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 JURY SEATING ARRANGEMENT. (cbo)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 JURY NOTES. (cbo)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 WITNESS LIST by Defendant Ford Motor Company, Plaintiffs Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease, re: Jury Trial held 3/25/2015, 3/26/2015, 3/27/2015, 3/30/2015 and 3/31/2015. (cbo)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Ford Motor Company. (cbo)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 JURY TRIAL - COMPLETED (LAST DAY) held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/1/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 HEARING OUT OF JURY PRESENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/1/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 JURY TRIAL - HELD (SIXTH DAY day) held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/31/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 HEARING ON ORAL MOTION NOT FILED BUT MADE IN OPEN COURT held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/31/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 HEARING OUT OF JURY PRESENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/31/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 JURY TRIAL - HELD (FIFTH DAY day) held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/30/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner.. (trj)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 HEARING OUT OF JURY PRESENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/30/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 JURY TRIAL - HELD (FOURTH DAY day) held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/27/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj) (Main Document 207 replaced on 3/31/2015 to correct typographical error per trj.) (knb)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 HEARING ON ORAL MOTION NOT FILED BUT MADE IN OPEN COURT held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/27/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj) (Main Document 206 replaced on 3/31/2015 to correct typographical error per trj.) (knb)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 HEARING OUT OF JURY PRESENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/27/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner (trj) (Main Document 205 replaced on 3/31/2015 to correct typographical error per trj.) (knb)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 JURY TRIAL - HELD (THIRD DAY day) held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/26/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 HEARING OUT OF JURY PRESENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/26/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 AMENDED DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY TO BE READ AND/OR SHOWN AT THE TRIAL IN PLAINTIFFS' CASE-IN-CHIEF by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease (Javins, L.)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 JURY TRIAL - HELD (SECOND DAY) held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/25/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 200 HEARING OUT OF JURY PRESENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/25/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 JURY STRIKE SHEET. (mkw)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 HEARING OUT OF JURY PRESENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/24/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 JURY TRIAL - BEGUN (FIRST DAY) held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/24/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 VOIR DIRE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/24/2015; Court Reporter Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS AND COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Ford Motor Company (Cooke, Andrew)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 FINAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/23/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 EXHIBIT LIST FROM FINAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held 3/23/2015. (mkw)
March 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 RESPONSE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in opposition to Defendant's #189 Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations (Javins, L.)
March 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATIONS AND COUNTER DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY TO BE READ AND/OR SHOWN AT THE TRIAL IN PLAINTIFFS' CASE-IN-CHIEF by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease (O'Dell, Tony) (Modified on 3/23/2015 to add party filer) (skh).
March 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATIONS AND COUNTER DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY TO BE READ AND/OR SHOWN AT THE TRIAL IN PLAINTIFFS' CASE-IN-CHIEF by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease (O'Dell, Tony) (Modified on 3/23/2015 to add party filer)(skh).
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 OBJECTIONS AND COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Ford Motor Company (Cooke, Andrew)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY TO BE READ AND/OR SHOWN AT THE TRIAL IN PLAINTIFFS' CASE-IN-CHIEF by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease (Javins, L.)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Ford Motor Company (Cooke, Andrew)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #109 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Defendant Ford's Expert Lisa Gwin, D.O., B.S.E.E. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/19/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for William Dailey, Jr. (Javins, L.)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #177 Supplemental Memorandum In Support (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Romaine, Susan)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MEMORANDUM by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease of Supplemental Authorities with Regard to Rule 404(b) Evidence re: #112 Notice of Intent to Utilize Rule 404(b) Evidence (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Authorities Part I, #2 Supplemental Authorities Part II)(Javins, L.)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #87 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Based Upon Defendant's Failure to Respond to Discovery; denying Plaintiffs' #89 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Collateral Estoppel; granting in part and denying in part Defendant Ford's #126 MOTION to Strike Previously Undisclosed Exhibits; denying Defendant's #94 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Introducing Misleading Evidence Relating to Ford's Potential Failure Modes and Effect Analysis; granting in part Defendant's #95 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Ford's Experts' Compensation in Other Matters; granting Defendant's #96 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Concerning Unrelated Defects and Vehicles; denying Plaintiffs' #107 MOTION in Limine for Judicial Notice of Previous Actions and Jury Findings; denying as moot Plaintiffs' #110 MOTION in Limine Directed to Defense Designated Expert Witness Steven MacLean, Ph.D.,P.E. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/17/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Ford Motor Company in support of #100 MOTION by Ford Motor Company in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Other Incidents of Alleged Unintended Acceleration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Cooke, Andrew)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STIPULATION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease, Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Medical bills summary)(O'Dell, Tony) (Modified on 3/17/2015 to add party filers) (skh).
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for John Allen Kemplin. (Javins, L.)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Det. Jacob Dent. (Javins, L.)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in support of #109 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Defendant Ford's Expert Lisa Gwin, D.O., B.S.E.E. (O'Dell, Tony) (Modified on 3/17/2015 to add party filer) (skh).
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/16/2015; Court Reporter: Teresa Ruffner. (trj)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 REPORT OF MEDIATION by Donald B. O'Dell. (mkw)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting in part Ford Motor Company's #97 MOTION to Exclude References to the Discovery Process; granting Plaintiffs' #99 MOTION in Limine to Exclude any Reference to Alcohol use by Plaintiff; denying in part Ford Motor Company's #100 MOTION to Exclude Evidence of Other Incidents of Alleged Unintended Acceleration; denying Ford Motor Company's #103 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiffs from Introducing Undisclosed and/or Unsubstantiated Expert Opinions; denying Plaintiffs' #104 MOTION in Limine for an Adverse Inference Instruction Regarding Ford's Failure to Consider Alternative Design Options to Address a Sticking or Binding Speed Control Cable; denying Plaintiffs' #105 MOTION in Limine for an Adverse Inference Instruction Regarding Ford's Failure to Investigate Complaints Related to Unintended Acceleration Events in 2001 Ford Ranger Pickup Trucks and Plaintiffs' #111 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Defendant from Inferring or Arguing that 2001 Ford Ranger Pickup Trucks have not Incurred Open Throttle or Unintended Acceleration Events; denying the parties' #170 JOINT Motion to Allow Attorneys to Conduct Voir Dire. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/13/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties (mkw)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #108 MOTION in Limine Limiting the Testimony of Defense Designated Expert Witness Larry D. Peterson. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/13/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's #75 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Samuel J. Sero, P.E. and #85 MOTION for Summary Judgment, granting in part summary judgment to Defendant on the punitive damages claim and denying the remainder of each Motion; denying as moot Defendant's #102 MOTION to Exclude Evidence or Reference to Punitive Damages. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/13/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease, Ford Motor Company in support of #170 JOINT MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease, Ford Motor Company To Allow Attorneys to Conduct Voir Dire (O'Dell, Tony) (Modified on 3/12/2015 to add party filers)(skh).
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 JOINT MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease, Ford Motor Company To Allow Attorneys to Conduct Voir Dire (O'Dell, Tony) (Modified on 3/12/2015 to add party filers) (skh).
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR RELEASE OF JUROR INFORMATION granting the parties' #168 MOTION for Release of Juror Information; directing the Clerk to disclose to the Parties the names of the individuals assigned to the petit jury panel for the time period relating to the trial, the contents of their juror information forms, and all other records and papers used in connections with the juror qualification and selection process; directing counsel to shred the jury questionnaires due to the confidential information contained therein. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/11/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 JOINT MOTION by Ford Motor Company, Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease for Release of Juror Information (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooke, Andrew) (Modified on 3/9/2015 to add party filers)(skh).
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Supplemental Exhibit List (Cooke, Andrew)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Trial Witness and Trial Exhibit Lists re: #156 Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order by Ford Motor Company (Romaine, Susan)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #155 Response In Opposition. (Romaine, Susan)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER rescheduling the Pretrial Conference for 3/16/2015 at 01:30 PM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/6/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER directing the parties to submit their proposed jury instructions to the Court by 3/16/2015 at 12:00 noon. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/6/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease of Evidentiary Videotape deposition of Glenn Goldfarb, MD on March 18, 2015 at 4:00 p.m. (O'Dell, Tony) (Modified on 3/9/2015 to add party filer) (taq).
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION FOR USE OF COURTROOM TECHNOLOGY on March 24, 2015 at Judge Chambers's courtroom, Huntington, WV (O'Dell, Tony)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER rescheduling the time of the Pretrial Conference on 03/09/2015 from 11:00AM to 9:30AM. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/9/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (skm)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION FOR USE OF COURTROOM TECHNOLOGY on March 24, 2015 at Judge Chambers's courtroom, Huntington, WV (Cooke, Andrew)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE TO TAKE EVIDENTIARY VIDEOTAPE DEPOSITION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease, of Timothy Deer, M.D. on March 10, 2015 at 4:00 p.m. (O'Dell, Tony) (Modified on 3/4/2015 to add party filer) (taq).
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #137 Response In Opposition. (Cooke, Andrew)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 PROPOSED INTEGRATED PRETRIAL ORDER by Ford Motor Company, Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cooke, Andrew) (Modified on 3/2/2015 to add party filers)(skh).
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 RESPONSE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in opposition to #126 OBJECTIONS TO and MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Strike Previously Undisclosed Exhibits to Plaintiffs' #115 Reply to Response (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 REPLY by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to #122 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 REPLY by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to #131 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 REPLY by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to #130 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 REPLY by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to #128 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 REPLY by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to #121 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 REPLY by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to #120 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 REPLY by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to #119 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 REPLY by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to #118 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #135 Response In Opposition. (Romaine, Susan)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #132 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Romaine, Susan)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #136 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Romaine, Susan)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #134 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Romaine, Susan)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #133 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Romaine, Susan)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #127 Response In Opposition. (Romaine, Susan)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures. (Cooke, Andrew)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease for Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures. (Javins, L.)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #98 MOTION in Limine to Exclude any Reference to a Medical Malpractice Lawsuit. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/24/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 RESPONSE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in opposition to #102 MOTION by Ford Motor Company in Limine to Exclude Financial Evidence or Reference to Punitive Damages (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 RESPONSE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in opposition to #100 MOTION by Ford Motor Company in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Other Incidents of Alleged Unintended Acceleration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RESPONSE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in opposition to #97 MOTION by Ford Motor Company in Limine to Exclude References to the Discovery Process (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 RESPONSE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in opposition to #96 MOTION by Ford Motor Company in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Concerning Unrelated Defects and Vehicles (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 RESPONSE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in opposition to #95 MOTION by Ford Motor Company in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Ford's Experts' Compensation in Other Matters (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 RESPONSE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in opposition to #94 MOTION by Ford Motor Company in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Introducing Misleading Evidence Relating to Ford's "Potential Failure Modes and Effect Analysis" (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #111 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine to Preclude the Defendant from Inferring or Arguing that 2001 Ford Ranger Pickup Trucks Have not Incurred Open Throttle or Unintended Acceleration Events (Romaine, Susan)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #110 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine Directed to Defense Designated Expert Witness Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Romaine, Susan)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #99 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine To Exclude any Reference to Alcohol Use by Plaintiff (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Romaine, Susan)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #104 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine for an Adverse Inference Instruction Regarding Ford's Failure to Consider Alternative Design Options To Address A Sticking or Binding Speed Control Cable (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Romaine, Susan)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RESPONSE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in opposition to #103 MOTION by Ford Motor Company in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Introducing Undisclosed and/or Unsubstantiated Expert Opinions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(O'Dell, Tony) (Modified on 2/23/2015 to add party filer)(skh).
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Strike Previously Undisclosed Exhibits to Plaintiffs' #115 Reply to Response (Romaine, Susan) (Modified on 2/23/2015 to add link to #115 reply) (skh).
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company to #98 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine to Exclude Any Reference to A Medical Malpractice Lawsuit (Romaine, Susan)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease of Telephonic Evidentiary Video Deposition of Kevin McGrath, M.D. on March 17, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. (O'Dell, Tony) (Modified on 2/24/2015 to add party filer) (taq).
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #112 Notice of Intent to Utilize Rule 404(b) Evidence by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Romaine, Susan)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #109 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Defendant Ford's Expert Lisa Gwin, D.O., B.S.E.E. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Romaine, Susan)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #108 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine Limiting the Testimony of Defense Designated Expert Witness Larry D. Peterson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Romaine, Susan)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #107 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine for Judicial Notice of Previous Actions and Jury Findings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Romaine, Susan)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #106 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine to Preclude the Defendant from Asserting Comparative Fault as a Defense to the Plaintiffs' Breach of Warranty Claim (Romaine, Susan)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #105 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine for an Adverse Inference Instruction Regarding Ford's Failure to Investigate Complaints Related to Unintended Acceleration Events in 2001 Ford Ranger Pickup Trucks (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Romaine, Susan)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION by Ford Motor Company, Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease that the parties will serve Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures on Wednesday, 2/25/2015. (Cooke, Andrew) (Modified on 2/23/2015 to add party filers) (skh).
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #93 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Cooke, Andrew)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 REPLY by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to #92 Response in Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Javins, L.) (Modified on 2/9/2015 to correct link to #92 response) (skh).
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 REPLY by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to #91 Response in Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.) (Modified on 2/9/2015 to correct link to #91 response) (skh).
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 EXHIBIT B by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in support of #108 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine Limiting the Testimony of Defense Designated Expert Witness Larry D. Peterson. (DVD maintained in the Office of the Clerk of Court) (mkw)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE OF INTENT TO UTILIZE RULE 404(b) EVIDENCE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine to Preclude the Defendant from Inferring or Arguing that 2001 Ford Ranger Pickup Trucks Have not Incurred Open Throttle or Unintended Acceleration Events (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Javins, L.)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine Directed to Defense Designated Expert Witness Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Javins, L.)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Defendant Ford's Expert Lisa Gwin, D.O., B.S.E.E. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Javins, L.)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine Limiting the Testimony of Defense Designated Expert Witness Larry D. Peterson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Javins, L.)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine for Judicial Notice of Previous Actions and Jury Findings (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine to Preclude the Defendant from Asserting Comparative Fault as a Defense to the Plaintiffs' Breach of Warranty Claim (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine for an Adverse Inference Instruction Regarding Ford's Failure to Investigate Complaints Related to Unintended Acceleration Events in 2001 Ford Ranger Pickup Trucks (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Javins, L.)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine for an Adverse Inference Instruction Regarding Ford's Failure to Consider Alternative Design Options To Address A Sticking or Binding Speed Control Cable (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Javins, L.)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION by Ford Motor Company in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Introducing Undisclosed and/or Unsubstantiated Expert Opinions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Romaine, Susan)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION by Ford Motor Company in Limine to Exclude Financial Evidence or Reference to Punitive Damages (Romaine, Susan)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 EXHIBIT by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in support of #98 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine to Exclude Any Reference to A Medical Malpractice Lawsuit. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(O'Dell, Tony) (Modified on 2/2/2015 to add party filer)(skh).
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION by Ford Motor Company in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Other Incidents of Alleged Unintended Acceleration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Romaine, Susan)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine To Exclude any Reference to Alcohol Use by Plaintiff (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Dell, Tony) (Modified on 2/2/2015 to add party filer) (skh).
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in Limine to Exclude Any Reference to A Medical Malpractice Lawsuit (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Dell, Tony) (Modified on 2/2/2015 to add party filer) (skh).
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION by Ford Motor Company in Limine to Exclude References to the Discovery Process (Romaine, Susan)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION by Ford Motor Company in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Concerning Unrelated Defects and Vehicles (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Romaine, Susan)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION by Ford Motor Company in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Ford's Experts' Compensation in Other Matters (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Romaine, Susan)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION by Ford Motor Company in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Introducing Misleading Evidence Relating to Ford's "Potential Failure Modes and Effect Analysis" (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Romaine, Susan)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 RESPONSE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in opposition to #85 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #89 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease for Partial Summary Judgment Based Upon Collateral Estoppel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Romaine, Susan)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #87 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease for Partial Summary Judgment Based Upon Defendant's Failure to Respond to Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Romaine, Susan)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in support of #89 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease for Partial Summary Judgment Based Upon Collateral Estoppel (Javins, L.)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease for Partial Summary Judgment Based Upon Collateral Estoppel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.) (Modified on 1/16/2015 to convert motion to one for partial summary judgment (skh).
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in support of #87 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease for Partial Summary Judgment Based Upon Defendant's Failure to Respond to Discovery (Javins, L.)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease for Partial Summary Judgment Based Upon Defendant's Failure to Respond to Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.) (Modified on 1/16/2015 to convert motion to one for partial summary judgment) (skh).
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in support of #85 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Summary Judgment (Romaine, Susan)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION by Ford Motor Company for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Romaine, Susan)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to #80 Memorandum In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Romaine, Susan)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company (Cooke, Andrew)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company (Cooke, Andrew)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company (Cooke, Andrew)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in opposition to #75 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Expert Testimony of Samuel J. Sero, P.E. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Olson Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - 1987 FMEA, #3 Exhibit 3 - Design Drawing, #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts Joel Perkins Deposition, #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts Karl Stopschinski Deposition, #6 Exhibit 6 - Bates No. 1951 0140, #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts James Engle Deposition, #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts Kenneth Woddail Deposition, #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts Casey Mulder Deposition, #10 Exhibit 10 - Man Factors NHTSA Report, #11 Exhibit 11 - Stopschinski Graph, #12 Exhibit 12 - Photo, #13 Exhibit 13 - Photo, #14 Exhibit 14 - Photo, #15 Exhibit 15 - Crash Report, #16 Exhibit 16 - Excerpts from Police Depositions, #17 Exhibit 17 - Excerpts from James Cikalo Deposition, #18 Exhibit 18 - Samuel Sero Report, #19 Exhibit 19 - Excerpts from Samuel Sero Deposition, #20 Exhibit 20 - Karl Stopschinski Report, #21 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND AND/OR ESTABLISH BRIEFING DEADLINES FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF SAMUEL J. SERO, P.E., DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE granting the parties' #77 JOINT MOTION to Extend and/or Establish Briefing Deadlines for Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Samuel J. Sero, P.E., Dispositive Motions and Motions in Limine; directing that the following deadlines be incorporated into this Court's Scheduling Order: Deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Samuel J. Sero, P.E. due by 1/9/1015; Deadline for Defendant to reply in support of Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Samuel J. Sero, P.E. due by 1/14/2015; Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 1/16/2015, Responses due by 1/30/2015, Replies due by 2/9/2015; Motions in Limine to be filed by 2/2/2015, Responses due by 2/23/2015, Replies due by 3/2/2015. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/5/2015. (cc: attys) (mkw)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend and/or Establish Briefing Deadlines by Ford Motor Company (Cooke, Andrew)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 JOINT MOTION by Ford Motor Company, Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to Extend and/or Establish Briefing Deadlines for #75 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Expert Testimony of Samuel J. Sero, P.E., Dispositive Motions and Motions in Limine (Cooke, Andrew) (Modified on 1/2/2015 to add party filers and to add link to #75 motion)(skh).
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in support of #75 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Expert Testimony of Samuel J. Sero, P.E. (Cooke, Andrew)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Exclude Expert Testimony of Samuel J. Sero, P.E. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Cooke, Andrew)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO COMPLETE DEPOSITIONS to February 13, 2015 by Ford Motor Company, Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease (Romaine, Susan) (Modified on 12/15/2014 to add party filers) (skh).
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company (Cooke, Andrew)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for FORD MOTOR COMPANYS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION OF LISA GWIN, D.O., B.S.S.E., M.S. (Romaine, Susan)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for FORD MOTOR COMPANYS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION OF NATHAN DORRIS, PH.D. (Romaine, Susan)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for FORD MOTOR COMPANYS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION OF STEPHEN B. MACLEAN, PH.D., P.E. (Romaine, Susan)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of C. Zachary Meyers, CPA, CVA on February 13, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. (Romaine, Susan)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE OF MEDIATION by Ford Motor Company (Romaine, Susan)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for FORD MOTOR COMPANYS SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER TO NOS. 5, 16 AND 17 OF PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES (Romaine, Susan)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease of Lisa Gwin, D.O. on December 18, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. CST (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for FORD MOTOR COMPANYS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION OF KARL E. STOPSCHINSKI, P.E. (Romaine, Susan)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for FORD MOTOR COMPANYS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION OF LARRY PETERSEN (Romaine, Susan)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease of Stephen MacLean on December 16, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. EST (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 MOTION to Excuse Local Counsel from Certain Depostions of Mr. Stopshcinski, Dr. MacLean and Mr. Petersen in person and be permitted to attend the same by telephone. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/1/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION by Ford Motor Company To Excuse Local Counsel from Certain Depositions (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooke, Andrew)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease of Karl Stopschinski on December 11, 2014 at 12:00 pm EST (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease of Nathan Dorris on December 16, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease of Lisa Gwin on December 18, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease of Karl Stopschinski on December 3, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease of Larry Peterson on December 10, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #2 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease of Stephen MacLean on December 16, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company (Cooke, Andrew)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company (Cooke, Andrew)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company (Cooke, Andrew)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Howard E. Nease (O'Dell, Tony)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Defendant Ford Motor Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Requests for Admissions, Contingent Interrogatories and Contingent Requests for Production of Documents (Cooke, Andrew)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company to Plaintiffs' #43 Notice of Deposition of Timothy Parkinson (Cooke, Andrew)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company to Plaintiffs' #44 Rule 30(b)(6) Notice to Defendant Ford Motor Company to Take Deposition on 10/23/2014 at 9:00 a.m. (Cooke, Andrew)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company (Cooke, Andrew)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company (Cooke, Andrew)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company (Cooke, Andrew)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease of Ford 30(b)(6) Representative on October 23, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease of Timothy Parkinson on October 22, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease of Ron Gaw on October 22, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease for Certificate of Service Plaintiffs Second Discovery to Ford (Javins, L.)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosure Supplement (Cooke, Andrew)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company (Cooke, Andrew)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Testimony Disclosures. (Cooke, Andrew)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company (Cooke, Andrew)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease for Supplemental. (Javins, L.)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Objections and Response to Plaintiffs Rule 30(B)(6) Notice to Defendant Ford Motor Company (Romaine, Susan)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease for Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Testimony Disclosures. (Javins, L.)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE TO TAKE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease of Ford Motor Company on August 7, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.) (Modified on 7/24/2014 remove duplicate text) (taq).
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITIONS by Ford Motor Company of Officer J. M. Dent, Officer B. J. Perry, Sgt. C. T. Lowe and Officer M. J. Martin on July 23, 2014, at 10:00 a.m., 11:00 a.m., 1:00 p.m. and 2:00 p.m., respectively. (Romaine, Susan) (Modified text on 7/24/2014 to conform to filed document) (taq).
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER canceling the hearing scheduled on 6/20/2014 at 1:00 p.m. and denying as moot Plaintiffs' #18 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Ford Motor Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/19/2014. (cc: attys) (mkw)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Supplemental Answer to Nos. 5, 16 and 17 of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Supplemental Response to Nos. 3 and 15 of Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents (Romaine, Susan)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Ryan N. Clark on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Local counsel: Susan W. Romaine. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-3267058. (Romaine, Susan)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Local counsel: Susan W. Romaine. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-3267049. (Romaine, Susan)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from J. Randolph Bibb on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Local counsel: Susan W. Romaine. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-3267029. (Romaine, Susan)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #18 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to Compel Discovery from Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Romaine, Susan) (Modified on 6/11/2014 to conform to filed document) (cbo).
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of William Dailey, Jr., John Kemplin, Officer J. M. Dent, Officer B. J. Perry, Sgt. C. T. Lowe, and Officer M. J. Martin on June 24, 2014, at 8:30 a.m., 10:00 a.m., 11:30 a.m., 1:30 p.m., 2:30 p.m., 3:30 p.m., respectively (Romaine, Susan) (Modified text on 6/11/2014 to conform to filed document) (taq).
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to #23 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.) (Modified on 5/20/2014 to remove link to #18 motion) (skh).
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE by Ford Motor Company in opposition to #18 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to Compel Discovery from Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Romaine, Susan)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ford Motor Company of Howard and Nancy Nease on 6/23/2014 at 10:00 a.m. and 2:00 p.m. respectively. (Romaine, Susan) (Modified on 5/20/2014 to conform to filed document)(cbo).
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED SHARING AND NON-SHARING PROTECTIVE ORDER Setting forth the terms for the handling of confidential documents. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/6/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Sharing and Non-Sharing Protective Order by Ford Motor Company, Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease (Romaine, Susan) (Modified on 5/5/2014 to add party filers) (skh).
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease in support of #18 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to Compel Discovery from Defendant Ford Motor Company (Javins, L.)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to Compel Discovery from Defendant Ford Motor Company: responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service)(Javins, L.)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #18 MOTION by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease to Compel Discovery from Defendant Ford Motor Company (skh)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to American Family Insurance Company by Ford Motor Company (Romaine, Susan)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Verification for Ford's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories (Romaine, Susan)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents (Romaine, Susan)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Romaine, Susan)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Javins, L.)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 5/15/2014. Discovery requests to be completed by 11/3/2014, and all depositions by 12/19/2014. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 7/15/2014, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 9/2/2014, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 9/15/2014. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 1/8/2015, any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 2/17/2015. Plaintiffs' portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendant due by 2/23/2015, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 3/2/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2015 at 11:00 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charge due by 3/17/2015. Final Settlement Conference at 09:30 AM on 3/23/2015 in Huntington. Trial set for 3/24/2015 at 08:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/4/2014; further canceling the scheduling conference set for 3/17/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (skm) (Modified on 3/5/2014 to correct the date depositions due and the date Proposed Jury Charge due and clarify text) (mkw).
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Ford Motor Company, Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease. (Cooke, Andrew) (Modified on 2/27/2014 to add party filers) (skh).
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease for COS Plaintiffs Responses to Fords First Combined Discovery (Javins, L.)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Howard E. Nease, Nancy Nease Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Ford Motor Company (Javins, L.) (Modified text to conform to filed document on 2/20/2014) (taq).
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to the Plaintiffs (Romaine, Susan) (Modified text for clarity on 2/10/2014) (taq).
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 1/22/2014. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/24/2014. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/3/2014. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 3/17/2014 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/27/2014. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/31/2014. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/23/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (skm)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Bonasso, Michael)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bonasso, Michael) (Modified on 12/18/2013 to add jury demand) (skh).
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE re: #1 Complaint. Accepted by Secretary of State on 11/27/2013 as to Ford Motor Company; answer due 12/18/2013. (mkw)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ford Motor Company, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mkw)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED APRIL 8, 2013. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2799692. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mkw)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (ras)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nease et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard E. Nease
Represented By: Edgar F. Heiskell, III
Represented By: L. Lee Javins, II
Represented By: Tony L. O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Nease
Represented By: Edgar F. Heiskell, III
Represented By: L. Lee Javins, II
Represented By: Tony L. O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Andrew B. Cooke
Represented By: John Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Robert F. Chapski
Represented By: Ryan N. Clark
Represented By: Susan W. Romaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Donald B. O'Dell
Represented By: Donald B. O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?