Cruse v. Blackburn et al
Plaintiff: |
Wendell Leonard Cruse |
Defendant: |
Ernie Blackburn and Paul Matovich |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00485 |
Filed: |
January 24, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Huntington Office |
County: |
Cabell |
Presiding Judge: |
Omar J. Aboulhosn |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert C. Chambers |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 2, 2020 |
Filing
118
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 117 MOTION to Provide Documents Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/2/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
|
June 3, 2019 |
Filing
104
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER accepting and incorporating the 78 Proposed Findings and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn; denying Plaintiff's 85 Objections; granting the 49 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Blackburn and Matovich; declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims, and dismissing this action from the docket of the Court. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/3/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
|
February 7, 2018 |
Filing
82
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER accepting and incorporating the 78 Proposed Findings and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn; granting Defendants Blackburn and Matovich's 49 Motion for Summary Judgment and removing this matter from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/7/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
|
July 19, 2017 |
Filing
45
ORDER denying Defendants Hammers and Frazier's 41 Motion to Stay and denying Plaintiff's 43 Motion to Compel for Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents; directing that the discovery period be reopened until 8/3/2017 for the sole purpose of allowing Plaintiff the opportunity to serve interrogatories on Defendants Blackburn, Matovich, Hammers and Frazier, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/19/2017. (cc: Plaintiff; counsel of record) (jsa)
|
March 30, 2017 |
Filing
14
ORDER granting 12 MOTION by Wendell Cruse to Amend 1 Complaint; directing the Clerk to file Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and modify the docket sheet to reflect the additional named Defendants; further directing the Clerk to issue process in this case by preparing and serving Summonses and a copy of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint upon the Defendants as specified in Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/30/2017. (cc: Plaintiff; counsel of record) (jsa)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?