Shipley v. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Barbara Sue Shipley
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumers, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01279
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 CONFIRMATION from New Jersey that the case has been opened in that district as 3:18-cv-14343, filed 9/27/2018. (ts)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-106) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the District of New Jersey transferring this action to the USDC/USNJ for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 9/20/2018. (cc: attys) (ts)
September 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-106), MDL 2738. (ts)
September 12, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by Imerys Talc America, Inc. in support of #10 MOTION by Imerys Talc America, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. (McQuain, Elise)
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION by Imerys Talc America, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(McQuain, Elise) (Modified on 9/13/2018 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Defendants' #6 MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Transfer; staying the case until further action by this Court or transfer by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; the parties are relieved of any pleading, discovery, or other obligation until further notice; further directing that this case is administratively closed pending a ruling on such transfer. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/11/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 COPY OF NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION, with schedule of related actions attached. (original filed before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation). (mkw)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Johnson & Johnson Consumers, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. in support of #6 MOTION by Johnson & Johnson Consumers, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. to Stay All Proceedings (Combs, Philip)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Johnson & Johnson Consumers, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. to Stay All Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Staying Case, #2 Exhibit B - Transfer Order, #3 Proposed Order)(Combs, Philip)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson Consumers, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Combs, Philip)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumers, Inc. (Combs, Philip)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Combs, Philip)
September 5, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson Consumers, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. with summons, complaint, consent to notice of removal by defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc. and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Cabell County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-6787213. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shipley v. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: Susan S. Wettle
Represented By: Elise Nicole McQuain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumers, Inc.
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Sue Shipley
Represented By: Paul E. Biser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?