United States of America v. Mallory et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: CAMO HEMP WV LLC, Gary Kale, Grassy Run Farms, LLC, Matthew Mallory and Alternative Medicinal Options LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01289
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Huntington Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 21:801
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 48 MOTION by United States of America for Leave to File an Amended Verified Complaint for Declaratory Relief; Temporary, Preliminary, and Permanent Injunctive Relief; Asset Forfeiture; and Civil Penalties (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Verification)(Westfall, Fred)
November 2, 2018 47 SEALED MATERIALS: Notice Under Seal Regarding Industrial Hemp filed by Alternative Medicinal Options LLC, Matthew Mallory pursuant to Court Order. (Goodwin, Carte)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order 46 ORDER granting the United States' #31 MOTION for Substitution of Parties; directing that Defendant Alternative Medicinal Options LLC be substituted for Defendant CAMO HEMP WV LLC. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/31/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order 45 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO BRUSH HOG RESIDUAL HEMP PLANT MATTER granting Defendant Grassy Run Farms, LLC and Defendant Gary Kale's #40 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Brush Hog Residual Hemp Plant Matter; directing Defendant Grassy Run Farms, LLC and Defendant Gary Kale to submit additional photographs depicting the status of the subject property after they have been brush hogged. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/31/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 31, 2018 44 EXHIBIT A by Grassy Run Farms, LLC, Gary Kale in support of #40 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Grassy Run Farms, LLC, Gary Kale Brush Hog Residual Hemp Plant Matter. (Goodwin, R.)
October 30, 2018 43 RESPONSE by CAMO HEMP WV LLC, Matthew Mallory re: #31 MOTION by United States of America to Substitute Party (Goodwin, Carte)
October 30, 2018 42 MOTION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 10/22/2018 as to Commonwealth Alternative Medicinal Options LLC. (jsa)
October 30, 2018 41 MOTION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 10/22/2018 as to Commonwealth Alternative Medicinal Options LLC. (jsa)
October 30, 2018 40 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Grassy Run Farms, LLC, Gary Kale Brush Hog Residual Hemp Plant Matter (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodwin, R.)
October 26, 2018 39 REPLY by Grassy Run Farms, LLC, Gary Kale to #38 Memorandum In Opposition. (Goodwin, R.)
October 22, 2018 38 MEMORANDUM by United States of America in opposition to #34 MOTION by Grassy Run Farms, LLC, Gary Kale to Dismiss #3 Complaint (Westfall, Fred)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order 37 ORDER denying as moot Defendant Matthew Mallory and Defendant CAMO Hemp WV LLC's #16 MOTION to Dissolve Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and in Opposition to Preliminary Injunction; granting the United States' #21 MOTION for Clarification of Preliminary Injunction Memorandum Opinion and Order; directing Defendants Mallory and CAMO to disclose to the Court and counsel for the Government the current location of the industrial hemp that is the subject of this action and notify the Court and counsel for the Government of their timeline and future plans for the industrial hemp; further directing that such information shall be filed with the Court UNDER SEAL; further prohibiting Defendants from moving the industrial hemp outside of West Virginia without further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/22/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 22, 2018 36 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Jennifer M. Mankins appearing on behalf of United States of America. (Mankins, Jennifer)
October 17, 2018 35 MEMORANDUM by Grassy Run Farms, LLC, Gary Kale in support of #34 MOTION by Grassy Run Farms, LLC, Gary Kale to Dismiss f #3 Complaint. (Goodwin, R.)
October 17, 2018 34 MOTION by Grassy Run Farms, LLC, Gary Kale to Dismiss #3 Complaint. (Goodwin, R.)
October 16, 2018 33 VERIFIED CLAIM of Ownership (Goodwin, R.)
October 16, 2018 32 MEMORANDUM by United States of America in support of #31 MOTION by United States of America to Substitute Party (Westfall, Fred)
October 16, 2018 31 MOTION by United States of America to Substitute Party (Westfall, Fred)
October 12, 2018 30 MEMORANDUM by United States of America in opposition to #28 MOTION by CAMO HEMP WV LLC, Matthew Mallory to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re: #3 Complaint. (Westfall, Fred)
October 3, 2018 29 MEMORANDUM by CAMO HEMP WV LLC, Matthew Mallory in support of #28 MOTION by CAMO HEMP WV LLC, Matthew Mallory to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re: #3 Complaint (Goodwin, Carte)
October 3, 2018 28 MOTION by CAMO HEMP WV LLC, Matthew Mallory to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re: #3 Complaint. (Goodwin, Carte)
October 2, 2018 27 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Gary Kale and Grassy Run Farms, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to #3 Complaint to 10/17/2018 by Grassy Run Farms, LLC, Gary Kale, United States of America (Goodwin, R.) (Modified on 10/4/2018 to add link to #3 complaint and to add party filer) (ts).
September 28, 2018 26 RESPONSE by CAMO HEMP WV LLC, Matthew Mallory re: #21 MOTION by United States of America For Clarification Of Preliminary Injunction #20 Memorandum Opinion and Order (Goodwin, Carte)
September 28, 2018 25 REPLY by CAMO HEMP WV LLC, Matthew Mallory to #24 Memorandum In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A cont.)(Goodwin, Carte)
September 21, 2018 24 MEMORANDUM by United States of America in opposition to #16 MOTION by CAMO HEMP WV LLC, Matthew Mallory to Dissolve #5 Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and In Opposition to #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Westfall, Fred)
September 19, 2018 23 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Records Custodian, United Parcel Service. (Westfall, Fred)
September 19, 2018 22 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Jay Thompson. (Westfall, Fred)
September 17, 2018 21 MOTION by United States of America For Clarification Of Preliminary Injunction #20 Memorandum Opinion and Order (Westfall, Fred)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER converting the #5 Ex Parte Restraining Order into a Preliminary Injunction, with the modification that Defendants may harvest, dry, and process the marijuana; Defendants may not transport or sell any portion of the marijuana after it is processed. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/17/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
September 17, 2018 19 EXHIBIT LIST FROM MOTION HEARING held 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Exhibit A, #2 Defendant's Exhibit B, #3 Government's Exhibit 1, #4 Government's Exhibit 2, #5 Government's Exhibit 3, #6 Government's Exhibit 4, #7 Government's Exhibit 5, #8 Government's Exhibit 6, #9 Government's Exhibit 7, #10 Government's Exhibit 8, #11 Government's Exhibit 9, #12 Government's Exhibit 10, #13 Government's Exhibit 11, #14 Government's Exhibit 12) (jsa)
September 17, 2018 18 MOTION HEARING held by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/17/2018; Court Reporter: Kathy Swinhart. (trj)
September 15, 2018 17 MEMORANDUM by CAMO HEMP WV LLC, Matthew Mallory in support of #16 MOTION by CAMO HEMP WV LLC, Matthew Mallory to Dissolve #5 Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and In Opposition to #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Goodwin, Carte)
September 15, 2018 16 MOTION by CAMO HEMP WV LLC, Matthew Mallory to Dissolve #5 Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and In Opposition to #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Goodwin, Carte)
September 14, 2018 15 NOTICE Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 902(11) of Intent to Use Certified Domestic Records of a Regularly Conducted Activity by United States of America (Westfall, Fred)
September 14, 2018 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by R. Booth Goodwin, II and Tammy J. Owen on behalf of Grassy Run Farms, LLC, Gary Kale. (Goodwin, R.)
September 14, 2018 13 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 9/12/2018 as to Matthew Mallory. (jsa)
September 14, 2018 12 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 9/12/2018 as to CAMO HEMP WV LLC. (jsa)
September 13, 2018 11 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas by United States of America (Attachment: #1 Subpoenas)(Westfall, Fred)
September 13, 2018 10 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Michael C. Arnold; accepted by Executive Assistant Jennifer Keaton on 9/12/2018. (jsa)
September 11, 2018 9 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk for Grassy Run Farms, LLC, re: #3 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies returned to Assistant United States Attorney for service. (hkl)
September 11, 2018 8 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk for Gary Kale, re: #3 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies returned to Assistant United States Attorney for service. (hkl)
September 11, 2018 7 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk for CAMO HEMP WV LLC, re: #3 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies returned to Assistant United States Attorney for service. (hkl)
September 11, 2018 6 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk for Matthew Mallory, re: #3 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies returned to Assistant United States Attorney for service. (hkl)
September 11, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Error: Standing Order contained an incorrect filed date. Correction: Replaced incorrect image with correct image. (mkw)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER granting the United States' #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; directing that the defendants, their agents, servants, assigns, attorneys, and all others acting in concert with the defendants, are temporarily restrained from the actions described herein; this ex parte temporary restraining order shall remain in effect for 14 days unless terminated earlier by the Court; further directing that a preliminary injunction hearing will be held on 9/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/11/2018. (cc: USA) (jsa)
September 11, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
September 11, 2018 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl) (Modified on 9/11/2018 to replace image) (mkw).
September 11, 2018 3 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; TEMPORARY, PRELIMINARY, AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; ASSET FORFEITURE; AND CIVIL PENALTIES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Verification of Michael T. Smith, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)
September 11, 2018 2 MEMORANDUM by United States of America in support of #1 MOTION by United States of America for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Westfall, Fred)
September 11, 2018 1 MOTION by United States of America for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Westfall, Fred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mallory et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMO HEMP WV LLC
Represented By: Philip A. Reale, II
Represented By: Elise Nicole McQuain
Represented By: Carte P. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Kale
Represented By: Tammy J. Owen
Represented By: R. Booth Goodwin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grassy Run Farms, LLC
Represented By: Tammy J. Owen
Represented By: R. Booth Goodwin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mallory
Represented By: Philip A. Reale, II
Represented By: Elise Nicole McQuain
Represented By: Carte P. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alternative Medicinal Options LLC
Represented By: Philip A. Reale, II
Represented By: Elise Nicole McQuain
Represented By: Carte P. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Fred B. Westfall, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?