Christian v. Hail et al
Plaintiff: Gary Lynn Christian
Defendant: Lakken Hill, Ricky Hail, Darlene Hail and Western Regional Jail Kitchen
Case Number: 3:2018cv01370
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon Ricky Hail, re: #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint. Ricky Hail served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (jsa)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon Darlene Hail, re: #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint. Darlene Hail served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (jsa)
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Gary Lynn Christian for Western Regional Jail Kitchen, re: #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies forwarded to United States Marshal Service for service. (hkl)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Gary Lynn Christian for Lakken Hill, re: #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 1 copy forwarded to United States Marshal Service for service. (hkl)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Gary Lynn Christian for Ricky Hail, re: #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 1 copy forwarded to United States Marshal Service for service. (hkl)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Gary Lynn Christian for Darlene Hail, re: #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 1 copy forwarded to United States Marshal Service for service. (hkl)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing Plaintiff to begin making monthly payments on 1/5/2019 as more fully set forth herein; directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of Court who shall collect therefrom all unpaid fees and costs taxed against Plaintiff and shall pay the balance, if any, to the Plaintiff; directing the Clerk of Court to issue a summons for each named defendant; directing the United States Marshals Service to serve the summonses, complaints, and amended complaints on the defendants, or their designated agents for service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/30/2018. (cc: Plaintiff; USM; Administrator of the Salem Correctional Center) (hkl)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Gary Lynn Christian against Darlene Hail, Ricky Hail, Lakken Hill, Western Regional Jail Kitchen. (jsa)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing Plaintiff to amend his complaint within thirty days of the date of this Order, as more fully set forth herein; notifying Plaintiff that a failure to amend the complaint as ordered may result in a recommendation that the Complaint be dismissed for failure to state a claim and/or for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/7/2018. (cc: Plaintiff) (jsa)
October 22, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (hkl)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Gary Lynn Christian to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian v. Hail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakken Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Hail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Hail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Regional Jail Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lynn Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?