Villalobos v. Western Regional Jail et al

Plaintiff: Cody Allen Villalobos
Defendant: Western Regional Jail and PrimeCare
Case Number: 3:2018cv01385
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
0 Judge: Robert C Chambers
1 Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon Western Regional Jail, re: #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint. Western Regional Jail served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. Person Served: Administrator Joseph Wood. (hkl)
November 28, 2018 8 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Cody Allen Villalobos for PrimeCare, re: #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies delivered to U.S. Marshals for service. (jsa)
November 28, 2018 7 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Cody Allen Villalobos for Western Regional Jail, re: #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies delivered to U.S. Marshals for service. (jsa)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing Plaintiff to pay an initial partial filing fee of $5.00 on or before 12/31/2018 and to make monthly payments thereafter, as more fully set forth herein; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of Court, who shall collect therefrom all unpaid fees and costs taxed against Plaintiff and shall pay the balance, if any, to the Plaintiff; further directing the Clerk of Court to issue a summons for each named defendant and the United States Marshals Service to serve the appropriate summons, complaint, and amended complaint on each named defendant, or its designated agent for service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/28/2018. (cc: Plaintiff; USM; WRJ Administrator; WVRJCFA Executive Director) (jsa)
November 16, 2018 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM by Cody Allen Villalobos against PrimeCare, Western Regional Jail. (jsa)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER directing Plaintiff to amend his complaint within thirty (30) days and correct the deficiencies described herein; notifying Plaintiff that a failure to amend the complaint as ordered shall result in a recommendation that the complaint be dismissed for failure to state a claim under 42 U.S.C. 1983 and/or for failure to prosecute under Fed.R.Civ.P. 41 and L.R.Civ.P. 41.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/6/2018. (cc: Plaintiff) (jsa)
October 25, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
October 25, 2018 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
October 25, 2018 2 COMPLAINT. (hkl)
October 25, 2018 1 APPLICATION by Cody Allen Villalobos to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs (Attachments: #1 Average Resident Balance Statement, #2 Resident Transaction Details, #3 Envelope) (hkl) (Modified on 10/25/2018 to replace incorrect image with correct image) (mkw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villalobos v. Western Regional Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Allen Villalobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PrimeCare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?