United States of America v. One 2013 Chrysler 300 SRT

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One 2013 Chrysler 300 SRT
Claimant: Geneva Johnson
Case Number: 3:2018cv01393
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America for Verified Complaint of Forfeiture and Warrant Arrest and Notice. (Arthur, Christopher)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER: For reasons appearing to the court, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-styled case be transferred from the Charleston Division of this Court to the Huntington Division. Parties shall note the change in the office designator code from the number 2 to the number 3 which is the first digit in the case number assigned to this case. Pleadings henceforth should bear case number 3:18-cv-01393. Further, this matter is hereby TRANSFERRED from the docket of Judge Joseph R. Goodwin to Judge Robert C. Chambers for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 11/1/2018. (cc: Judge Goodwin; Judge Chambers; counsel of record; any unrepresented party). (ts)
October 30, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
October 30, 2018 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq) (Modified on 11/2/2018 to refer case to Magistrate Judge Eifert)(ts).
October 30, 2018 3 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM ISSUED. Original and 10 copies returned to Christopher R. Arthur. (taq)
October 30, 2018 2 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM SUBMITTED by United States of America. (taq)
October 30, 2018 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT OF FORFEITURE by United States of America against One 2013 Chrysler 300 SRT. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One 2013 Chrysler 300 SRT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Geneva Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2013 Chrysler 300 SRT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher R. Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?