Wilks v. Sloan et al

Plaintiff: Matthew Allen Wilks
Defendant: John Sloan and Western Regional Jail
Case Number: 3:2018cv01401
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 Partial Filing Fee Received: $12.00, Receipt Number CHAR015282. (hkl)
December 20, 2018 SET DEADLINES as to #13 MOTION by John Sloan to Dismiss #2 Complaint, #11 MOTION by Western Regional Jail to Dismiss #2 Complaint. Plaintiff's Responses due by 1/17/2019, pursuant to the #15 Order. (jsa)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing that Plaintiff shall have through and including 1/17/2019 in which to file a response to Defendants' #11 and #13 MOTIONS to Dismiss #2 Complaint; following service of Plaintiff's response, if such is filed, Defendants shall have fourteen days within which to reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/20/2018. (cc: Plaintiff; counsel of record) (jsa)
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by John Sloan in support of #13 MOTION by John Sloan to Dismiss #2 Complaint (Oxley, Perry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION by John Sloan to Dismiss #2 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert.(Oxley, Perry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Western Regional Jail in support of #11 MOTION by Western Regional Jail to Dismiss #2 Complaint (Oxley, Perry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION by Western Regional Jail to Dismiss #2 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert.(Oxley, Perry)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon Western Regional Jail, re: #2 Complaint. Western Regional Jail served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (hkl)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon John Sloan, re: #2 Complaint. John Sloan served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Attachment: #1 Unredacted Summons) (hkl)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER to Matthew Wilks from Clerk, USDC/SDWV, dated 11/14/2018, re: order with missing page. (jsa)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER to Clerk, USDC/SDWV, from Matthew Wilks dated 11/5/2018, re: page missing from order. (jsa)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Matthew Allen Wilks for Western Regional Jail, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies forwarded to United States Marshals Service for service. (hkl)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Matthew Allen Wilks for John Sloan, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 1 copy forwarded to United States Marshals Service for service. (hkl)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing Plaintiff to make monthly payments beginning on 12/7/2018, as more fully set forth herein; directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of Court who shall collect therefrom all unpaid fees and costs taxed against Plaintiff and shall pay the balance, if any, to the Plaintiff; directing the Clerk of Court to issue a summons for each named defendant; directing the United States Marshals Service to serve the summonses and complaints on the defendants, or their designated agents for service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/7/2018. (cc: Plaintiff; USM; Administrator of the Western Regional Jail) (hkl)
November 2, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (ts)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (jsa)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Matthew Allen Wilks to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilks v. Sloan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sloan
Represented By: Perry W. Oxley
Represented By: David E. Rich
Represented By: Whitney N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Regional Jail
Represented By: Perry W. Oxley
Represented By: David E. Rich
Represented By: Whitney N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Allen Wilks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?