Johnson v. Western Regional Jail Authority et al

Plaintiff: Rusty Johnson
Defendant: Captain Aldrage, Any CO that has worked in A5 section, Captain Savilla and Western Regional Jail Authority
Case Number: 3:2018cv01446
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Huntington Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 MAIL RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE. Mail sent to Rusty Johnson at WESTERN REGIONAL JAIL, One O'Hanlon Place, Barboursville, WV 25504. New address unavailable at this time. (hkl)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Rusty Johnson for Captain Savilla, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 1 copy forwarded to United States Marshal Service for service. (hkl)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Rusty Johnson for Captain Aldrage, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 1 copy forwarded to United States Marshal Service for service. (hkl)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Rusty Johnson for Western Regional Jail Authority, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies forwarded to United States Marshals Service for service. (hkl)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #5 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing that the Plaintiff make monthly payments beginning on 2/5/2019, as more fully set forth herein; directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of Court who shall collect therefrom all unpaid fees and costs taxed against Plaintiff and shall pay the balance, if any, to the Plaintiff; directing the Clerk of Court to issue a summons for each named defendant; further directing the United States Marshals Service to serve the summonses and complaint on the defendants, or their designated agents for service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/17/2018. (cc: Plaintiff; USMS; Administrator of the Western Regional Jail; ExecutiveDirector of the West Virginia Regional Jail and Correctional Facility Authority) (hkl)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 APPLICATION by Rusty Johnson to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (hkl)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 or submit to the Court a completed and signed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs within 30 days of the date of this Order; notifying Plaintiff that no action will occur on his Complaint until the fee is paid, or the application is approved; failure to pay the fee or submit the application shall result in a recommendation that the complaint be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/28/2018. (cc: Plaintiff with an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs) (mkw)
November 15, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (ts)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (jsa)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to open a new civil action for each of the plaintiffs in civil action 3:18-cv-01412, listing the same defendants as those named therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/15/2018. (cc: Plaintiff) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Western Regional Jail Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Aldrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any CO that has worked in A5 section
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Savilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Regional Jail Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rusty Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?