Salmons v. Western Regional Jail
Plaintiff: Jennifer Salmons
Defendant: Western Regional Jail
Case Number: 3:2018cv01475
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jennifer Salmons against Western Regional Jail. (hkl)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #15 MOTION for the Appointment of Counsel; directing Plaintiff to amend her complaint as previously explained in the #3 and #14 memorandum opinion and orders within fourteen days of receipt of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/1/2019. (cc: Plaintiff with copies of ECF Nos. 3 and 14) (jsa) (Modified on 3/13/2019 to add links to the #3 and #14 memorandum opinion and orders) (mkw).
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER-FORM MOTION by Jennifer Salmons for Appointment of Counsel. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (jsa)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #6 MOTION by Jennifer Salmons for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint and for Extension of Time to File Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs; granting #11 APPLICATION by Jennifer Salmons to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing Plaintiff to make monthly payments beginning on 3/5/2019 until the full filing fee of $350.00 has been paid; directing and noticing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of Court who shall collect therefrom all unpaid fees and costs taxed against Plaintiff and shall pay the balance, if any, to the Plaintiff; denying without prejudice the #7 MOTION by Jennifer Salmons for Appointment of Counsel; directing Plaintiff to amend the #1 Complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/16/2019. (cc: Plaintiff) (mkw)
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER to Clerk, USDC/SDWV, from Jennifer Salmons dated 1/10/2019, re: appointment of counsel. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (hkl)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 AUTHORIZATION TO RELEASE INSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNT INFORMATION by Jennifer Salmons. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (hkl)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION by Jennifer Salmons to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (hkl)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER to Jennifer Lee Salmons, from Rory L. Perry II dated 1/9/2019, re: #9 letter regarding copies of documents and change of address. (brn)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER to Clerk, USDC/SDWV, from Jennifer Salmons dated 12/27/2018, re: copies of documents and change of address. (jsa)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 AUTHORIZATION TO RELEASE INSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNT INFORMATION by Jennifer Salmons. (jsa)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Jennifer Salmons for Appointment of Counsel. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (jsa)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Jennifer Salmons for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint and for Extension of Time to File Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs to 1/25/2019; Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (jsa)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE. Mail sent to Jennifer Salmons at Western Regional Jail, One O'Hanlon Place, Barboursville, WV 25504. Mail resent to Jennifer Salmons at Lakin Correctional Center, 11264 Ohio River Road, West Columbia, WV 25287. (jsa)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 MAIL RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE. Mail sent to Jennifer Salmons at WESTERN REGIONAL JAIL, One O'Hanlon Place, Barboursville, WV 25504. Mail resent to Jennifer Salmons at LAKIN CORRECTIONAL CENTER, 11264 Ohio River Road, West Columbia, WV 25287. (hkl)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 or submit to the Court a completed and signed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs; further directing Plaintiff to amend her complaint as specified herein within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/30/2018. (cc: Plaintiff with a form Complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983, an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs, and any available instructions for completing the forms) (jsa)
November 29, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salmons v. Western Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Salmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?