Newhouse v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barbara Newhouse
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01477
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 Summons Returned Executed for CSX Transportation, Inc. re: #1 Complaint. ERROR: Image did not contain a signature. CORRECTION: Image replaced. (ts)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for CSX Transportation, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. CSX Transportation, Inc. served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Paul, Gregory) (Modified on 1/25/2019 to replace unsigned image) (ts).
January 15, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED. Error: Summons was issued with an incorrect date. Correction: Image removed and summons was reissued at docket entry #5. (mkw)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CSX Transportation, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 INCORRECT ENTRY. IMAGE REMOVED; SEE ENTRY #5. (hkl) (Modified on 1/15/2019 to remove image) (mkw).
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE FOR SUMMONS/SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Barbara Newhouse for CSX Transportation, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Summons for CSX Transportation, Inc. )(Paul, Gregory)
November 29, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6977552. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mkw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newhouse v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Newhouse
Represented By: Gregory G. Paul
Represented By: Robert V. Berthold, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?