Boose v. Adkins et al

Plaintiff: Landrius Tyree Boose
Defendant: Admin Wood, Western Regional Jail and Brittany Adkins
Case Number: 3:2018cv01480
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER TO #2 Complaint With Jury Demand by Brittany Adkins, Western Regional Jail, Wood.(Oxley, Perry) (Modified on 1/3/2019 to add jury demand) (ts).
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon Western Regional Jail, re: #2 Complaint. Western Regional Jail served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. Person Served: Administrator Joseph Wood. (hkl)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon Administrator Wood, re: #2 Complaint. Administrator Wood served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (hkl)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Landrius Tyree Boose for Administrator Wood, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 1 copy delivered to U.S. Marshals for service. (jsa)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Landrius Tyree Boose for Western Regional Jail, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies delivered to U.S. Marshals for service. (jsa)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Landrius Tyree Boose for Brittany Adkins, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 1 copy delivered to U.S. Marshals for service. (jsa)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing Plaintiff to make monthly payments beginning on 1/5/2019, as more fully set forth herein; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of Court, who shall collect therefrom all unpaid fees and costs taxed against Plaintiff and shall pay the balance, if any, to the Plaintiff; directing the Clerk of Court to issue a summons for each of the named defendants and the United States Marshals Service to serve a summons and complaint on each defendant, or his/her/its designated agent for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/6/2018. (cc: Plaintiff; USM; WRJ Administrator) (jsa)
November 30, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (jsa)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Landrius Tyree Boose to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boose v. Adkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admin Wood
Represented By: Perry W. Oxley
Represented By: David E. Rich
Represented By: Whitney N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Regional Jail
Represented By: Perry W. Oxley
Represented By: David E. Rich
Represented By: Whitney N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Adkins
Represented By: Perry W. Oxley
Represented By: David E. Rich
Represented By: Whitney N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landrius Tyree Boose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?