Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC v. An easement to construct, operate and maintain a natural gas transmission line across 7.266 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia et al

Plaintiff: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Defendant: 88.04 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, owned by Scarlet Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-64.1), Unknown Persons and Interested Parties, An easement to construct, operate and maintain a natural gas transmission line across 7.266 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, 58.078 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, owned by Scarlett Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-52) and 31 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, Owned by Scarlett Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-63)
Case Number: 3:2018cv01532
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Bond as to Scarlet Oaks Country Club and Scarlet Oaks Country Club, LLC in the amount of $250,000 by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Attachment: #1 Bond)(Burt, Stefanie) (Modified on 2/7/2019 to convert event to bond) (ts).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 2/12/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/25/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/4/2019. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 3/18/2019 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/25/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 4/1/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/23/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER canceling the 2/4/2019 Preliminary Injunction hearing as moot, pursuant to the #14 Joint Stipulation Regarding Access to the Easements Condemned. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/23/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT STIPULATION regarding Access to the Easements Condemned by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Certain Defendants (Burt, Stefanie) (Modified on 1/22/2019 to add party filers) (ts).
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint With Jury Demand by 31 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, Owned by Scarlett Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-63), 58.078 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, owned by Scarlett Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-52), 88.04 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, owned by Scarlet Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-64.1).(Turak, Christian) (Modified on 1/17/2019 to add jury demand) (ts).
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christian E. Turak on behalf of 31 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, Owned by Scarlett Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-63), 58.078 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, owned by Scarlett Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-52), 88.04 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, owned by Scarlet Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-64.1). (Turak, Christian)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC for Motion for Expedited Hearing on Motion for Immediate Access and Possession of the Easements Condemned. (Burt, Stefanie)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for 31 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, Owned by Scarlett Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-63), 58.078 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, owned by Scarlett Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-52), 88.04 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, owned by Scarlet Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-64.1). 31 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, Owned by Scarlett Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-63) served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019; 58.078 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, owned by Scarlett Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-52) served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019; 88.04 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, owned by Scarlet Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-64.1) served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. Summons served on Mrs. Haikal - Wife. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Condemnation)(Burt, Stefanie)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for An easement to construct, operate and maintain a natural gas transmission line across 7.266 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia. An easement to construct, operate and maintain a natural gas transmission line across 7.266 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. Summons served on Mrs. Haikal - Wife. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Condemnation)(Burt, Stefanie)
December 21, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC for Immediate Access to and Possession of the Easements Condemned. Incorrect image for Exhibit #2, attachment #3. Correction: Replaced incorrect image with correct image for Exhibit 2, attachment #3. (mkw)
December 21, 2018 SET DEADLINES as to #5 MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC for Immediate Access and Possession of the Easements Condemned; Responses due by 1/24/2019, Replies due by 1/31/2019, pursuant to the #8 Order. (jsa)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 MOTION for Expedited Hearing re: Plaintiff's #5 MOTION for Immediate Access to and Possession of the Easements Condemned; any defendant opposing the Motion shall file a response by 1/24/2019; reply will be due by 1/31/2019; Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2019 at 2:30 PM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; Plaintiff is directed to personally serve a copy of this Order on Defendant and Defendant's counsel and file a certificate of service. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/21/2018. (cc: counsel of record) (jsa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC for Expedited Hearing re: #5 MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC for Immediate Access to and Possession of the Easements Condemned, #6 Memorandum In Support (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Burt, Stefanie)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC in support of #5 MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC Immediate Access and Possession of the Easements Condemned (Burt, Stefanie)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC for Immediate Access to and Possession of the Easements Condemned (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Burt, Stefanie) (Modified on 12/21/2018 to replace image for attachment #3) (mkw).
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Burt, Stefanie)
December 20, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION OF CHRISTA KILBOURNE, dated 12/19/2018, filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (hkl)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7001698. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC v. An easement to construct, operate and maintain a natural gas transmission line across 7.266 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 88.04 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, owned by Scarlet Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-64.1)
Represented By: Christian E. Turak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Persons and Interested Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: An easement to construct, operate and maintain a natural gas transmission line across 7.266 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 58.078 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, owned by Scarlett Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-52)
Represented By: Christian E. Turak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 31 acres of land, more or less, in Putnam County, West Virginia, Owned by Scarlett Oaks Country Club (Tax Parcel ID No. 08-216-63)
Represented By: Christian E. Turak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Stefanie Lepore Burt
Represented By: Nicolle S. Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?