Martin v. Aldi, Inc. (Maryland) et al

Plaintiff: Joyce L. Martin
Defendant: Aldi, Inc. (Pennsylvania), Aldi, Inc. (Ohio) and Aldi, Inc. (Maryland)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00027
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joyce L. Martin for First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants. (Amos, Charles)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING DEPOSITION PROTOCOL directing that the protocol described herein shall be followed with all depositions conducted in this matter. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/31/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (jsa)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER GOVERNING THE INADVERTENT DISCLOSURE OF DOCUMENTS OR OTHER MATERIAL UNDER RULE 502(d) directing that the procedures herein shall govern the inadvertent production of privileged or confidential documents. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/31/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth the terms for the handling of confidential documents. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/31/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
January 30, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #9 JOINT MOTION by Aldi, Inc. (Ohio), Aldi, Inc. (Pennsylvania), Aldi, Inc. (Maryland), Joyce L. Martin for Entry of Agreed Orders Governing the Inadvertent Disclosure of Documents or Other Material Under Rule 502(d) and Setting Deposition Protocol, #8 JOINT MOTION by Aldi, Inc. (Ohio), Aldi, Inc. (Pennsylvania), Aldi, Inc. (Maryland), Joyce L. Martin for Entry of Agreed Protective Order. (ts)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT MOTION by Aldi, Inc. (Ohio), Aldi, Inc. (Pennsylvania), Aldi, Inc. (Maryland), Joyce L. Martin for Entry of Agreed Orders Governing the Inadvertent Disclosure of Documents or Other Material Under Rule 502(d) and Setting Deposition Protocol (Attachments: #1 Agreed Order Governing the Inadvertant Disclosure of Documents or Other Material Under Rule 502(d), #2 Order Setting Deposition Protocol)(Kaminski, Scott) (Modified on 1/31/2019 to add party filers) (ts).
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT MOTION by Aldi, Inc. (Ohio), Aldi, Inc. (Pennsylvania), Aldi, Inc. (Maryland), Joyce L. Martin for Entry of Agreed Protective Order (Attachment: #1 Protective Order)(Kaminski, Scott) (Modified on 1/31/2019 to add party filers) (ts).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 4/1/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 8/7/2019 and all depositions by 9/23/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 7/31/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 8/26/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 9/9/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 10/9/2019, any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 12/30/2019; Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 1/6/2020, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 1/13/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 1/28/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 9:30 AM on 2/3/2020 in Huntington. Trial set for 2/4/2020 at 8:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; canceling the scheduling conference set for 3/4/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/18/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Aldi, Inc. (Maryland), Aldi, Inc. (Ohio), Aldi, Inc. (Pennsylvania), Joyce L. Martin. (Attachment: #1 Worksheet)(Kaminski, Scott) (Modified on 1/17/2019 to add party filers) (ts).
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants Aldi, Inc. (Ohio) (Kaminski, Scott) (Modified on 1/10/2019 to remove incorrect filers) (ts)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 1/30/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/11/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/19/2019. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 3/4/2019 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/11/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/18/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/10/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
January 7, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Aldi, Inc. (Maryland), Aldi, Inc. (Ohio), and Aldi, Inc. (Pennsylvania). (hkl)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aldi, Inc. (Maryland), Aldi, Inc. (Ohio), Aldi, Inc. (Pennsylvania) with summons, complaint, docket sheet, and notice of filing notice of removal from Circuit Court of Cabell County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7015694. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Aldi, Inc. (Maryland) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce L. Martin
Represented By: Scott S. Segal
Represented By: Charles Edward Amos, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldi, Inc. (Pennsylvania)
Represented By: Scott H. Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldi, Inc. (Ohio)
Represented By: Scott H. Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldi, Inc. (Maryland)
Represented By: Scott H. Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?