Fox et al v. Kleski et al

Plaintiff: Brian R. Fox and Barbara Fox
Defendant: Kreig F. Kleski and Jennifer C. Chapman Kleski
Case Number: 3:2019cv00036
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Westfield National Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Exchange, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 summons as to Erie Insurance Exchange, #2 summons as to Erie Insurance Exchange, #3 summons as to Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, #4 summons as to Progressive Specialty Insurance Company) (jsa)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Brian R. Fox, Barbara Fox for Erie Insurance Exchange for Brian R. Fox and Barbara A. Fox, re: #1 Complaint. (Giatras, Troy)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Brian R. Fox, Barbara Fox for Erie Insurance Exchange for Brian R. Fox and Barbara A. Fox, re: #1 Complaint. (Giatras, Troy)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Brian R. Fox, Barbara Fox for Progressive Specialty Insurance Company for Kreig F. Kleski, re: #1 Complaint. (Giatras, Troy)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Brian R. Fox, Barbara Fox for Progressive Specialty Insurance Company for Kreig F. Kleski, re: #1 Complaint. (Giatras, Troy)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Brian R. Fox, Barbara Fox for Westfield National Insurance Company for Jennifer C. Chapman Kleski, re: #1 Complaint. (Giatras, Troy)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE FEE in the sum of $50.00 received from The Giatras Law Firm PLLC. Receipt Number CHAR015447. (cc: Administrative Services) (jsa)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Mark C. Ladendorf. Local counsel: Troy Giatras. (jsa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kreig F. Kleski, Jennifer C. Chapman Kleski, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons for Jennifer C. Chapman Kleski) (hkl)
January 10, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7020969. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox et al v. Kleski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian R. Fox
Represented By: Mark C. Ladendorf
Represented By: Troy N. Giatras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Fox
Represented By: Mark C. Ladendorf
Represented By: Troy N. Giatras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kreig F. Kleski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer C. Chapman Kleski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?