Sullivan et al v. Putnam Transport, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James L. Sullivan and Tonia Sullivan
Defendant: Putnam Transport, LLC and Lawrence Michael Buss
Case Number: 3:2019cv00059
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MEDIATION by Lawrence Michael Buss, Putnam Transport, LLC (Massie, Robert)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 4/22/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 10/1/2019 and all depositions by 11/15/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 10/1/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 11/1/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 11/15/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 12/2/2019; any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 2/18/2020. Plaintiffs' portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 2/24/2020; Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 3/2/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 3/17/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 9:30 AM on 3/23/2020 in Huntington. Trial set for 3/24/2020 at 8:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. The Court further CANCELS the scheduling conference set for 3/25/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/7/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth the terms for the handling of confidential documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/7/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by Lawrence Michael Buss, Putnam Transport, LLC, Tonia Sullivan, James L. Sullivan (Massie, Robert) (Modified on 3/7/2019 to add party filers) (ts).
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Putnam Transport, LLC (Massie, Robert)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Lawrence Michael Buss, Putnam Transport, LLC, Tonia Sullivan, James L. Sullivan. (Massie, Robert) (Modified on 3/7/2019 to add party filers)(ts).
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Putnam Transport, LLC for First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Massie, Robert)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand by Lawrence Michael Buss, Putnam Transport, LLC.(Massie, Robert) (Modified on 2/4/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (ts).
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 2/19/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/4/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/11/2019. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 3/25/2019 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 4/1/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 4/8/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/29/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
January 24, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Putnam Transport, LLC, Lawrence Michael Buss with civil case information statement, summonses, complaint, acceptance of service, and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Mason County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7035581. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan et al v. Putnam Transport, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Sullivan
Represented By: Robert B. Warner
Represented By: Truman C. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonia Sullivan
Represented By: Robert B. Warner
Represented By: Truman C. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Putnam Transport, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Massie
Represented By: David Alan Holtzapfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Michael Buss
Represented By: Robert L. Massie
Represented By: David Alan Holtzapfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?