Rose v. Taylor et al

Plaintiff: Steven R. Rose
Defendant: Stephen Michael Taylor, P&S Transportation, LLC and John Doe Defendants 1-2
Case Number: 3:2019cv00107
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 6/14/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 10/18/2019 and all depositions by 4/1/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 2/3/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 3/2/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 3/16/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 5/1/2020, any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 6/29/2020. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 7/6/2020, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 7/13/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 7/28/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 9:30 AM on 8/3/2020 in Huntington. Trial set for 8/4/2020 at 8:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; canceling the scheduling conference set for 4/8/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/21/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by P&S Transportation, LLC, Stephen Michael Taylor, Steven R. Rose. (Hettrich, Jordan) (Modified on 3/18/2019 to add party filer) (ts).
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy A. Montgomery on behalf of Stephen Michael Taylor. (Montgomery, Timothy)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan C. Hettrich on behalf of Stephen Michael Taylor. (Hettrich, Jordan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant P&S Transportation, LLC (Hettrich, Jordan)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 3/6/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/18/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/25/2019. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 4/8/2019 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 4/15/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 4/22/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/14/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by P&S Transportation, LLC, Stephen Michael Taylor.(Hettrich, Jordan) (Modified on 2/15/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy A. Montgomery on behalf of P&S Transportation, LLC. (Montgomery, Timothy)
February 12, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by P&S Transportation, LLC with summons, complaint, docket sheet, and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Cabell County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7068864. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven R. Rose
Represented By: Matthew R. Oliver
Represented By: Jason A. Leasure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Michael Taylor
Represented By: Jordan C. Hettrich
Represented By: Timothy A. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P&S Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Jordan C. Hettrich
Represented By: Timothy A. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?