Muncy et al v. Marshall University Board of Governors
Plaintiff: Mary Muncy and Edgar H. Muncy, Sr.
Defendant: Marshall University Board of Governors
Case Number: 3:2019cv00361
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 10/15/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 6/5/2020 and all depositions by 7/31/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 1/24/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 3/2/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 4/24/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 8/3/2020; any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 9/28/2020. Plaintiffs' portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 10/5/2020; Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 10/13/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 10/27/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 9:30 AM on 11/2/2020 in Huntington. Trial set for 11/3/2020 at 8:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. The Court further CANCELS the scheduling conference set for 7/29/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 7/3/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Mary Muncy, Edgar H. Muncy, Sr., Marshall University Board of Governors. (Ketchum, Bert) (Modified on 7/2/2019 to add party filers)(ts).
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edgar H. Muncy, Sr, Mary Muncy for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Ketchum, Bert)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 6/24/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/8/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/15/2019. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 7/29/2019 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 8/5/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 8/12/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/31/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER TO #1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand by Marshall University Board of Governors.(Shuman, David) (Modified on 5/31/2019 to add link to #1 complaint and to add jury demand)(ts).
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Marshall University Board of Governors. Marshall University Board of Governors served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. Summons served on James R. Bailes, Chairman MU Board of Governors. (Ketchum, Bert)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marshall University Board of Governors, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jsa)
May 8, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Mary Muncy, Edgar H. Muncy, Sr. for James R. Bailes, re: #1 Complaint. (Ketchum, Bert)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7220541. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muncy et al v. Marshall University Board of Governors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall University Board of Governors
Represented By: David Lewis Shuman, Jr.
Represented By: D. C. Offutt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Muncy
Represented By: Bert Ketchum
Represented By: Larry A. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar H. Muncy, Sr.
Represented By: Bert Ketchum
Represented By: Larry A. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?