Spradlin v. Woods
Plaintiff: Jacob Spradlin
Defendant: Superintendent Joseph Woods
Case Number: 3:2019cv00367
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jacob Spradlin against Joseph Woods. (jsa)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing Plaintiff to amend his complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, as more fully set forth herein; Plaintiff is hereby given notice that a failure to amend the complaint as ordered shall result in a recommendation that the complaint be dismissed; if Plaintiff wishes to voluntarily dismiss the pending action, he shall file a Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with the Clerk of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/10/2019. (cc: Plaintiff) (jsa)
May 9, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (jsa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Jacob Spradlin to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (jsa) (Additional attachments added on 5/9/2019: #1 Average Resident Balance Statement, #2 Resident Transaction Details) (mkw). (Modified on 5/9/2019 to add attachment nos. 1 and 2 that were inadvertently omitted) (mkw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spradlin v. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Spradlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Joseph Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?