Cruickshank v. Henson

Plaintiff: Joseph Allen William Cruickshank
Defendant: Aaron Henson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00370
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS REISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Joseph Allen William Cruickshank for Aaron Henson, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 1 copy forwarded to United States Marshal Service for service. (hkl)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 Partial Filing Fee Received: $4.40, Receipt Number CHAR015977. (hkl)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Joseph Allen William Cruickshank for Aaron Henson, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 1 copy forwarded to United States Marshal Service for service. (hkl)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing Plaintiff to make an initial partial filing fee payment of $5.00 on or before 6/15/2019; directing Plaintiff to make monthly payments beginning on 8/5/2019, as more fully set forth herein; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of Court who shall collect therefrom all unpaid fees and costs taxed against Plaintiff and shall pay the balance, if any, to the Plaintiff; directing the Clerk of Court to issue a summons for the named defendant; directing the United States Marshals Service to serve the summonses and complaint on the defendant,or their designated agents for service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/13/2019. (cc: Plaintiff; USM; Administrator of the Western Regional Jail) (hkl) Modified on 5/16/2019 to correct the date initial partial filing fee is due and the date as to when monthly payments are to begin) (mkw).
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Western Regional Jail and Correctional Facility to collect, store, and maintain the video-recording from April 27, 2019 described by Plaintiff in the complaint, as said recording is potential evidence in this case; further directing the Western Regional Jail and Correctional Facility to collect, store, and maintain any investigative materials, photographs, and any other similar information related to the incidents alleged in the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/13/2019. (cc: Plaintiff, the Superintendent of the Western Regional Jail, and the Commissioner of the West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation) (mkw)
May 10, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (jsa)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Joseph Allen William Cruickshank to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruickshank v. Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Allen William Cruickshank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?