Ferguson v. Bizzack Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: Richard Ferguson
Defendant: Bizzack Construction, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00382
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Bizzack Construction, LLC in support of #9 MOTION by Bizzack Construction, LLC to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Sweeney, Robert)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Bizzack Construction, LLC to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit)(Sweeney, Robert)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 7/8/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/22/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/29/2019. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 8/12/2019 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 8/19/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 8/26/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/17/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Bizzack Construction, LLC (Sweeney, Robert)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint With Jury Demand by Bizzack Construction, LLC.(Sweeney, Robert) (Modified on 6/14/2019 to add jury demand)(ts).
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Bizzack Construction, LLC re: #1 Complaint to June 14, 2019 by Bizzack Construction, LLC, Richard Ferguson (Sweeney, Robert) (Modified on 6/14/2019 to add party filer) (ts).
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 5/20/2019 as to Bizzack Construction, LLC. (hkl)
May 15, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bizzack Construction, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jsa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # BWVSDC-7235135. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Bizzack Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bizzack Construction, LLC
Represented By: Robert H. Sweeney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ferguson
Represented By: James D. McQueen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?