Scott v. Black Hawk Mining LLC et al

Plaintiff: Paul Lawrence Scott
Defendant: Black Hawk Mining LLC, John Does, 1 through 10 and Blue Creek Mining, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00411
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUGGESTION ON PENDENCY OF BANKRUPTCY and Automatic Stay of Proceedings by Black Hawk Mining LLC, Blue Creek Mining, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition of Blackhawk Mining LLC)(Pack, Ashley)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Black Hawk Mining LLC, Blue Creek Mining, LLC in support of #6 MOTION by Black Hawk Mining LLC, Blue Creek Mining, LLC to Dismiss #1 Complaint or, in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration (Pack, Ashley)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Black Hawk Mining LLC, Blue Creek Mining, LLC to Dismiss #1 Complaint or, in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pack, Ashley) (Modified on 7/14/2019 to correct event selection and to add link to #1 complaint) (ts).
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 6/11/2019 as to Black Hawk Mining LLC. (hkl)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 6/11/2019 as to Blue Creek Mining, LLC. (hkl)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Black Hawk Mining LLC, Blue Creek Mining, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 summons as to Blue Creek Mining LLC) (jsa)
May 28, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7254887. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Black Hawk Mining LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Lawrence Scott
Represented By: John A. Proctor
Represented By: Abraham J. Saad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Hawk Mining LLC
Represented By: Ashley C. Pack
Represented By: Kelsey Haught Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Creek Mining, LLC
Represented By: Ashley C. Pack
Represented By: Kelsey Haught Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?