Bateman et al v. CMH Homes, Inc.
Plaintiff: Termaine Bateman, Brandi Bateman and Ariyanna Bateman
Defendant: CMH Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00449
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 9/4/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 12/12/2019 and all depositions by 1/27/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 11/25/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 12/24/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 1/10/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 2/13/2020, any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 4/27/2020. Plaintiffs' portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendant due by 5/4/2020, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 5/11/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 6/2/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 9:30 AM on 6/8/2020 in Huntington. Trial set for 6/9/2020 at 8:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; further canceling the scheduling conference set for 8/5/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 7/31/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl) (Modified on 7/31/2019 to correct the date to contradict or rebut evidence) (mkw).
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CMH Homes, Inc. for Notice of Mediation. (Stemple, Jason)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by CMH Homes, Inc. (Stemple, Jason)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED ANSWER by CMH Homes, Inc. to Complaint Attached to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (Stemple, Jason) (Modified on 7/2/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 7/5/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/15/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/22/2019. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 8/5/2019 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 8/12/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 8/19/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/14/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
June 13, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal by CMH Homes, Inc. with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Putnam County and #2 Answer. ERROR: Incorrect filing date for notice of removal and answer. CORRECTION: Filing dates corrected. (ts)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
June 12, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER by CMH Homes, Inc. to Complaint Attached to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (hkl) (Modified on 6/13/2019 to revise filing date) (ts).
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CMH Homes, Inc. with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Putnam County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7279716. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl) (Modified on 6/13/2019 to revise filing date) (ts).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bateman et al v. CMH Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMH Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Jason J. Stemple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Termaine Bateman
Represented By: Seth S. Gaskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Bateman
Represented By: Seth S. Gaskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariyanna Bateman
Represented By: Seth S. Gaskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?