Dyer v. GC Services Limited Partnership
Plaintiff: Parker Dyer
Defendant: GC Services Limited Partnership
Case Number: 3:2019cv00458
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to #4 Amended Complaint to September 24, 2019 by Parker Dyer (McQueen, James)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 7/3/2019 as to GC Services Limited Partnership. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002545588. (hkl)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 6/26/2019 as to GC Services Limited Partnership. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002541962. (jsa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GC Services Limited Partnership, re: #4 Amended Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mkw)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Parker Dyer against GC Services Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for GC Services Limited Partnership) (ts)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GC Services Limited Partnership, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)
June 14, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7283810. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dyer v. GC Services Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker Dyer
Represented By: Hoyt E. Glazer
Represented By: James D. McQueen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GC Services Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?