Haynie v. Saul
Plaintiff: Bryan Keith Haynie
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00478
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Bryan Keith Haynie for service upon Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. Andrew Saul served on 7/6/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. Person Served: Vicky Dickerson. Return Receipt Card for Attorney General signed on 7/8/2019. Return Receipt Card for Commissioner of Social Security signed on 7/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green Cards)(Hicks, Kenneth)
July 2, 2019 NOTICE: Replaced defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Social Security Commissioner with Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and updated case title. (mwk) (ADI)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 8 RESPONSE. Error: Image contained a typographical error and an incorrect case number. Correction: Counsel refiled the correct image for the response at docket entry no. 9. (mkw)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Bryan Keith Haynie to the Court's #6 Order. (Hicks, Kenneth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Hicks, Kenneth) (Modified on 6/28/2019 to remove image) (mkw).
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nancy A. Berryhill, re: #2 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing counsel to file with the Court a pleading certifying whether Dr. Robert Kropac is or is not involved in this matter no later than 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 6/27/2019. (cc: counsel of record; parties acting pro se) (hkl)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS granting Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing the Clerk of the Court to issue the summons(es) and Plaintiff to serve the summons(es) and complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of the Court, who shall pay therefrom all unpaid costs taxed against plaintiff and pay the balance to the plaintiff and plaintiff's attorney, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 6/27/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (hkl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
June 26, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Bryan Keith Haynie for Nancy A. Berryhill, re: #2 Complaint. (hkl)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Bryan Keith Haynie to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynie v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Keith Haynie
Represented By: Kenneth P. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?