Stone et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Milynda Desirae Stone and John Erik Stone
Defendant: Huntington Veterans Affairs Medical Center and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00538
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for United States of America, Return Receipt Card signed by Honorable William Barr, Attorney General. United States of America served on 7/29/2019. (McQueen, James) (Answer set by entry no. 4) (ts)
July 29, 2019 RESET DEADLINE: Huntington Veterans Affairs Medical Center answer due 9/24/2019. (mkw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for Huntington Veterans Affairs Medical Center re: #1 Complaint. Return Receipt Card signed by Michael Lee Brandon (date not given) on behalf of Dan Rattray, Office of Chief Counsel, Dept. of Veterans Affairs. Dept. of Veterans Affairs served on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (McQueen, James) (Modified on 7/29/2019 to add the name of the person who signed the green card in the docket text, the name of the person served and to correct the answer due date deadline) (mkw).
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for United States of America. Summons served on U.S. Attorney - Room 209/US Dept. of Veterans Affairs served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (McQueen, James) (Modified on 8/22/2019 to modify answer date) (ts).
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for United States of America. United States of America/US Dept. of Veterans Affairs served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. Summons served on Civil Process Clerk. (McQueen, James) (Modified on 8/22/2019 to modify answer date) (ts).
July 23, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Huntington Veterans Affairs Medical Center, United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 summons as to Civil Process Clerk, #2 summons as to William P. Barr, #3 summons as to Dan Rattray, #4 summons as to Pamela Crew-Allen) (jsa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7327460. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milynda Desirae Stone
Represented By: James D. McQueen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Erik Stone
Represented By: James D. McQueen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Veterans Affairs Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?