Hagler v. WSAZ NewsChannel
Plaintiff: Hasaan Rekeem Hagler
Defendant: WSAZ NewsChannel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00545
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY MEMORADUM by WSAZ NewsChannel to #11 Response In Opposition. (Flaherty, Thomas)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 Partial Filing Fee Received: $41.00, Receipt Number CHAR016427. (jsa)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Hasaan Rekeem Hagler to #8 MOTION by WSAZ NewsChannel to Dismiss #2 Complaint. (jsa)
September 19, 2019 SET DEADLINE as to #8 MOTION by WSAZ NewsChannel to Dismiss #2 COMPLAINT. Responses due by 10/11/2019, pursuant to the #10 Order. (jsa)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing that Plaintiff shall have through and including 10/11/2019 in which to file a response to Defendant's #8 MOTION to Dismiss #2 COMPLAINT; Following service of Plaintiff's response, if such is filed, Defendant shall have ten (10) days within which to reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/19/2019. (cc: Plaintiff; counsel of record) (jsa)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by WSAZ NewsChannel in support of #8 MOTION by WSAZ NewsChannel to Dismiss #2 Complaint (Flaherty, Thomas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by WSAZ NewsChannel to Dismiss #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert.(Flaherty, Thomas) (Modified on 9/19/2019 to add link to #2 complaint) (ts)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Partial Filing Fee Received: $16.02, Receipt Number CHAR016300. (hkl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon WSAZ NewsChannel, re: #2 Complaint. WSAZ NewsChannel served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. Person Served: Kristen Bentley. (hkl)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Hasaan Rekeem Hagler for WSAZ NewsChannel, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies forwarded to United States Marshal Service for service. (hkl)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing Plaintiff to make payments beginning 10/4/2019, as more fully set forth herein; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of Court who shall collect therefrom all unpaid fees and costs taxed against Plaintiff and shall pay the balance, if any, to the Plaintiff; directing the Clerk of Court to issue a summons for the named defendant; directing the United States Marshals Service to serve the summons and complaint on the defendant, or its designated agent for service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/8/2019. (cc: Plaintiff; USM; Administrator of the Western Regional Jail and Correctional Facility) (hkl)
July 24, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (hkl)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Hasaan Rekeem Hagler to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagler v. WSAZ NewsChannel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSAZ NewsChannel
Represented By: Thomas V. Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hasaan Rekeem Hagler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?