Black v. Hammers et al
Plaintiff: Russell Allen Black
Defendant: Cabell County Prosecuting Attorney Office, Sean K. Hammers and Lauren Plymale
Case Number: 3:2019cv00582
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT ORDER in accordance with the accompanying #11 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER; DISMISSING the #2 COMPLAINT with prejudice; REMOVING this matter from the docket of the Court; and DENYING Plaintiff's #5 LETTER-FORM MOTION/REQUEST for a Speedy Trial. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/2/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER accepting and incorporating the #9 Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Magistrate Judge Eifert; dismissing the #2 COMPLAINT with prejudice; removing this matter from the docket of the Court; and denying Plaintiff's #5 LETTER FORM MOTION/REQUEST for a Speedy Trial. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/2/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION by Russell Allen Black to #9 Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Magistrate Judge. (jsa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert; recommending that the presiding District Judge DISMISS the #2 Complaint with prejudice; and REMOVE this matter from the docket of the Court; further recommending that Plaintiff's #5 LETTER-FORM MOTION for a Speedy Trial be denied. Objections to Proposed F&R due by 9/30/2019. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/11/2019. (cc: Plaintiff) (hkl)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing Plaintiff to make monthly payments beginning on 10/5/2019, as more fully set forth herein; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of Court, who shall collect therefrom all unpaid fees and costs taxed against Plaintiff and shall pay the balance, if any, to the Plaintiff; denying Plaintiff's #6 MOTION for Issuance of a Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/6/2019. (cc: Plaintiff; Administrator of St. Marys Correctional Center) (jsa)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Russell Allen Black. (jsa)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER-FORM MOTION by Russell Allen Black for Issuance of Subpoena. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (jsa)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER-FORM MOTION/REQUEST by Russell Allen Black for a Speedy Trial. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (jsa)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTATION by Russell Allen Black in support of #2 Complaint. (jsa)
August 7, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (jsa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Russell Allen Black to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Hammers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabell County Prosecuting Attorney Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean K. Hammers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Allen Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?