Hatfield et al v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Plaintiff: Lisa Lynn Hatfield and Steven Ray Hatfield
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00584
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 11/7/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 2/7/2020, and all depositions by 3/24/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 1/24/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 2/24/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 3/10/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 4/14/2020; any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 7/6/2020. Plaintiffs' portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 7/13/2020; Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 7/20/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 10:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 8/4/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 9:30 AM on 8/10/2020 in Huntington. Trial set for 8/11/2020 at 8:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; further CANCELING the scheduling conference set for 10/7/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/24/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
September 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 Rule 26(f) Report Of Planning Meeting by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Steven Ray Hatfield, Lisa Lynn Hatfield. ERROR: Image did not contain signatures of counsel. CORRECTION: Image replaced. (ts)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Lisa Lynn Hatfield, Steven Ray Hatfield in opposition to #4 MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC to Dismiss Complaint (Elmore, O.)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Steven Ray Hatfield, Lisa Lynn Hatfield. (Raupp, Peter) (Modified on 9/23/2019 to add party filers) (ts). (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/24/2019 and to replace unsigned image) (ts).
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC in support of #4 MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC to Dismiss Complaint. (Raupp, Peter)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Raupp, Peter) (Modified on 9/3/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 9/3/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/16/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/23/2019. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 10/7/2019 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 10/15/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/15/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
August 8, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC with summons, complaint, order, rule to show cause, and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Putnam County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7343412. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatfield et al v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Lynn Hatfield
Represented By: O. Gay Elmore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ray Hatfield
Represented By: O. Gay Elmore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Raupp
Represented By: John Joseph Meadows
Represented By: Devon J. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?