Jacques et al v. Putnam County School Board et al
Plaintiff: Stacy Jacques and J. J.
Defendant: Putnam County School Board and Winfield Middle School
Case Number: 3:2019cv00611
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #11 MOTION to Dismiss; directing that the #4 STANDING ORDER entered on 8/22/2019 referring this matter to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for submission of proposed findings of fact and recommendations is VACATED; further directing that the case be DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the docket. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/29/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by J. J., Stacy Jacques to Dismiss, re: #2 Complaint; Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (mkw)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon Winfield Middle School, re: #2 Complaint. Winfield Middle School served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. Person Served: Matthew Shock, principal. (hkl)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon Putnam County School Board, re: #2 Complaint. Putnam County School Board served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. Person Served: Donna Sergent, secretary. (hkl)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Stacy Jacques, J. J. for Winfield Middle School, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies delivered to U.S. Marshals for service. (jsa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Stacy Jacques, J. J. for Putnam County School Board, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies delivered to U.S. Marshals for service. (jsa)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF COSTS AND FEES granting Plaintiffs' #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing that the Clerk of the Court shall issue summonses to the defendants and provide them, along with copies of the complaint, to the United States Marshals Service; the United States Marshals Service shall serve the summonses and complaint on the defendants as set forth herein; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of the Court, who shall pay therefrom all unpaid costs and fees taxed against the plaintiff and pay the balance to the plaintiff, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/12/2019. (cc: Stacy Jacques on behalf of the minor plaintiff; USM) (jsa)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk to redact the names of the minor children contained in the #2 Complaint and #1 Application before docketing and to substitute the initials J. J. for the minor plaintiff on the docket; notifying Plaintiff that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, all future filings shall refer to minor children by their initials only; future documents submitted by Plainitff that fail to comply with this Rule will be returned to Plaintiff for proper redaction before being filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/22/2019. (cc: Plaintiff) (jsa)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
August 21, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION/REQUEST by J. J., Stacy Jacques for Injunction. (jsa)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by J. J., Stacy Jacques to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacques et al v. Putnam County School Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. J.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Putnam County School Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winfield Middle School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?