Jones et al v. The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia et al
Plaintiff: Timothy R. Jones and Janie Cole
Defendant: Alicia Coey, Alicia Powell, John Hudson, Candi Hatfield, The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia, Eddie Starcher and Sharla Griffith
Case Number: 3:2019cv00618
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Sharla Griffith, Candi Hatfield, John Hudson, The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia in support of #21 MOTION by Sharla Griffith, Candi Hatfield, John Hudson, The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia to Dismiss re: #17 Amended Complaint. (Mincer, David)
October 17, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Sharla Griffith, Candi Hatfield, John Hudson, The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia to Dismiss re: #17 First Amended Complaint. (Mincer, David)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying as moot Defendants' #15 MOTION to Dismiss #1 COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/17/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 9, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Alicia Coey a/k/a Alicia Powell and Eddie Starcher to Answer the #17 First Amended Complaint by Alicia Coey, Eddie Starcher (LaFon, Timothy) (Modified on 10/9/2019 to add link to #17 amended complaint) (ts).
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Janie Cole, Timothy R. Jones in opposition to #15 MOTION by Sharla Griffith, Candi Hatfield, John Hudson, The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Peyton, Harvey)
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Timothy R. Jones, Janie Cole against Alicia Coey, Sharla Griffith, Candi Hatfield, John Hudson, Eddie Starcher, The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia; Jury demand. (mkw)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Sharla Griffith, Candi Hatfield, John Hudson, The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia in support of #15 MOTION by Sharla Griffith, Candi Hatfield, John Hudson, The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia to Dismiss #1 Complaint (Mincer, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Sharla Griffith, Candi Hatfield, John Hudson, The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Mincer, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia, re: #1 Complaint. The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. Person Served: Rob Cunningham. (Peyton, Harvey)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia, John Hudson, Sharla Griffith, Candi Hatfield to File a Responsive Pleading to #1 Complaint to 09/20/2019 by Sharla Griffith, Candi Hatfield, John Hudson, The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia,Timothy R. Jones, Janie Cole (Mincer, David) (Modified on 9/18/2019 to add party filers) (ts).
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED as to The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jsa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS TO BE REISSUED SUBMITTED by Timothy R. Jones, Janie Cole for The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia, Rob Cunningham, President, or, if not found, Mark Sorsaia, Putnam County Prosecuting Attorney, re: #1 Complaint. (Peyton, Harvey)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Alicia Coey, Eddie Starcher.(LaFon, Timothy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Alicia Coey, re: #1 Complaint. Sarah Campbell for Alicia Coey served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Peyton, Harvey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Eddie Starcher, re: #1 Complaint. Sarah Campbell for Eddie Starcher served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Peyton, Harvey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for John Hudson, re: #1 Complaint. Kara Jones for John Hudson served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Peyton, Harvey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia/John Hudson, re: #1 Complaint. The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Peyton, Harvey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Sharla Griffith re: #1 Complaint. Sharla Griffith served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. Summons served on Sharla Griffith. (Peyton, Harvey) (Modified on 9/8/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (ts).
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Candi Hatfield re: #1 Complaint. Candi Hatfield served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. Summons served on Candi Hatfield. (Peyton, Harvey) (Modified on 9/8/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (ts).
August 26, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alicia Coey, Sharla Griffith, Candi Hatfield, John Hudson, Eddie Starcher, The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 summons as to John Hudson, #2 summons as to Sharla Griffith, #3 summons as to Candi Hatfield, #4 summons as to Alicia Coey, #5 summons as to Eddie Starcher) (jsa)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7361980. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Coey
Represented By: Timothy J. LaFon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Powell
Represented By: Timothy J. LaFon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hudson
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Carder
Represented By: David J. Mincer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candi Hatfield
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Carder
Represented By: David J. Mincer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Education of Putnam County, West Virginia
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Carder
Represented By: David J. Mincer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Starcher
Represented By: Timothy J. LaFon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharla Griffith
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Carder
Represented By: David J. Mincer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy R. Jones
Represented By: Harvey D. Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janie Cole
Represented By: Harvey D. Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?