International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund et al v. LMS Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund and International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Annuity and Savings Fund
Defendant: LMS Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00641
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY CLERK as to LMS Construction, Inc. (Attachment: #1 certified mail receipt) (cc: counsel of record; defendant via certified mail) (jsa)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #8 ORDER to counsel of record; to Defendant via certified mail. (jsa)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: Plaintiffs' #7 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk; directing the Clerk of Court to enter a default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), against Defendant LMS Construction, Inc.; after the default is entered, the Court will proceed to consider Plaintiffs' #5 MOTION for Default Judgment filed on 10/29/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/1/2019. (cc: counsel of record; defendant) (jsa)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Annuity and Savings Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132, AFL-CIO for Entry of Default by Clerk against LMS Construction, Inc. (Lowry, Lawrence)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to LMS Construction, Inc. re: #1 Complaint. Answer due: 10/08/2019. (Lowry, Lawrence) (Modified on 10/31/2019 to covert even to summons returned executed by secretary of state) (ts)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Annuity and Savings Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132, AFL-CIO for Entry of Default Judgment by the Clerk against LMS Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting documentation)(Lowry, Lawrence)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 9/12/2019 as to LMS Construction, Inc.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002585188. (jsa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LMS Construction, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jsa)
September 4, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # CWVSDC-7372065. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund et al v. LMS Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Lawrence B. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Lawrence B. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund
Represented By: Lawrence B. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund
Represented By: Lawrence B. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Annuity and Savings Fund
Represented By: Lawrence B. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMS Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?