Williams v. MJC Acquisition, LLC, Matilda Jane, LLC
Plaintiff: Amy Williams
Defendant: MJC Acquisition, LLC, Matilda Jane, LLC and MJC Acquisition, LLC, Matilda Jane, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00643
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 RESET ANSWER DEADLINE for MJC Acquisition, LLC, Matilda Jane, LLC to 12/26/2019 pursuant to #9 Notice. (ts)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION/NOTICE EXTENDING TIME for Matilda Jane to Answer #1 Complaint to December 26, 2019 by Amy Williams (Sparks, Aubrey) (Modified on 11/4/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (ts).
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Defendants' #7 MOTION to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleadings; extending the time for Defendants to file a responsive pleading to 11/14/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/21/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by MJC Acquisition, LLC, Matilda Jane, LLC to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleadings to #1 Complaint to November 14, 2019 (Kinder, Eric) (Modified on 10/18/2019 to add link to #1 complaint)(ts).
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF EXTENSION by Amy Williams granting Defendant MJC Acquisition, LLC an extension of thirty days to Answer #1 Complaint. (Sparks, Aubrey) (Modified on 10/21/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (ts).
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 9/20/2019 as to MJC Acquisition, LLC, Matilda Jane, LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002587427. (hkl)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 9/20/2019 as to MJC Acquisition, LLC, Matilda Jane, LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002587410. (hkl)
September 9, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MJC Acquisition, LLC, Matilda Jane, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons for Matilda Jane, LLC) (hkl)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7376189. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. MJC Acquisition, LLC, Matilda Jane, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Williams
Represented By: Aubrey Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC Acquisition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matilda Jane, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC Acquisition, LLC, Matilda Jane, LLC
Represented By: Eric E. Kinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?