Scalia v. Blackjewel, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Pizzella and Eugene Scalia
Defendant: Blackjewel, LLC, Lone Mountain Processing, LLC, Harold Keene Coal Co., LLC, Powell Mountain Energy, LLC, Revelation Energy, LLC, Blackjewel Holdings, LLC, Cumberland River Coal, LLC, Dominion Coal Corporation, Vansant Coal Corporation, Revelation Energy Holdings, LLC and Revelation Management Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00667
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 25 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #24 Amended Consent Judgment to counsel of record. (jsa)
October 24, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED CONSENT JUDGMENT substituting Secretary of Labor Eugene Scalia for Acting Secretary of Labor, Patrick Pizzella, as the plaintiff in this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d); directing that Defendants, their officers, agents, servants, and all persons acting or claiming to act on their behalf and interest be permanently enjoined and restrained from violating the provisions of Sections 6, 7 and 15 of the Act, in any manner, as more fully set forth herein; further directing that each party will bear its own fees and other expenses incurred by such party in connection with any stage of this proceeding including, but not limited to, attorney fees, which may be available under the Equal Access to Justice Act, as amended. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/24/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 21, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER Amended Consent Judgment by Patrick Pizzella, Defendants (Westfall, Fred) (Modified on 10/22/2019 to add party filers) (ts).
October 21, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION by Patrick Pizzella to Amend #19 Consent Judgment (Westfall, Fred) (Modified on 10/22/2019 to add link to #19 consent judgment) (ts).
October 15, 2019 Filing 21 MAIL RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE. Mail sent to Samantha Thomas, Oscar L. Hampton, U.S. Department of Labor, re: #3 STANDING ORDER. Mail not resent. (jsa)
October 7, 2019 Filing 20 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #19 Consent Judgment to counsel of record. (jsa)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT JUDGMENT directing that Defendants, their officers, agents, servants, and all persons acting or claiming to act on their behalf and interest be permanently enjoined and restrained from violating the provisions of 6, 7, and 15 of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 U.S.C. 201, et seq., in any manner, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/7/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Blackjewel Holdings, LLC, Blackjewel, LLC, Cumberland River Coal, LLC, Dominion Coal Corporation, Harold Keene Coal Co., LLC, Lone Mountain Processing, LLC, Powell Mountain Energy, LLC, Revelation Energy Holdings, LLC, Revelation Energy, LLC, Revelation Management Corporation, Vansant Coal Corporation (Supple, Joe)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Stephen D. Lerner appearing on behalf of Blackjewel Holdings, LLC, Blackjewel, LLC, Cumberland River Coal, LLC, Dominion Coal Corporation, Harold Keene Coal Co., LLC, Lone Mountain Processing, LLC, Powell Mountain Energy, LLC, Revelation Energy Holdings, LLC, Revelation Energy, LLC, Revelation Management Corporation, Vansant Coal Corporation. (Supple, Joe) (Modified on 10/7/2019 to replace unsigned image)(ts).
October 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO THE CONSENT JUDGMENT by Blackjewel Holdings, LLC, Blackjewel, LLC, Cumberland River Coal, LLC, Dominion Coal Corporation, Harold Keene Coal Co., LLC, Lone Mountain Processing, LLC, Powell Mountain Energy, LLC, Revelation Energy Holdings, LLC, Revelation Energy, LLC, Revelation Management Corporation, Vansant Coal Corporation (Supple, Joe)
October 5, 2019 Filing 15 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 10/7/2019 to remove incorrect filing; see ECF #17) (ts).
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Stephen D. Lerner on 09/29/19. Vansant Coal Corporation waiver mailed on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Westfall, Fred)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Stephen D. Lerner on 09/29/19. Revelation Management Corporation waiver mailed on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Westfall, Fred)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Stephen D. Lerner on 09/29/19. Revelation Energy, LLC waiver mailed on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Westfall, Fred)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Stephen D. Lerner on 09/29/19. Revelation Energy Holdings, LLC waiver mailed on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Westfall, Fred)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Stephen D. Lerner on 09/29/19. Dominion Coal Corporation waiver mailed on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Westfall, Fred)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Stephen D. Lerner on 09/29/19. Blackjewel, LLC waiver mailed on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Westfall, Fred)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Stephen D. Lerner on 09/29/19. Blackjewel Holdings, LLC waiver mailed on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Westfall, Fred)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Stephen D. Lerner on 09/29/19. Powell Mountain Energy, LLC waiver mailed on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Westfall, Fred)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Stephen D. Lerner on 09/29/19. Lone Mountain Processing, LLC waiver mailed on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Westfall, Fred)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Stephen D. Lerner on 9/29/19. Harold Keene Coal Co., LLC waiver mailed on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Westfall, Fred)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Stephen D. Lerner on 09/29/19. Cumberland River Coal, LLC waiver mailed on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Westfall, Fred)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
September 16, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED ORDER for Consent Judgment by Patrick Pizzella. (jsa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia v. Blackjewel, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Pizzella
Represented By: Oscar L. Hampton, III
Represented By: Fred B. Westfall, Jr.
Represented By: Leah A. Williams
Represented By: Kate S. O'Scannlain
Represented By: Ryma Lewis
Represented By: Samantha Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Oscar L. Hampton, III
Represented By: Fred B. Westfall, Jr.
Represented By: Leah A. Williams
Represented By: Kate S. O'Scannlain
Represented By: Ryma Lewis
Represented By: Samantha Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackjewel, LLC
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Mountain Processing, LLC
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Keene Coal Co., LLC
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powell Mountain Energy, LLC
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revelation Energy, LLC
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackjewel Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumberland River Coal, LLC
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Coal Corporation
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vansant Coal Corporation
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revelation Energy Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revelation Management Corporation
Represented By: Joe M. Supple
Represented By: Stephen D. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?