Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health and Welfare Fund v. Tygart Electric LLC
Plaintiff: Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health and Welfare Fund
Defendant: Tygart Electric LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00848
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME to February 20, 2020 by Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health and Welfare Fund (Dascoli, John)
January 9, 2020 RESET ANSWER DEADLINE as to Tygart Electric LLC for 1/23/2020 pursuant to #5 Stipulation. (ts)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint to January 23, 2020 by Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health and Welfare Fund (Dascoli, John) (Modified on 1/10/2020 to add link to #1 complaint) (ts).
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 12/10/2019 as to Tygart Electric LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002625969. (hkl)
November 27, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tygart Electric LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7474316. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health and Welfare Fund v. Tygart Electric LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: John F. Dascoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tygart Electric LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?