Dees v. Evinger
Plaintiff: Daniel M. Dees
Defendant: Gary Wayne Evinger
Case Number: 3:2020cv00193
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 3/26/2020 as to Knight Specialty Insurance Company. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002695641. (mk)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 3/26/2020 as to Knight Specialty Insurance Company. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002695634. (mk)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gary Wayne Evinger, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Daniel M. Dees for Gary Wayne Evinger, re: #1 Complaint. (Schwirian, David)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Knight Specialty Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons for Knight Specialty Insurance Company) (hkl)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
March 19, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7576154. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dees v. Evinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Wayne Evinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel M. Dees
Represented By: Arden J. Curry, II
Represented By: David K. Schwirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?