Barker v. Meador et al
Plaintiff: Carroll Wendell Barker
Defendant: Michael A. Meador and MJS Transportation Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00233
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy A. Montgomery on behalf of MJS Transportation Inc., Michael A. Meador. (Montgomery, Timothy)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul A. Custer on behalf of MJS Transportation Inc., Michael A. Meador. (Custer, Paul)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 5/4/2020 as to Michael A. Meador. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002704565. (jsa)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 5/4/2020 as to MJS Transportation Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002704558. (jsa)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MJS Transportation Inc., Michael A. Meador, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 summons as to MJS Transportation) (jsa)
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Carroll Wendell Barker for MJS Transportation Inc., re: #1 Complaint. (Nelson, Kelsi) (Modified on 4/13/2020 to add link to #1 complaint) (mkw).
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Carroll Wendell Barker for Michael A. Meador, re: #1 Complaint. (Nelson, Kelsi) (Modified on 4/13/2020 to add link to #1 complaint) (mkw).
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
April 2, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7587181. (Attachments: #1 Payment Confirmation, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Meador et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Meador
Represented By: Paul A. Custer
Represented By: Timothy A. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJS Transportation Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Custer
Represented By: Timothy A. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carroll Wendell Barker
Represented By: Robert D. Cline, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsi R. Nelson
Represented By: R. Chad Duffield
Represented By: Robert A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?