Kovich v. Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jenni Kovich
Defendant: Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company and Cody McConnell
Case Number: 3:2020cv00518
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Williams, Marc)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER TO #3 Amended Complaint by Cody McConnell, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company.(Williams, Marc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company and Cody McConnell to Respond to #3 Amended Complaint to 9/25/2020 by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Cody McConnell, Jenni Kovich (Williams, Marc) (Modified on 9/1/2020 to add party filers and to add link to #3 amended complaint) (ts).
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/20/2020 as to Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002756052. (jsa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/14/2020 as to Cody McConnell. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002756045. (jsa)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cody McConnell, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, re: #3 Amended Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 summons as to Cody McConnell) (jsa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Jenni Kovich for Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, re: #3 Amended Complaint. (Kesner, Brent) (Modified on 8/2/2020 to add link to #3 amended complaint) (mkw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Jenni Kovich for Cody McConnell, re: #3 Amended Complaint. (Kesner, Brent) (Modified on 8/2/2020 to add link to #3 amended complaint) (mkw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand by Jenni Kovich against Cody McConnell, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company; Jury demand. (jsa) (Modified on 8/2/2020 to add jury demand) (mkw).
July 30, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7691912. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kovich v. Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenni Kovich
Represented By: Robert V. Berthold, III
Represented By: Ernest G. Hentschel, II
Represented By: Robert V. Berthold, Jr.
Represented By: Brent K. Kesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Marc E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody McConnell
Represented By: Marc E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?