Auvil v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Troy D. Auvil
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 3:2020cv00550
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #7 DISMISSAL ORDER to attorneys and any unrepresented party. (mkw)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DISMISSAL ORDER directing that this matter is dismissed with prejudice, with each side to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/15/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Troy D. Auvil to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Polak, John)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER Dismissal Order by Troy D. Auvil. (Polak, John)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Eric P. Mathison on 09/01/2020. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston waiver mailed on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Polak, John)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (Form 1A) by Troy D. Auvil for Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, with proposed WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FORM (Form 1B). (Polak, John)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7711117. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auvil v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy D. Auvil
Represented By: John J. Polak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?