Wallace v. Par Mar Oil Company
Plaintiff: Barbara Wallace
Defendant: Par Mar Oil Company doing business as Par Mar Store #80
Case Number: 3:2020cv00590
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #8 Agreed Order of Dismissal to counsel of record. (jsa)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL directing that this action be and thereby is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/16/2020. (cc: counsel of record) (jsa)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER Agreed Order of Dismissal by Barbara Wallace, Par Mar Oil Company. (Aragona, Chandler) (Modified on 10/15/2020 to add party filer) (mkw).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing that this action be STAYED pending settlement; further directing that the parties submit an agreed order of dismissal by 11/13/2020; if the parties fail to submit an agreed dismissal order, the Court will enter an order dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/13/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Par Mar Oil Company.(Aragona, Chandler) (Modified on 9/18/2020 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 10/1/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/13/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/19/2020. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 11/2/2020 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/9/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/16/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/11/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
September 10, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1 Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Defendant Par Mar Oil Company. (hkl)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Par Mar Oil Company with summons, complaint, notice of filing notice of removal, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Mason County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7733801. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Par Mar Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Wallace
Represented By: Hoyt E. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Mar Oil Company doing business as Par Mar Store #80
Represented By: Chandler Aragona
Represented By: Brian J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?