Larwa v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Shannon Larwa
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00714
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #9 Final Dismissal Order to counsel of record. (jsa)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL DISMISSAL ORDER directing that the present action should be, and the same is hereby DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, with the parties to be responsible for their own attorneys' fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/18/2020. (cc: counsel of record) (jsa)
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER Final Dismissal Order by Shannon Larwa, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Parsons, Colton) (Modified on 11/17/2020 to add party filer) (mkw).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth the terms for the handling of confidential documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/2/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
October 29, 2020 RESET DEADLINE: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC answer due 12/4/2020. (mkw)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Parsons, Colton)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Shannon Larwa; the parties stipulate that Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's complaint attached to the #1 Notice of Removal is extended to 12/4/2020. (Parsons, Colton)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Mediation by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC will be held on 11/23/2020 at 10:00 a.m. (Parsons, Colton)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 11/16/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/30/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/7/2020. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 12/21/2020 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 12/28/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 1/4/2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/29/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
October 27, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Putnam County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7784184. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larwa v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Larwa
Represented By: Scott H. Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Colton Chase Parsons
Represented By: Monte L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?