Burd v. Rescare Behavior Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robin Burd
Defendant: Rescare Behavior Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00009
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 77 U.S.C. ยง 7777
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rescare Behavior Services, Inc. for Defendants First Set Of Discovery Requests To Plaintiff. (Oko-ogua, Suleiman)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 7/1/2021. Discovery requests to be completed by 11/1/2021 and all depositions by 12/30/2021. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 9/3/2021, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 9/30/2021, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 10/15/2021. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 2/1/2022; any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 3/7/2022. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 3/14/2022; Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 3/21/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 4/5/2022. Final Settlement Conference at 9:30 AM on 4/11/2022 in Huntington. Trial set for 4/12/2022 at 8:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; further CANCELING the scheduling conference set for 3/1/2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/3/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Robin Burd, Rescare Behavior Services, Inc. (Oko-ogua, Suleiman) (Modified on 2/1/2021 to add party filer) (mkw).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 1/28/2021. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/8/2021. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/16/2021. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 3/1/2021 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/8/2021. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/15/2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/8/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT by Rescare Behavior Services, Inc. attached to #1 Notice of Removal; Jury demand. (Oko-ogua, Suleiman) (Modified on 1/11/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (mkw).
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
January 6, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rescare Behavior Services, Inc. with summons, complaint, notice of filing of petition for removal and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Cabell County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7845246. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 State Court Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burd v. Rescare Behavior Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rescare Behavior Services, Inc.
Represented By: Adam K. Strider
Represented By: Suleiman O. Oko-ogua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Burd
Represented By: Hoyt E. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?