Cook v. Metal Partners Rebar, LLC etal
Plaintiff: Dalton Cook
Defendant: Trinity Rebar and Concrete Supplies, LLC doing business as Trinity Promotions, J&R Holding, LLC doing business as Trinity Rebar, James R. Reed, BRG Holding, LLC doing business as Trinity Rebar, Glenn Jeffries and Metal Partners Rebar, LLC doing business as Metal Partners International
Case Number: 3:2021cv00174
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Dalton Cook in opposition to #15 MOTION by Metal Partners Rebar, LLC to Set Aside #12 Entry of Default by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Troy S. Fox, Esq., #2 Exhibit Decision from the M. D. N. C., #3 Exhibit Decision from the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals)(Miller, Robert)
May 5, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL by Cy A. Hill, Jr. on behalf of Metal Partners Rebar, LLC. (Hill, Cy)
April 28, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION by Metal Partners Rebar, LLC to Set Aside #12 Entry of Default by Clerk. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(Subacz, Allison) (Modified on 4/29/2021 to add link to #12 entry of default by clerk) (mkw).
April 19, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received re: #12 Entry of Default by Clerk; delivered to BRG Holding, LLC on 4/19/2021. (jsa)
April 19, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received re: #12 Entry of Default by Clerk; delivered to Metal Partners Rebar, LLC on 4/19/2021. (jsa)
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY CLERK as to BRG Holding, LLC, Metal Partners Rebar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipt, Metal Partners Rebar, LLC, #2 certified mail receipt, BRG Holding, LLC) (cc: counsel of record; defendants BRG Holding, LLC, Metal Partners Rebar, LLC via certified mail) (jsa)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the Clerk to enter a default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), against Defendants Metal Partners Rebar, LLC and BRG Holding, LLC; further directing counsel for Plaintiff to file the appropriate motions and affidavits, or to arrange for the necessary evidentiary hearing, to facilitate the entry of default judgment, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b), within twenty days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/16/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION by Dalton Cook, J&R Holding, LLC, Glenn Jeffries, James R. Reed, Trinity Rebar and Concrete Supplies, LLC; the parties stipulate and agree that the time within which these defendants may answer, move, or otherwise response to the #1 Complaint is extended to 6/1/2021. (Anderson, Jonathan)
April 5, 2021 RESET DEADLINE: J&R Holding, LLC, Glenn Jeffries, James R. Reed and Trinity Rebar and Concrete Supplies, LLC answer due 6/1/2021. (mkw)
April 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for James R. Reed. James R. Reed served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. Summons served on Dimitra Reed. (Miller, Robert)
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Glenn Jeffries. Glenn Jeffries served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. Summons served on Glen Jeffries. (Miller, Robert)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Trinity Rebar and Concrete Supplies, LLC. Trinity Rebar and Concrete Supplies, LLC served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. Summons served on Donovan Farley. (Miller, Robert)
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for J&R Holding, LLC. J&R Holding, LLC served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. Summons served on Glen Jeffries. (Miller, Robert)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for BRG Holding, LLC. BRG Holding, LLC served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. Summons served on Stacey Farmer. (Miller, Robert)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Metal Partners Rebar, LLC. Metal Partners Rebar, LLC served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. Summons served on Stacey Farmer. (Miller, Robert)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metal Partners Rebar, LLC, BRG Holding, LLC, J&R Holding, LLC, Trinity Rebar and Concrete Supplies, LLC, Glenn Jeffries, James R. Reed, re: #1 Complaint,. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons for BRG Holding, LLC, #2 Summons for J&R Holding, LLC, #3 Summons for Trinity Rebar and Concrete Supplies, LLC, #4 Summons for Glenn Jeffries, #5 Summons for James R. Reed) (hkl)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7906490. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement of Chad E. Jones, P.E., CMSE, CFEI, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)
March 18, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Metal Partners Rebar, LLC etal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Rebar and Concrete Supplies, LLC doing business as Trinity Promotions
Represented By: Jonathan L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&R Holding, LLC doing business as Trinity Rebar
Represented By: Jonathan L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Reed
Represented By: Jonathan L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRG Holding, LLC doing business as Trinity Rebar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Jeffries
Represented By: Jonathan L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metal Partners Rebar, LLC doing business as Metal Partners International
Represented By: Allison M. Subacz
Represented By: Cy A. Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalton Cook
Represented By: Bernard E. Layne, III
Represented By: Robert H. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?