Watson et al v. Citizens Deposit Bank and Trust, Inc.
Plaintiff: George M. Watson, II and Tracy Watson
Defendant: Citizens Deposit Bank and Trust, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00264
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY MEMORANDUM by George M. Watson, II, Tracy Watson to #14 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Stipulation, #2 Exhibit B: Agreed Order)(Giatras, Troy)
June 1, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE by Citizens Deposit Bank and Trust, Inc. in opposition to #10 MOTION by George M. Watson, II, Tracy Watson to Dismiss Without Prejudice, re: #4 Counterclaim. (Jones, Joel) (Modified on 6/2/2021 to remove link to #11 memorandum) (mkw)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting the parties' #12 JOINT MOTION to Stay Scheduling Deadlines; staying the 4/27/2021 #5 Order and Notice pending resolution of the pending motions. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/1/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
May 27, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT MOTION by George M. Watson, II, Tracy Watson, Citizens Deposit Bank and Trust, Inc. to Stay Scheduling Deadlines in the Court's 4/27/2021 #5 Order and Notice. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Stonestreet, Matthew) (Modified on 5/27/2021 to add party filer and to add link to #5 order) (mkw).
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by George M. Watson, II, Tracy Watson in support of #10 MOTION by George M. Watson, II, Tracy Watson to Dismiss Without Prejudice, re: #4 Counterclaim. (Stonestreet, Matthew)
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by George M. Watson, II, Tracy Watson to Dismiss Without Prejudice, re: #4 Counterclaim. (Stonestreet, Matthew)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY by George M. Watson, II, Tracy Watson to #8 Response In Opposition. (Giatras, Troy)
May 6, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Citizens Deposit Bank and Trust, Inc. in opposition to #6 MOTION by George M. Watson, II, Tracy Watson to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Putnam County and for Costs and Fees. (Jones, Joel) (Modified on 5/6/2021 to remove link to #7 memorandum) (mkw).
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by George M. Watson, II, Tracy Watson in support of #6 MOTION by George M. Watson, II, Tracy Watson to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Putnam County and for Costs and Fees. (Giatras, Troy) (Modified on 4/30/2021 to detach Exhibit A and add as an attachment to the motion and replace main document image) (mkw).
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by George M. Watson, II, Tracy Watson to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Putnam County and for Costs and Fees. (Giatras, Troy) (Additional attachment added on 4/30/2021: #1 Exhibit A) (mkw). (Modified on 4/30/2021 to add exhibit as an attachment) (mkw).
April 30, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 MOTION by George M. Watson, II, Tracy Watson to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Putnam County and for Costs and Fees and #7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW. Error: Exhibit should be an attachment to the motion; Exhibit and Memorandum were scanned in reverse order with the exhibit as the main document. Correction: Detached Exhibit A and added it as an attachment to the motion; replaced image for the memorandum with the memorandum as the main document. (mkw)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions - 5/17/2021. Rule 26(f) Meeting - 6/1/2021. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting - 6/7/2021. Scheduling/status conference at 11:30 AM on 6/21/2021 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order - 6/28/2021. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 7/6/2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/27/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT attached to the #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Citizens Deposit Bank and Trust, Inc. and COUNTERCLAIM by Citizens Deposit Bank and Trust, Inc. against Plaintiffs George M. Watson, II and Tracy Watson. (Jones, Joel) (Modified on 4/26/2021 to add link to #1 complaint) (mkw).
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Citizens Deposit Bank and Trust, Inc. (Jones, Joel)
April 23, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citizens Deposit Bank and Trust, Inc. with temporary restraining order prohibiting forclosure, agreed order resolving injunction proceeding set for 4/8/2021, summons, verified complaint, and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Putnam County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7931007. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson et al v. Citizens Deposit Bank and Trust, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George M. Watson, II
Represented By: Troy N. Giatras
Represented By: Matthew Stonestreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Watson
Represented By: Troy N. Giatras
Represented By: Matthew Stonestreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Deposit Bank and Trust, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Meadows
Represented By: Joel Patrick Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?