Dillon v. Hall et al
Plaintiff: Mason Dillon
Defendant: Brian D. Hall, Xerxes Rahmati, Scott A. Lowther, Kenny Davis, Putnam County Commission and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2021cv00435
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brian D. Hall, Scott A. Lowther, Xerxes Rahmati, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 summons as to Scott A. Lowther, #2 summons as to Brian D. Hall) (jsa)
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Mason Dillon for Brian D. Hall, re: #1 Complaint. (Bryan, John) (Modified on 9/29/2021 to add link to #1 complaint) (mkw).
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Mason Dillon for Xerxes Rahmati, re: #1 Complaint. (Bryan, John) (Modified on 9/29/2021 to add link to #1 complaint) (mkw).
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Mason Dillon for Scott A. Lowther, re: #1 Complaint. (Bryan, John) (Modified on 9/29/2021 to add link to #1 complaint) (mkw).
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER #1 Complaint by Kenny Davis; Jury demand. (Stebbins, James)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Kenny Davis. Kenny Davis served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021. Summons served on Kenny Davis. (Bryan, John) (Additional attachment added on 9/2/2021: #1 Summons) (mkw). (Modified on 9/2/2021 to add a copy of the summons as an attachment) (mkw).
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Larry Frye, Esq. on 8/9/21. Putnam County Commission waiver mailed on 8/5/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Bryan, John)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenny Davis, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jsa)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Mason Dillon for Kenny Davis (Bryan, John)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8001873. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)
August 2, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillon v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason Dillon
Represented By: John H. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xerxes Rahmati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A. Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Davis
Represented By: James C. Stebbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Putnam County Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?