Hoops et al v. United Bank
Counter Defendant: Jeffery A. Hoops, Patricia Hoops and Clearwater Investment Holdings, LLC
Counter Claimant: United Bank
Case Number: 3:2022cv00072
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY by Jeffery A. Hoops, Patricia Hoops, Clearwater Investment Holdings, LLC to #14 Response In Opposition. (Robertson, Connor) (Modified on 4/8/2022 to add party filers) (mkw).
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Bank for United Bank's First Set of Combined Discovery Requests to Patricia Hoops. (Raupp, Peter)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Bank for United Bank's First Set of Combined Discovery Requests to Jeffery A. Hoops. (Raupp, Peter)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Bank for United Bank's First Set of Combined Discovery Requests to Clearwater Investment Holdings, LLC. (Raupp, Peter)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant United Bank's #14 Response to Plaintiffs' #9 MOTION to Dismiss; Plaintiffs shall file their reply by 4/8/2022. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/4/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Jeffery A. Hoops, Patricia Hoops, Clearwater Investment Holdings, LLC for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant United Bank's #14 Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss to 4/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Time Extension)(Robertson, Connor) (Modified on 4/4/2022 to add party filers and to add link to #14 response) (mkw).
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE by United Bank in opposition to #9 MOTION by Clearwater Investment Holdings, LLC, Jeffery A. Hoops, Patricia Hoops to Dismiss With Prejudice the Complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Raupp, Peter)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 6/6/2022. Discovery requests to be completed by 9/9/2022 and all depositions by 10/24/2022. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 8/24/2022, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 9/26/2022, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 10/10/2022. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 11/11/2022; any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 11/28/2022. Plaintiffs' portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendant due by 1/30/2023. Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 2/6/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2023 at 10:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 2/21/2023. Final Settlement Conference at 09:30 AM on 2/27/2023 in Huntington. Trial set for 2/28/2023 at 8:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; further canceling the scheduling conference set for 4/4/2022. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/22/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties)(Adams, Carol)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPLY by United Bank to Plaintiff's #8 Response In Opposition. (Raupp, Peter)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Christopher Etheredge appearing on behalf of United Bank. (Etheredge, Christopher)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Jeffery A. Hoops, Patricia Hoops, Clearwater Investment Holdings, LLC, United Bank. (Bunn, Candace) (Modified on 3/21/2022 to add party filers) (mkw).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION by Clearwater Investment Holdings, LLC, Jeffery A. Hoops, Patricia Hoops to Dismiss With Prejudice the Complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Robertson, Connor) (Modified on 3/14/2022 to remove link to #5 answer and counterclaim and add link to #1 notice of removal and to add party filers) (mkw).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE by Clearwater Investment Holdings, LLC, Jeffery A. Hoops, Patricia Hoops in opposition to #6 MOTION by United Bank for Partial Dismissal, re: Complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit United Bank Notice of Default)(Robertson, Connor) (Modified on 3/14/2022 to add party filers) (mkw).
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by United Bank in support of #6 MOTION by United Bank for Partial Dismissal, re: Complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Raupp, Peter)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION by United Bank for Partial Dismissal, re: Complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Raupp, Peter)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand and COUNTERCLAIM by Defendant United Bank against Jeffrey A. Hoops, Patricia Hoops, and Clearwater Investment Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Raupp, Peter) (Modified on 3/2/2022 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (mkw).
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order SET DEADLINE: United Bank answer due 3/2/2022. (mkw)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Jeffery A. Hoops, Patricia Hoops, Clearwater Investment Holdings, LLC and United Bank; the parties jointly stipulate that United Bank shall have until 3/2/2022 to file it's responsive pleading in this case to the Complaint attached to the #1 Notice of Removal. (Raupp, Peter) (Modified on 2/22/2022 to add party filers) (mkw).
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions - 3/2/2022. Rule 26(f) Meeting - 3/14/2022. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting - 3/21/2022. Scheduling/status conference at 11:30 AM on 4/4/2022 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order - 4/11/2022. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 4/18/2022. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/14/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Bank with complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Cabell County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8129552. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoops et al v. United Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jeffery A. Hoops
Represented By: Connor D. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Patricia Hoops
Represented By: Connor D. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Clearwater Investment Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Connor D. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: United Bank
Represented By: Ancil G. Ramey
Represented By: Candace Haley Bunn
Represented By: Joseph G. Bunn
Represented By: Peter J. Raupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?